Washington v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bertha Washington
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00681
Filed: November 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Jerusha T Adams
Referring Judge: Emily C Marks
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The Court construes the #18 notice as a motion to withdraw; Upon consideration of the motion, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the #18 motion to withdraw is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/20/2023. (am, )
December 20, 2023 *** Pursuant to the #20 Order- Attorney Karen Barth Menzies; Amy Marie Zeman; Eric Howard Gibbs and Matthew Palmer Lambert terminated. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (am, )
December 19, 2023 Notice construed as a MOTION to Withdraw Attorneys Zeman, Menzies, Gibbs, and Lambert, docketed pursuant to the #20 Order. (NO PDF - See doc #18 ) (am, )
December 19, 2023 Filing 19 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Bertha Washington re #9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Miceli, David) Modified on 12/20/2023 to add link (cwl, ).
December 19, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David Francis Miceli on behalf of Bertha Washington (Miceli, David)
December 4, 2023 ***Attorney W. McKinley Dunn added for Sanofi US Services Inc., and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #17 )
December 4, 2023 Filing 17 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Dunn, W.)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Now pending before the Court is a motion for Christopher P. Gramling and Matthew DePaz to withdraw as counsel, filed on 12/1/2023. (Doc. #15 ). Upon consideration of the motion, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that the motion to withdraw (doc. #15 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/4/2023. (dmn, )
December 4, 2023 *** Attorney Matthew Edward DePaz and Christopher Paul Gramling terminated pursuant to #16 Order. (dmn, ) (no pdf)
December 1, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Yearout, Christopher)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Before the Court is the Defendants' notice of a pending settlement (doc. #13 ), filed on 11/29/2023. The Defendants indicate that the parties are preparing a Master Settlement Agreement that will include the instant case. The Defendants request that the case be stayed through 5/24/2024. The notice indicates that the Plaintiff does not object. The Court construes this notice as a motion to stay proceedings. Upon consideration of the motion, and for good cause, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. The motion (doc. #13 ) is GRANTED, and this case is STAYED through 5/24/2024, pending settlement. 2. On or before 5/24/2024, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court of the status of their settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Emily C. Marks on 12/1/2023. (dmn, )
November 29, 2023 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (dmn, ) (no pdf, see Doc. #13 )
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings (Yearout, Christopher)
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Yearout on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Yearout, Christopher)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Sanofi US Services Inc., Defendant. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(dmn, )
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Defendant. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(dmn, )
November 22, 2023 Filing 9 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Bertha Washington, Plaintiff. Corporate Disclosures due by 12/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order and Sample Format)(dmn, )
November 20, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-14455. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to District of Alabama Middle. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, DOC 16511)(my) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
September 27, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(DePaz, Matt) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
December 18, 2017 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jjs) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
December 6, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (gk) [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]
December 4, 2017 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc. f/k/a Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6510021) filed by Bertha Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Karen Barth Menzies added to party Bertha Washington(pty:pla).(Menzies, Karen) Modified on 12/18/2017 (jjs). [Transferred from laed on 11/22/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Represented By: W. McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Represented By: W. McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Paul Gramling
Represented By: Matthew Edward DePaz
Represented By: Christopher C. Yearout
Represented By: W. McKinley Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Washington
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Matthew Palmer Lambert
Represented By: Amy Marie Zeman
Represented By: Eric Howard Gibbs
Represented By: David Francis Miceli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?