Edge v. Daechang Seat Corp USA
Plaintiff: Kimberley Edge
Defendant: Daechang Seat Corp USA
Case Number: 3:2023cv00684
Filed: November 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Chad W Bryan
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Prerequisites by Daechang Seat Corp USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge) (Scully, Matthew)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: The Court construes the Plaintiff's Response (Doc. #14 ) as including a motion for leave to file an amended complaint. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Motion for Leave is GRANTED, the Amended Complaint (Doc. #13 ) is accepted as filed, and the Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #7 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr. on 01/16/2024. (GGN)
January 11, 2024 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Kimberley Edge, as construed by the 15 Text Order. (NO PDF attached to this entry - see Doc. #14 for pdf) (GGN)
January 11, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Prerequisites Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Kimberley Edge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Calamusa, Rocco)
January 11, 2024 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Daechang Seat Corp USA, filed by Kimberley Edge. (Calamusa, Rocco) Modified on 1/16/2024 to add Jury Demand (GGN).
January 9, 2024 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge R. Austin Huffaker, Jr., as presiding and Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan, as referral. Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (GGN)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: the parties are hereby DIRECTED to complete and return the appropriate form so that it is received by the Clerk of Court on or before 1/12/2024, as further set out in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 12/29/2023. (ALM)
December 29, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Daechang Seat Corp USA. (ALM)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to the #7 motion no later than January 17, 2024. It is further ORDERED that any reply shall be filed within 7 days from the filing of Plaintiff's response. Unless expressly authorized by the court in advance, no further submissions will be accepted in support of, or in opposition to, the pending motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan on 12/27/2023. (GGN)
December 22, 2023 ***Pursuant to the #7 Motion - Attorney Ingu Hwang,Allison Hawkins for Daechang Seat Corp USA added. (NO PDF attached to this entry) (ALM)
December 22, 2023 Filing 8 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Daechang Seat Corp USA. (Scully, Matthew)
December 22, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Prerequisites by Daechang Seat Corp USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge) (Scully, Matthew)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberley Edge. Daechang Seat Corp USA served on 12/5/2023, answer due 12/26/2023. (Calamusa, Rocco)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Daechang Seat Corp USA.NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (ggn, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Kimberley Edge. (ggn, )
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Chad W. Bryan. (ggn, )
November 27, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Kimberley Edge. (Calamusa, Rocco)
November 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Daechang Seat Corp USA (Filing fee $402 receipt number AALMDC-3542721.), filed by Kimberley Edge. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 2/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons)(Calamusa, Rocco) Modified on 11/28/2023 to add jury demand (am, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edge v. Daechang Seat Corp USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley Edge
Represented By: Rocco Calamusa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daechang Seat Corp USA
Represented By: Allison Hawkins
Represented By: Ingu Hwang
Represented By: Matthew Taylor Scully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?