Contreras v. Thomas et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Ramiro Delreal Contreras
Defendant: Jimmy Thomas and Steven Troy Marshall
Case Number: 3:2020cv01019
Filed: December 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: W Harold Albritton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for Steven Troy Marshall, Jimmy Thomas. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing that on or before 2/15/2021, petitioner may file a response to the answer filed by the respondents, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 1/26/2021. (djy, )
January 22, 2021 Filing 9 Respondents's ANSWER to Complaint by Steven Troy Marshall, Jimmy Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Vol. 1 - Record on appeal, #2 Exhibit 1 - Vol. 2 - Record on appeal, #3 Exhibit 1 - Vol. 3 - Record on appeal, #4 Exhibit 1 - Vol. 4 - Record on appeal, #5 Exhibit 1 - Vol. 5 - Record on appeal, #6 Exhibit 1 - Vol. 6 - Record on appeal, #7 Exhibit 1 - Vol. 7 - Record on appeal, #8 Exhibit 1 - Vol. 8 - Record on appeal, #9 Exhibit 1 - Vol. 9 - Record on appeal, #10 Exhibit 2 - Appellant's brief, #11 Exhibit 3 - Appellee's brief, #12 Exhibit 4 - Appellant's reply brief, #13 Exhibit 5 - Opinion, #14 Exhibit 6 - Application for rehearing, #15 Exhibit 7 - Order overruling application for rehearing, #16 Exhibit 8 - Cert Petition, #17 Exhibit 9 - Order granting cert petition, #18 Exhibit 10 - Brief in support of cert petition, #19 Exhibit 11 - Respondent's brief, #20 Exhibit 12 - Petitioner's reply brief, #21 Exhibit 13 - Order quashing cert petition, #22 Exhibit 14 - COJ - No. 1151278, #23 Exhibit 15 - COJ - CR-14-0980, #24 Exhibit 16 - Record on appeal - CR-19-0298, #25 Exhibit 17 - Appellant's brief - CR-19-0298, #26 Exhibit 18 - Appellee's brief - CR-19-0298, #27 Exhibit 19 - Appellant's reply brief - CR-19-0298, #28 Exhibit 20 - Opinion - CR-19-0298, #29 Exhibit 21 - Application for rehearing - CR-19-0298, #30 Exhibit 22 - Order overruling application for rehearing - CR-19-0298, #31 Exhibit 23 - Cert petition - No. 1191014, #32 Exhibit 24 - COJ and denial of cert petition - No. 1191014, #33 Exhibit 25 - COJ - CR-19-0298)(Starrett, Marc) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/2/2021) (dmn, ).
December 30, 2020 Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #3 Order, signed by L.N. R002 for Jimmy Thomas, served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/27/2021. (amf, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Petition & #3 Order, signed by Sandra Blackmon for Steven Troy Marshall, served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/27/2021. (amf, )
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time ; respondents are granted an extension from 1/6/2021, to 1/27/2021, to answer petitioner's 2254 petition. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 12/28/2020. (djy, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Steven Troy Marshall, Jimmy Thomas. (Starrett, Marc)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Steven Troy Marshall, Jimmy Thomas. (Davis, John)
December 28, 2020 ***Attorney Marc Alan Starrett for Steven Troy Marshall, Jimmy Thomas added. Attorney John Judson Davis terminated due to incorrect e-filing credentials being used during filing and being incorrectly added to case. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 1/6/2021; Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Jimmy Thomas & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 12/16/2020. (bes, )
December 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Ramiro Delreal Contreras. (hrs, )
December 11, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 4602060566.), filed by Ramiro Delreal Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Filing Fee)(hrs, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Thomas et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Thomas
Represented By: Marc Alan Starrett
Represented By: John Judson Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Troy Marshall
Represented By: Marc Alan Starrett
Represented By: John Judson Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramiro Delreal Contreras
Represented By: Thomas Martele Goggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?