The Advantage of Advertising, LLC v. City of Opelika, Alabama
Plaintiff: The Advantage of Advertising, LLC
Defendant: City of Opelika, Alabama
Case Number: 3:2021cv00597
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of G. Franklin Lemond, Jr. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/22/2021. (hfc, )
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: GRANTING the #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of E. Adam Webb. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 9/22/2021. (es, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 7 Conflict Disclosure Statement by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (am, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 Motion for G. Franklin Lemond, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Receipt Number 4602064714; Filing fee $75.00.) by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(am, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 Motion for E. Adam Webb to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Receipt Number 4602064713; Filing fee $75.00.) by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Receipt)(am, )
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. City of Opelika, Alabama waiver sent on 9/10/2021, answer due 11/9/2021. (Webb, Edward)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to The Advantage of Advertising, LLC; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order & Sample)(am, )
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. (am, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Opelika, Alabama, filed by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. (Filing fee $402.00 receipt number 4602064607.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt)(am, )
September 8, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Advantage of Advertising, LLC. (NO PDF - See doc #1 ) (am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Advantage of Advertising, LLC v. City of Opelika, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Advantage of Advertising, LLC
Represented By: Edward Adam Webb
Represented By: G. Franklin Lemond, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Opelika, Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?