Ryles v. Taylor et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Sanford Leonard Ryles
Defendant: Heath Taylor, Mike Loyless, Kenneth Cook, Trevion Cabarrus, David M. Parker, Kevin C. Hagberg and Matthew Berger
Case Number: 3:2022cv00501
Filed: August 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance by Sanford Leonard Ryles re #3 Order. (amf, )
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing payment of initial partial filing fee of $10.72 be paid on or before 10/14/2022; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at North Alabama WR/CWC. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 9/23/2022. (furn: cashier) (wcl, )
September 12, 2022 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Sanford Leonard Ryles. (wcl, )
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by 9/272022, Plf must file a prison account statement from the inmate account clerk showing the average monthly balance and average monthly deposits in his prison account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this Complaint, as further set out in order; copy mailed to plf and account clerk at North Alabama WR/CWC. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 9/6/2022. (wcl, )
August 18, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Sanford Leonard Ryles. (bll, )
August 18, 2022 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Matthew Berger, Trevion Cabarrus, Kenneth Cook, Kevin C. Hagberg, Mike Loyless, David M. Parker, Heath Taylor, filed by Sanford Leonard Ryles. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sanford Leonard Ryles)(bll, ) Modified on 8/19/2022 to include jury demand text (amf, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryles v. Taylor et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanford Leonard Ryles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Loyless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevion Cabarrus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin C. Hagberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?