611 Boulevard LLC v. The City of Valley, Alabama
Defendant: 611 Boulevard LLC and The City of Valley, Alabama
Case Number: 3:2021cv00478
Filed: July 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by 611 Boulevard LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - M.Brown 2020.12.09 letter to City, #2 Exhibit B - M.Brown 2020.12.17 letter to J.Jones, #3 Exhibit C - M.Brown 2021.01.06 letter to J.Jones)(Oliver, Thomas)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: it is ORDERED that, on or before 9/14/2021, Plf shall show cause, if any there be, why the #17 motion should not be granted. Def may file a reply on or before 9/28/2021. Further, it is ORDERED that Def's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. #19 ) is GRANTED. Def shall file an answer to Plf's complaint within fourteen (14) days after this Court enters an order ruling on Def's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/24/2021. (cwl, )
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: It is ORDERED that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk of Court by 9/14/2021, as further set out in order. The parties must not file consent forms into the record. The parties may not electronically submit reassignment forms. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/24/2021. (cwl, )
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The City of Valley, Alabama. (Hyde, Robbie)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) filed by The City of Valley, Alabama. (Hyde, Robbie)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss (Partial) by The City of Valley, Alabama. (Hyde, Robbie)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by (No Signature) for Hon. Andrew Wheeler (Administration, Environmental Protection Agency), served on 7/26/2021. (amf, )
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: Upon consideration of the #12 unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; Defendant may file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 8/23/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 8/9/2021. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, )
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant The City of Valley, Alabama. (amf, )
August 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by The City of Valley, Alabama. (Hyde, Robbie)
August 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Deadline re #1 Complaint, by The City of Valley, Alabama. (Hyde, Robbie)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Illegible for Hon. Mary S. Walker (Regional Administrator, U.S. EPA Region 4), served on 7/26/2021.(amf, )
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Emily Sase for U.S. Attorney General, served on 7/26/2021.(amf, )
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by 611 Boulevard LLC re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Oliver, Thomas)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Laura Cranage for Hon. Lance R. LeFleur (Director of Alabama Department of Environmental Management), served on 7/22/2021. (amf, )
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Plaintiff 611 Boulevard LLC. (amf, )
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Plaintiff 611 Boulevard LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 7/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hon. Lance R. LeFleur (Director of Alabama Department of Environmental Management), Hon. Andrew Wheeler, (Administration, Environmental Protection Agency), Hon. Mary S. Walker (Regional Administrator, U.S. EPA Region 4), & U.S. Attorney General; mailed by CMRRR with #1 Complaint. (amf, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Attorney General for the State of Alabama served on 7/16/2021. (amf, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed; The City of Valley, Alabama served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (amf, )
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The City of Valley, Alabama & Attorney General for the State of Alabama; Returned to counsel for personal service by process server. (amf, )
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City of Valley, Alabama (Filing fee $ 402.00, receipt number 4602063985), filed by 611 Boulevard LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Filing Fee Receipt)(amf, )
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 611 Boulevard LLC. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #1 for PDF) (amf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 611 Boulevard LLC v. The City of Valley, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 611 Boulevard LLC
Represented By: Terrance Michael Brown
Represented By: Thomas Lee Oliver, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Valley, Alabama
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?