Lee County, Alabama Commission v. Creekwood Resources, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lee County, Alabama Commission
Defendant: CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC, Charles Michael Teel and Wanda K. Teel
Case Number: 3:2021cv00669
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Emily C Marks
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Because the Court finds that the Teels are not fraudently joined to defeat diversity jurisdiction, it must consider their citizenship for diversity purposes. The Teels, like the County, are citizens of the state of Alabama, and so complete diversity is lacking. Without complete diversity, this Court does not have subject matter jurisdiction over this suit. Therefore, it is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand the case to the Circuit Court of Lee County (doc. #9 ) is GRANTED and this case is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of Lee County, Alabama. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to take actions necessary to accomplish the remand of this case to the Circuit Court of Lee County, Alabama. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 2/14/2022. Certified copy mailed to Clerk, Circuit Court of Lee County, Alabama. (dmn, )
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #10 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support filed by Lee County, Alabama Commission. (Bromberg, Charles)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks. Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (dmn, )
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Motions No Longer Referred due to Case Reassignment: #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (dmn, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order JOINDER in Opposition to #12 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Charles Michael Teel, Wanda K. Teel. (NO PDF - See doc #13 which was incorrectly filed as a Response) (am, )
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (Joinder) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Joining in Opposition of Co-Defendants #12 filed by Charles Michael Teel, Wanda K. Teel. (Clark, John) Modified on 11/24/2021 to reflect correct as Joinder, wrong event used (am, ).
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit B - Recorded Lease, #3 Exhibit C - Jeffrey Major Oct. 7, 2021 Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Notice of Lis Pendens, #5 Exhibit E - ADEM Ruling on Motion to Stay, #6 Exhibit F - Jeffrey Major Nov. 23, 2021 Declaration, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Lis Pendens)(Johnson, Taylor)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. #9 ), it is ORDERED that Defendants must respond by 11/23/2021, and SHOW CAUSE why it should not be granted. Plaintiff may file a reply by 12/3/2021. The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Charles and Wanda Teel (Doc. #8 ) will be held in abeyance pending resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Additionally, the parties were previously notified of the assignment of this case to a Magistrate Judge and their right to request reassignment (see attached notice). The parties should now confirm their decision in writing to consent or request reassignment. Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the Clerk of the Court by 11/30/2021. Alternatively, as explained in the attached notice, a party may consent electronically, but neither the consent form nor the request for reassignment form should be filed electronically. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 11/9/2021. (dmn, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Lee County, Alabama Commission. (Davis, Richard)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lee County, Alabama Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Davis, Richard) Modified on 11/9/2021 to correct civil event code. (dmn, )
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Charles Michael Teel, Wanda K. Teel. (Clark, John)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC. (Johnson, Taylor)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for All parties, CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC, Lee County, Alabama Commission, Charles Michael Teel, Wanda K. Teel. (dmn, )
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Correction re Complaint. The referenced docket entry was modified to correct the file date to 10/7/2021. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint for Preliminary and Permanent Injunction, Declaratory Judgment, and Other Allied Relief by CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC.(Strasavich, Michael) Modified on 10/15/2021 to create link to complaint; filed prior to case opening. (dmn, )
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Barr Johnson on behalf of CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC (Johnson, Taylor)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Howard Rutherford, Jr on behalf of CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC (Rutherford, Robert)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael David Strasavich on behalf of CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC (Strasavich, Michael)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC from Circuit Court of Lee County, Alabama, case number 43-CV-2021-900289.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602064902) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, Consent to and Joinder in Removal, #3 Exhibit C, Declaration of Jeffrey David Major, #4 Filing Fee Receipt, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 State Court Complaint) (dmn, )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order COMPLAINT FOR PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION, DECLARATORY JUDGMENT, AND OTHER ALLIED RELIEF against CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC, Charles Michael Teel, Wanda K. Teel, filed by Lee County, Alabama Commission.(dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #5 ) Modified on 10/15/2021 to correct file date. (dmn, )
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order CONSENT TO AND JOINDER in #5 Notice of Removal, by Charles Michael Teel, Wanda K. Teel. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #5 , Exhibit B)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley Allen Martin on behalf of Lee County, Alabama Commissio. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #5 , Exhibit A)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley Allen Martin, Jr on behalf of Lee County, Alabama Commission. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #5 , Exhibit A)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE to Clerk of the Circuit Court of Lee County, AL of Filing #5 Notice of Removal, by CreekWood Resources, LLC, Highway 29, LLC. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #5 )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee County, Alabama Commission v. Creekwood Resources, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee County, Alabama Commission
Represented By: Charles Clayton Bromberg, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Eldon Davis
Represented By: Stanley Allen Martin
Represented By: Stanley Allen Martin, Jr.
Represented By: Tabor Robert Novak, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CreekWood Resources, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Locke Anderson
Represented By: Michael David Strasavich
Represented By: Robert Howard Rutherford, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Barr Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highway 29, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Locke Anderson
Represented By: Michael David Strasavich
Represented By: Robert Howard Rutherford, Jr.
Represented By: Taylor Barr Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Michael Teel
Represented By: John William Clark, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda K. Teel
Represented By: John William Clark, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?