Bassaw v. Smith Hauling, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Bassaw
Defendant: Smith Hauling, Inc., Riechard Gregory Alan and Reichard Gregory Alan
Case Number: 3:2022cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Stephen Michael Doyle
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2022 Filing 16 Case reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding judge and Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle as referral judge; Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (am, )
February 17, 2022 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Moore, Rosemary)
February 2, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Correction re #12 & #13 Conflict Disclosure Statement, to correct main pdfs previously attached by e-filer. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Main Document #12 , #2 Corrected Main Document #13 )(am, )
February 1, 2022 Filing 13 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Reichard Gregory Alan re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement,. (Peddy, Albry) (Main Document 13 replaced on 2/2/2022 to correct main pdf previously attached by e-filer) (am, ).
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 Conflict Disclosure Statement by Smith Hauling, Inc. re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Peddy, Albry) (Main Document 12 replaced on 2/2/2022 to correct main pdf previously attached by e-filer) (am, ).
January 25, 2022 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendants Smith Hauling, Inc. & Reichard Gregory Alan; Corporate Disclosures due by 2/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, )
January 25, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendants Reichard Gregory Alan & Smith Hauling, Inc.. (amf, )
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: it is ORDERED that any party wishing to provide such consent must complete the form and submit it to the Clerk of Court by 2/22/2022; The parties may electronically prepare and submit consent forms by logging into CM/ECF and selecting the Magistrate Judge Consent Form event; The parties may also submit consent forms via mail to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, One Church Street, Room B-110, Montgomery, AL 36104; The parties must not file consent forms into the record; the parties have the right to request reassignment of this case to a United States District Judge; Any party wishing to submit the reassignment form must mail it to the above address by 2/22/2022; The parties may not electronically submit reassignment forms. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/24/2022. (wcl, )
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: it is ORDERED that the parties shall file their Rule 26(f) report as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/22/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Stephen Michael Doyle on 1/24/2022. (wcl, )
January 21, 2022 ***PURSUANT TO THE #7 ANSWER - Attorney Rosemary Sizemore Moore for Reichard Gregory Alan and Smith Hauling, Inc. added. (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, )
January 21, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Reichard Gregory Alan, Smith Hauling, Inc..(Peddy, Albry)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Greg Reichard for Reichard Gregory Alan, served on 1/11/2022, answer due 2/1/2022. (amf, )
January 18, 2022 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons & #1 Complaint, signed by Smith Hauling for Smith Hauling, Inc., served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (amf, )
January 4, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Smith Hauling, Inc & Reichard Gregory Alan; mailed by CMRRR with #1 Complaint. (amf, )
January 4, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Emmanuel Bassaw. (wcl, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Emmanuel Bassaw. (wcl, )
January 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reichard Gregory Alan, Smith Hauling, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602065578.), filed by Emmanuel Bassaw. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt) (wcl, )
January 3, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Emmanuel Bassaw. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc #1 for pdf) (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bassaw v. Smith Hauling, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Bassaw
Represented By: Tracy Wayne Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Hauling, Inc.
Represented By: Albry Joe Peddy
Represented By: Rosemary Sizemore Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riechard Gregory Alan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reichard Gregory Alan
Represented By: Albry Joe Peddy
Represented By: Rosemary Sizemore Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?