Highway 29, LLC v. Lee County Commission et al
Plaintiff: Highway 29, LLC
Defendant: Gary Long, William J. English, Lee County Commission, Sarah Brown, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr. and Doug Cannon
Case Number: 3:2021cv00300
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the #28 memorandum opinion and order entered on this date, and for good cause, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the Court that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter this document on the civil docket as a Final Judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(cwl, )
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. It is further ORDERED that the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction set for May 10, 2021, is CANCELED. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/7/2021. (furn: calendar, ws) (cwl, )
May 5, 2021 Filing 26 Reply to response to order (Jurisdictional Brief) re #21 Order, filed by Highway 29, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Budget Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - O-A News story, #3 Exhibit C - GIS records)(Whittelsey, Davis) Modified on 5/5/2021 to clarify text (cwl, ).
May 5, 2021 Filing 25 Response to Order (Supplemental Response on the Issue of Diversity Jurisdiction) re #21 Order by Sarah Brown, Doug Cannon, William J. English, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr, Lee County Commission, Gary Long. (Frawley, Jamie) Modified on 5/5/2021 to clarify text (cwl, ).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: granting #22 Motion for Extension of Deadline. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 5/4/2021. (NO pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF re #17 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Highway 29, LLC. (Corley, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2021: #1 Corrected Signature page & Certificate of Service) (cwl, ).
May 3, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Deadline May 5th, 2021 by Highway 29, LLC. (Corley, Jonathan)
April 29, 2021 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Emily C. Marks: Telephone Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2021 re #15 MOTION to Continue May 7 hearing (Unopposed) filed by Robert Ham, Lee County Commission, Sarah Brown, Gary Long, Richard LaGrand, Sr., William J. English, Doug Cannon (PDF available for court use only). (Court Reporter Katie Sears Silas.) (ws, )
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the motion to continue (doc. #15 ) is GRANTED and the hearing set for 5/7/2021 is RESET to 5/10/2021 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2A, United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, AL, as further set out in order. it is ORDERED that, on or before noon on 5/5/2021, the parties shall file briefs addressing the jurisdictional issue set forth in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/29/2021. (furn: calendar, ws)(cwl, )
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/29/2021. (NO pdf attached to this entry) (cwl, )
April 28, 2021 MOTION to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Sarah Brown, Doug Cannon, William J. English, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr, Lee County Commission, Gary Long. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #17 for pdf) (cwl, )
April 28, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Seal by Sarah Brown, Doug Cannon, William J. English, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr, Lee County Commission, Gary Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit A-6, #7 Exhibit A-7, #8 Exhibit A-8)(Frawley, Jamie)
April 28, 2021 Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 Response to Order to Show Cause, and Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for a more definite statement filed by Sarah Brown, Doug Cannon, William J. English, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr, Lee County Commission, Gary Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-9, #3 Exhibit A-10, #4 Exhibit A-11)(Frawley, Jamie) Modified on 4/29/2021 to clarify that additional exhibits are found in docket entry #19 & placed under seal (cwl, ).
April 28, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Sarah Brown, Doug Cannon, William J. English, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr, Lee County Commission, Gary Long re #4 Order. (Frawley, Jamie) Modified on 4/29/2021 to clarify text(cwl, ).
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the motion to continue (doc. #15 ) is set for oral argument on 4/29/2021 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone conference call, as further set out in order. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/28/2021. (furn: calendar, ws) (cwl, )
April 27, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue May 7 hearing (Unopposed) by Sarah Brown, Doug Cannon, William J. English, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr, Lee County Commission, Gary Long. (Frawley, Jamie)
April 26, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Gary Long. (Frawley, Jamie) (Main Document 14 replaced on 4/26/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 4/26/2021 (bes, ).
April 26, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Richard LaGrand, Sr. (Frawley, Jamie) (Main Document 13 replaced on 4/26/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 4/26/2021 (bes, ).
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Robert Ham. (Frawley, Jamie) (Main Document 12 replaced on 4/26/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 4/26/2021 (bes, ).
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William J. English. (Frawley, Jamie) (Main Document 11 replaced on 4/26/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 4/26/2021 (bes, ).
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Doug Cannon. (Frawley, Jamie) (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/26/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 4/26/2021 (bes, ).
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sarah Brown. (Frawley, Jamie) (Main Document 9 replaced on 4/26/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 4/26/2021 (bes, ).
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Lee County Commission. (Frawley, Jamie) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/26/2021 to remove ability to edit PDF ) (bes, ). Modified on 4/26/2021 (bes, ).
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley on behalf of Sarah Brown, Doug Cannon, William J. English, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr, Lee County Commission, Gary Long (Frawley, Jamie)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Highway 29, LLC. Lee County Commission, Sarah Brown, Doug Cannon, William J. English, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr., Gary Long served on 4/23/2021. (Corley, Jonathan) Modified on 4/23/2021 to remove "all defendants" and list them individually (cwl, ).
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Highway 29, LLC re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Corley, Jonathan)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED (1) that the Plf's motion for a temporary restraining order, (doc. #1 ), is DENIED; (2) that on or before 4/28/2021, the Defs shall show cause why the motion for preliminary injunction should not be granted; (3) that the Plf may file a reply to the Defs' response on or before 5/3/2021; and (4) that the motion for preliminary injunction is hereby SET for a hearing on 5/7/2021 at 10:00 a.m in Courtroom 2A, at the FMJ, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse Complex, Montgomery, AL. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 4/22/2021. (furn: calendar, ws)(cwl, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Highway 29, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sarah Brown, Doug Cannon, William J. English, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr, Lee County Commission, Gary Long & returned to counsel for service by process server. (cwl, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, FOR PRELIMINARY AND/OR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, AND FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Sarah Brown, Doug Cannon, William J. English, Robert Ham, Richard LaGrand, Sr, Lee County Commission, Gary Long ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602063065.), filed by Highway 29, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 receipt)(cwl, )
April 22, 2021 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Highway 29, LLC. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )
April 22, 2021 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Highway 29, LLC. (NO pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highway 29, LLC v. Lee County Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Long
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J. English
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County Commission
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Brown
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ham
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard LaGrand, Sr.
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Cannon
Represented By: Jamie Helen Kidd Frawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highway 29, LLC
Represented By: Davis Butterfield Whittelsey
Represented By: Jonathan Keith Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?