Clark v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: Janice L. Clark
Defendant: Torey Renard Ross, Rossway Trucking, LLC. and Geico Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00836
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RULE 26(f) ORDER: it is ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan and utilizing one of the undersigned's trial terms shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/10/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 2/17/2022. (bes, )
February 14, 2022 Filing 16 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Emily C. Marks as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as referral judge; Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (bes, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 15 Supplement to Rossway Trucking, LLC's Notice of Removal by Rossway Trucking, LLC. re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jones, William) Modified on 1/20/2022 to clarify the docket text (bes, ).
January 17, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Geico Casualty Company re #6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bufford, Kevin) Modified on 1/18/2022 to add the link to the #6 Notice (bes, ).
January 11, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Torey Renard Ross re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement . (Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/11/2022 to add the link to the #3 Notice (bes, ).
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Rossway Trucking, LLC. re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement . (Jones, William) Modified on 1/11/2022 to remove Torey Ross as filer and to add the link to the #3 Notice (bes, ).
January 10, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jacob Jones on behalf of Torey Renard Ross, Rossway Trucking, LLC. (Jones, William)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; The parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 1/7/2022. (bes, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Rossway Trucking, LLC..(Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/7/2022 to remove jury demand text since no jury demand was listed in pleading (bes, ).
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Torey Renard Ross.(Friedman, Jeffrey) Modified on 1/7/2022 to remove jury demand text since no jury demand is listed in pleading (bes, ).
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 1/18/2022, Dft Rossway Trucking, LLC shall demonstrate in writing that complete diversity exists between its members and the plf. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 1/6/2022. (bes, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 6 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Geico Casualty Company; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
January 6, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Janice L. Clark. (bes, )
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Geico Casualty Company.(Bufford, Kevin)
December 29, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Torey Renard Ross & Rossway Trucking, LLC.; Corporate Disclosures due by 1/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFTs) Geico Casualty Company, Torey Renard Ross, Rossway Trucking, LLC.. (bes, )
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Torey Renard Ross, Rossway Trucking, LLC. from Circuit Court of Russell County, AL, case number 57-cv-2021-900227.00. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602065554) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H - GEICO Consent to Removal, #9 Exhibit I - State Court Record, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Receipt)(bes, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2021: #12 Signed Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Signed Certificate of Service) (bes, ).
December 23, 2021 COMPLAINT against Geico Casualty Company, Torey Renard Ross, Rossway Trucking, LLC., filed by Janice L. Clark. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -1 for PDF)(bes, )
December 23, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Janice L. Clark. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -1 for PDF) (bes, )
December 23, 2021 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal with State Court by Torey Renard Ross, Rossway Trucking, LLC. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -9 for PDF) (bes, )
December 23, 2021 Notice of Consent to Removal by Geico Casualty Company. (No PDF attached to this entry - see doc #1 -8 for PDF) (bes, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice L. Clark
Represented By: Archibald (Archie) Irwin Grubb, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torey Renard Ross
Represented By: Jeffrey Edwin Friedman
Represented By: William Jacob Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossway Trucking, LLC.
Represented By: Jeffrey Edwin Friedman
Represented By: William Jacob Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Joshua Jonathan Jackson
Represented By: Kevin W. R. Bufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?