Hughes v. Lamar Advertising Company
Plaintiff: Bryan Hughes
Defendant: Lamar Advertising Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01481
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Alias Summons Issued as to Lamar Advertising Company via certified U.S. Mail on this the 26th day of September, 2019. (JLC)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Bryan Hughes as to Lamar Advertising Company. (JLC)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lamar Advertising Company via certified U.S. Mail on this the 6th day of September, 2019. Certified Mail Request filed within Complaint. (JLC)
September 6, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3428868, NDAL receipt #B4601100419. (JLC). (Clark, Brian) Modified on 9/6/2019 (JLC).
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lamar Advertising Company, filed by Bryan Hughes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Lamar Advertising Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Advertising Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Hughes
Represented By: Brian M Clark
Represented By: Charles E Robinson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?