Davis v. Valley Police Dept et al (INMATE 2)
Plaintiff: Shaun D. Davis
Defendant: Valley Police Dept., Chambers County DTF, Chambers County Detention Facility, Alabama Bureau of Pardons and Paroles, Officer Stice, J Conway, Mike Reynolds, Lawrence Howell, S. Bullard, Corp Smith, Captain Thomas and Jonathan Allen
Case Number: 3:2023cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Partial Filing Fee Received: $ 14.00, receipt number 1619 (bes, )
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Received Initial Partial Filing fee: $ 75.00, receipt number 1423 (cwl, )
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Amend by Shaun D. Davis. (bes, )
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plf and account clerk at Fountain CF. Signed by Honorable Judge Kelly F. Pate on 1/11/2023. (Furn: Cashier) (bes, )
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:22-cv-01419. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Having carefully reviewed and considered materials in the file, including the report and recommendation, the court ADOPTS the magistrate judges' report and ACCEPTS his recommendations. Accordingly, the court TRANSFERS this case to the United States District Court for the Middle District. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this order to Mr. Davis. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/4/2023. (KSS) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.]
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes mailed doc #9 to plaintiff by USPS this day. (KS ) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.]
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to to R&R filed by Shaun D Davis. (KAM) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.]
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE Letter) re: Mobile Post Office mail by Shaun D Davis. (KSS) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.]
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONSE (Letter) to re #3 filed by Shaun D Davis. (KSS) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.]
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Court staff received a message from Davis in which he requests an extension of time to file objections to report and recommendation. Davis' verbal request for an extension is DENIED. Davis is ADVISED that he must file a written motion. Therefore Davis shall have seven days from the entry of this order to file a written motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 12/6/2022. (KSS) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.]
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes mailed doc # 5 to plaintiff by USPS this day. (KSS) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.]
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE (Letter) by Shaun D Davis.(KSS) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Based on the foregoing, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that this action is TRANSFERRED to the USDC for the Middle District of Alabama. The plaintiff must file any objections with the court within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/14/2022. (KSS) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.]
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Staff notes mailed doc # 3 to Davis by USPS this day. (KSS) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.]
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Shaun D Davis. (KSS) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.] Modified on 1/5/2023 to correct motion event & reopen motion (cwl, ).
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Shaun D Davis.(KSS) [Transferred from alnd on 1/5/2023.] Modified on 1/5/2023 to change text to reflect Inmate complaint (cwl, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2023: #1 Main Document (redacted)) (cwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Valley Police Dept et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun D. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chambers County DTF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chambers County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Bureau of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Stice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Bullard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corp Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?