Penn National Security Insurance Company v. McGuire et al
Plaintiff: Penn National Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Bedina McGuire and Gregory Dewayne Ledbetter
Case Number: 3:2023cv00514
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Kelly F Pate
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to #12 Counterclaim by Penn National Security Insurance Company.(Burford, Steve) Modified on 10/26/2023 to clarify text (cwl, ).
October 16, 2023 Filing 20 Conflict Disclosure Statement re #18 Order by Bedina McGuire. (LeMoine, Robert) Modified on 10/18/2023 add correct linkage, remove incorrect linkage & clarify text (am, ).
October 10, 2023 Filing 19 Conflict Disclosure Statement re: #19 Order by Gregory Dewayne Ledbetter. (Harper, Michael) Modified on 10/11/2023 to add order linkage (am, ).
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: The #15 & #16 corporate disclosure statements filed by Defendants do not identify their citizenship and, thus, fail to comply with Rule 7.1(a)(2); it is ORDERED that by 10/17/2023, Defendants must correct this deficiency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 10/10/2023. (am, )
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form and send it to the Clerk of the Court by 10/31/2023, as further set out in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 10/10/2023. (am, )
October 6, 2023 Filing 16 Conflict Disclosure Statement re: #10 Notice of Deficiency by Bedina McGuire. (LeMoine, Robert) Modified on 10/10/2023 to add linkage (am, ).
October 6, 2023 Filing 15 Conflict Disclosure Statement re: #15 Notice of Deficiency by Gregory Dewayne Ledbetter. (Harper, Michael) Modified on 10/6/2023 to add linkage & clarify text (am, ).
October 6, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Gregory Dewayne Ledbetter. (am, )
October 6, 2023 Filing 13 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Gregory Dewayne Ledbetter; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/16/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(am, )
October 6, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Penn National Security Insurance Company by Gregory Dewayne Ledbetter.(Harper, Michael)
September 26, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Bedina McGuire. (am, )
September 26, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bedina McGuire; Corporate Disclosures due by 10/6/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(am, )
September 25, 2023 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to #2 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Penn National Security Insurance Company by Bedina McGuire.(LeMoine, Robert)
September 18, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Penn National Security Insurance Company. (Burford, Steve) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2023: #1 Corrected Certificate Certificate of Service) (amf, ).
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The #1 corporate disclosure statement filed by Plaintiff does not identify its citizenship and, thus, fails to comply with Rule 7.1(a)(2); it is ORDERED that by 9/25/2023, Defendant must correct this deficiency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate on 9/18/2023. (am, )
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Penn National Security Insurance Company. Bedina McGuire served on 9/2/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. (Burford, Steve)
August 30, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Gregory Dewayne Ledbetter, Bedina McGuire.NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (bes, )
August 30, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (PLF) Penn National Security Insurance Company. (bes, )
August 30, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kelly F. Pate as Presiding Judge. (bes, )
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Bedina McGuire, Gregory Dewayne Ledbetter filed by Penn National Security Insurance Company (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number AALMDC-3496314) 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 11/27/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burford, Steve) Modified on 8/29/2023 to add receipt info (bes, ). Modified on 8/29/2023 to remove as filed against the plaintiff, to add as filed against the defendants, & to correct spellings of party names (amf, ).
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Penn National Security Insurance Company. (Burford, Steve) Modified on 8/30/2023 to correct plf name (bes, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn National Security Insurance Company v. McGuire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn National Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Steve Ray Burford
Represented By: Brian Jefferson Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedina McGuire
Represented By: Robert LeMoine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Dewayne Ledbetter
Represented By: Michael Stephen Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?