Bellamy et al v. Paukowits et al
Plaintiff: Florence Bellamy and Michael J. Bellamy
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC, Jason Matthew Paukowits and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00752
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement re: #9 Notice of Deficiency by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Taylor, Bert) Modified on 10/27/2020 to add linkage(am, ).
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to EAN Holdings, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Florence Bellamy, Michael J. Bellamy, (DFT) EAN Holdings, LLC, (DFT) USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (am, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Taylor, Bert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Herndon, John)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Jason Matthew Paukowits.(Herndon, John)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jason Matthew Paukowits re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Herndon, John) Modified on 10/6/2020 to add the link to the #3 Notice (bes, ).
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Jason Matthew Paukowits; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFT) Jason Matthew Paukowits. (bes, )
September 18, 2020 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC by Florence Bellamy, Michael J. Bellamy. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )
September 18, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF)(bes, )
September 18, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint by EAN Holdings, LLC. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF)(bes, )
September 18, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Florence Bellamy, Michael J. Bellamy. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF) (bes, )
September 18, 2020 COMPLAINT against EAN Holdings, LLC, Jason Matthew Paukowits, USAA Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Michael J. Bellamy, Florence Bellamy. (No PDF attached to this entry - See Doc #1 for PDF)(bes, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jason Matthew Paukowits from Circuit Court of Russell County, Alabama, case number 57-CV-20-900130.00. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602059503) (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Answer by EAN Holdings, LLC, #3 Answer by USAA Casualty Insurance Company, #4 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendant EAN Holdings, LLC, #5 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #6 Exhibit B - Consent to Removal, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Receipt)(bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellamy et al v. Paukowits et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Bellamy
Represented By: Melissa Blanch Thomas
Represented By: Richard L Chancey
Represented By: Richard Lee Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Bellamy
Represented By: Melissa Blanch Thomas
Represented By: Richard L Chancey
Represented By: Richard Lee Chancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Bert Pittman Taylor
Represented By: Peter Anthony deSarro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Matthew Paukowits
Represented By: Joshua Jonathan Jackson
Represented By: John Dearman Herndon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Evans Brittain
Represented By: Chalankis Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?