Stapler v. Automatic Food Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amelia Stapler
Defendant: Automatic Food Services, Inc. and Automatic Food Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00437
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Automatic Food Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Geisler, Kimberly)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Automatic Food Service, Inc.. (Geisler, Kimberly)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: GRANTING the #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 8/11/2021. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE by Automatic Food Service, Inc. re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Geisler, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Automatic Food Service, Inc.. (Geisler, Kimberly)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Automatic Food Service, Inc.. (Geisler, Kimberly)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amelia Stapler. Automatic Food Service, Inc. served on 7/17/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Lowery, Courtney)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Automatic Food Service, Inc. and returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (wcl, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Amelia Stapler re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Lowery, Courtney)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Amelia Stapler; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT to Join #1 Complaint - Collective Action by Amelia Stapler. (am, )
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION against Automatic Food Service, Inc., filed by Amelia Stapler. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 4602063759.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(am, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2021: #3 Original Signature Page, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Original Signature) (wcl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stapler v. Automatic Food Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Stapler
Represented By: Courtney Elizabeth Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Food Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automatic Food Service, Inc.
Represented By: Christian Collier Feldman
Represented By: Joshua Stephen Thompson
Represented By: Kimberly Wood Geisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?