Dillon v. Lee County Detention Center (INMATE 4)
Plaintiff: Matthew Dillon
Defendant: Lee County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2024cv00084
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: Myron H Thompson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 No objections received re #4 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. (no pdf attached to this entry) (GGN)
March 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice. It is ORDERED that any objections to this Recommendation must be filed no later than March 29, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 03/15/2024. (GGN)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: it is ORDERED that by February 29, 2024, Dillon shall either (1) pay the $405 filing and administrative fees or (2) file a properly completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by a prison account statement from the account clerk at the facility where Dillon is detained, as further set out in order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to (1) provide Dillon with the form for application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) provide a copy of this order to the inmate account clerk at the facility where Dillon is detained, as further set out in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/15/2024. (furn: cashier) (form and order mailed as directed)(GGN)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Lee County Detention Center, filed by Matthew Dillon. (NO IFP; NO FILING FEE)(HRR)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Copy of ORDER entered in 3:24-cv-67-RAH-JTA; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to: (1) Assign the present cause of action to Plaintiff Brian Henry Ritter. (2) Open separate civil actions for each remaining plaintiff named in the Complaint. (3) Place a copy of the Complaint (Doc. 1) and a copy of this Order in each newly opened civil action. (4) Assign the newly opened cases in accordance with the Court's normal assignment procedures. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 2/12/2024. (HRR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillon v. Lee County Detention Center (INMATE 4)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Dillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?