UNUM Life Insurance Company of America v. Reynolds
Plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Donna Reynolds
Case Number: 3:2023cv00512
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2023 Filing 13 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donna Reynolds re #11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Sinclair, Thomas)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: it is ORDERED that plf Unum Life Insurance Company of America has until 11/3/2023, to correct the deficiency in its corporate disclosure statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/24/2023. (bes, )
October 20, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Donna Reynolds; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(WCL)
October 20, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (DFT) Donna Reynolds. (WCL)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: For good cause, it is ORDERED that the Defendant's #8 Motion for Extension to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED. The defendant shall file an answer or other response to the plaintiff's complaint on or before 11/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/20/2023. (No pdf attached) (WCL)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Donna Reynolds. (Sinclair, Thomas)
October 18, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Donna Reynolds served on 9/30/2023, answer due 10/23/2023. (Johnson, John)
August 31, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America re #4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Johnson, John) Modified on 9/1/2023 to add link (bes, ).
August 29, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Donna Reynolds.NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (bes, )
August 29, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America; Corporate Disclosures due by 9/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(bes, )
August 29, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. (bes, )
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jerusha T. Adams as Presiding Judge. (bes, )
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donna Reynolds ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AALMDC-3495702.), filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Johnson, John) (Attachment 4 replaced on 8/29/2023 to remove ability to edit PDF) (bes, ). Modified on 8/29/2023 (bes, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America v. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Henry Tonsmeire Morrissette
Represented By: John Stephen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Reynolds
Represented By: Thomas O'Neal Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?