Buchanon v. Alabama Bureau of Pardons and Paroles et al (INMATE 3)
Plaintiff: Terry James Buchanon, II
Defendant: Alabama Bureau of Pardons and Paroles, Lynn Head, Sarah C. Still, Cliff Walker, John H. Christian, Gary R. Cooper, Dwayne Spurlock, Jefferson S. Dunn, Patrice Richie Jones, State of Alabama, Johnny Hardwick, Sarah Still and Gary Cooper
Case Number: 3:2021cv00737
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Buchanon is ORDERED to inform the Court by 12/28/2021, of his wishes to do one of the following: 1. Continue to proceed before this Court under 28 U.S.C. 2254 on the claims in his #1 petition; or 2. Amend his petition to assert any additional claims under 2254 on which he wishes to challenge his parole revocation; or 3. Withdraw his petition, as further set out in Order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/7/2021. (am, )
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 Habeas Petition Filing fee received: $5.00, receipt number 4602065397. (am, )
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Terry James Buchanon, II. (Attachments: #1 Application IFP)(es, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 11/24/2021, Buchanon shall either (1) provide a prison account statement from the account clerk at the Bullock Correctional Facility containing the account clerk's certified statement of the balance in Buchanon's prison account when he filed his petition, or (2) submit the $5.00 filing fee for habeas corpus actions. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/8/2021. (furn: cashier)(cwl, )
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the instant case be construed as a petition for writ of habeas corpus filed under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and this case shall henceforth proceed as such; DIRECTING the Clerk to undertake those measures necessary to identify this case as one filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/8/2021. (am, )
November 8, 2021 Assignment of Staff Attorney Willoughby; Set Willoughby Flag; Clear Mullikin Flag. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
November 1, 2021 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Terry James Buchanon, II. (NO PDF - See doc #1 )(am, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Terry James Buchanon, II. (hrs, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Alabama Bureau of Pardons and Paroles, John H. Christian, Gary Cooper, Jefferson S. Dunn, Johnny Hardwick, Lynn Head, Patrice Richie Jones, Dwayne Spurlock, State of Alabama, Sarah Still, Cliff Walker, filed by Terry James Buchanon, II.(hrs, )
November 1, 2021 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Terry James Buchanon, II. (NO PDF-See doc #1 ) (am, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanon v. Alabama Bureau of Pardons and Paroles et al (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry James Buchanon, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Bureau of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Head
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah C. Still
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson S. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrice Richie Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Hardwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Still
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?