Thomas v. Jackson et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Jonathan Eugene Thomas
Defendant: Jake Jackson, Donald Carter and Walter Lee Gray, III
Case Number: 3:2022cv00662
Filed: November 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: W Harold Albritton
Referring Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #5 Order signed by Brandi Boutwell for Jake Jackson served on 1/6/2023, answer due 2/15/2023. (es, )
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT on or before 2/15/2023 as further set out in the order. The CLERK is DIRECTED not to accept any pleadings, motions, or other documents submitted by Plaintiff that do not comply with the FRCP and this Order. The CLERK is also DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and serve a copy of this Order and the Complaint by certified mail on Defendants Jackson and Carter. Copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to Defendants Jackson and Carter. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 1/4/2023. (dmn, )
January 4, 2023 Filing 4 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: the Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS as follows: 1. Plaintiff's 1983 conspiracy claims against Defendants Jackson and Carter be DISMISSED with prejudice before service of process under 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1); 2. All of Plaintiff's 1983 claims against Judge Walter Gray be DISMISSED with prejudice before service of process under 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) and (2); 3. Judge Walter Gray be TERMINATED as a party to this case; 4. This case be referred back to the undersigned for additional proceedings on Plaintiff's malicious prosecution claim against Defendants Jackson and Carter; Objections to R&R due by 1/18/2023. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 1/4/2023. (am, )
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Russell County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 12/8/2022. (Furnished: Cashier & Account Clerk @ RCJ) (am, )
November 15, 2022 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jonathan Eugene Thomas. (hrr, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2022: #1 Original Signature Page) (am, ).
November 15, 2022 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Donald Carter, Walter Lee Gray, III, Jake Jackson, filed by Jonathan Eugene Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(hrr, ) Modified on 11/16/2022 to remove the filing fee from the docket text (hrr, QC/WCL ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Jackson et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Eugene Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Lee Gray, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?