Johnson v. Waawaatesi LLC et al
Plaintiff: Justin Johnson
Defendant: Waawaatesi LLC doing business as Greenline Loans, Jessi Lorenzo and Joseph Wildcat
Case Number: 3:2022cv00336
Filed: June 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to the #17 Motion to Dismiss on or by 8/16/2022. Defendants shall file a reply on or by 8/30/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 7/26/2022. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
July 25, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Improper Venue, and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, and to Compel Arbitration, and Consolidated Memorandum in Support Thereof by Jessi Lorenzo, Waawaatesi LLC, Joseph Wildcat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Raquel Bell)(Bolus, John)
July 12, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Justin Johnson. (Nicholas, Steven)
July 1, 2022 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jessi Lorenzo, Waawaatesi LLC, Joseph Wildcat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Raquel Bell, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Jessi Lorenzo)(Bolus, John)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension is GRANTED. The deadline for the Defendants to respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including 7/25/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 6/24/2022. (No PDF attached to this entry) (bes, )
June 23, 2022 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jessi Lorenzo, Waawaatesi LLC, Joseph Wildcat. (Bolus, John)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Defendants shall file a response to the Motion to Remand (Doc. #6 ) on or by 7/1/2022. Plaintiff may file a reply on or by 7/15/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 6/14/2022. (No pdf attached to this entry)(cwl, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jessi Lorenzo re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bolus, John) Modified on 6/14/2022 to add link (cwl, ).
June 13, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Joseph Wildcat re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bolus, John) Modified on 6/14/2022 to add link (cwl, ).
June 13, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Justin Johnson re #8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Nicholas, Steven) Modified on 6/13/2022 to add link (cwl, ).
June 13, 2022 Filing 8 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Justin Johnson. Corporate Disclosures due by 6/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Justin Johnson. (Nicholas, Steven)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Justin Johnson. (Nicholas, Steven)
June 8, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Waawaatesi LLC re #3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Bolus, John) Modified on 6/9/2022 to add link (cwl, ).
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDARD BRIEFING ORDER: Briefing deadlines and instructions for all pending and future motions. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr on 6/7/2022. (cwl, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Waawaatesi LLC, Jessi Lorenzo, Joseph Wildcat. Corporate Disclosures due by 6/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Conflict Statement Standing Order & Sample Format)(cwl, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 Case Assigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr as presiding Judge and Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams as referral Judge. (cwl, )
June 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Waawaatesi LLC, Jessi Lorenzo, Joseph Wildcat from Circuit Court of Russell County, case number 2022-900051.09. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AALMDC-3231584) , (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit C Declaration of Raquel Bell, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bolus, John) Modified on 6/3/2022 to remove against All Defendants and list them individually (cwl, ).
June 3, 2022 COMPLAINT FOR INDIVIDUAL AND CLASS RELIEF WITH JURY DEMAND against Jessi Lorenzo, Waawaatesi LLC, Joseph Wildcat, filed by Justin Johnson. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 -1 for pdf)(cwl, )
June 3, 2022 NOTICE of Filing to State Court by Jessi Lorenzo, Waawaatesi LLC, Joseph Wildcat re #1 Notice of Removal. (No pdf attached to this entry - see doc #1 for pdf) (cwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Waawaatesi LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Johnson
Represented By: Kenneth Joseph Riemer
Represented By: Steven Leon Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waawaatesi LLC doing business as Greenline Loans
Represented By: John Norman Bolus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessi Lorenzo
Represented By: John Norman Bolus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Wildcat
Represented By: John Norman Bolus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?