Ashmore v. Smith (MAG+)
Plaintiff: Frederick Maurice Ashmore
Defendant: Meredith Elizabeth Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv00422
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; DIRECTING the Clerk to STAY service of process so the Court may conduct its obligatory review of the Complaint pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e). Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 8/5/2021. (amf, )
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE, pursuant to 28 USC 636, to the U.S. Magistrate Judge for further proceedings and determination or recommendation as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 6/24/2021. (amf, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Frederick Maurice Ashmore. (amf, )
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Meredith Elizabeth Smith, filed by Frederick Maurice Ashmore.(amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashmore v. Smith (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Elizabeth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Maurice Ashmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?