Patrick v. City of Birmingham, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Earl Patrick
Defendant: City of Birmingham, Alabama, Annetta W Nunn and A.C. Roper
Case Number: 2:2009cv01825
Filed: September 14, 2009
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 169 MOTION for New Trial for reasons set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 6/4/2013. (JLC)
March 28, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. For the reasons stated in open Court and herein, the parties' motions in limine and unresolved objections are GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, RESERVED IN PART, and WITHDRAWN IN PART as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/28/2013. (JLC)
August 29, 2012 125 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 109 MOTION for Summary Judgment, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment, GRANTING 121 MOTION to Strike. Accordingly, counts IV, V, VI, and X of the Administrator's Second Amended Complaint are HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 8/29/2012. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick v. City of Birmingham, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Patrick
Represented By: Thomas F Talty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Birmingham, Alabama
Represented By: Frederic L Fullerton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annetta W Nunn
Represented By: Frederic L Fullerton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.C. Roper
Represented By: Frederic L Fullerton, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?