In Re Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406

Plaintiff: Plaintiffs' Counsel and Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel
Defendant: Anthem, Inc., BCBSM, Inc.,, Blue Cross Blue Shield Association, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Rhode Island, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Tennessee, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Vermont, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina, Blue Cross of Northeastern Pennsylvania, Blue Shield of California, Cambia Health Solutions, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., CareFirst, Inc., Consortium Health Plans, Inc., Defendants' Counsel, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., Hawaii Medical Service Association, Health Care Service Corporation and Caring for Montanan's, Inc., Highmark, Inc., Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, National Account Service LLC, Premera Blue Cross, Wellmark, Inc., Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCrossBlueShield, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraksa, Bluie Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Highmark Inc., Triple-S Salud, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, Highmark West Virginia Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan, HealthNow New York, Inc. d/b/a BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York and BlueShield of Northeastern New York, Optuminsight, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming, Caring for Montanans, Inc. f/k/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Montana, Inc., Cahaba Medical Care, Health Care Service Corporation and Highmark BCBSD Inc.
Respondent: Baycare Health System, Inc.
Special Master: Special Master
In Re: Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406
Case Number: 2:2013cv20000
Filed: January 8, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 12/21/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
December 21, 2017 1851 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 14, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam and Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number (205) 278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 1/11/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/21/2018. (MRR, )
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 1850 TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on January 11, 2018, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L. Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama, before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on December 20, 2017. (JTS)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 1849 ORDER re #1816 SEALED MOTION Challenging Assertion of Privilege over Documents Produced by Defendants Anthem, Inc. and Capital Bluecross. The Court hereby ORDERS the following documents set out herein to be produced by Anthem and BCBSA for in camera review. The defendants may submit the documents for in camera review either by hand delivery or by overnight mail directly to Chambers, marked "Confidential, In Camera" by December 27, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/19/2017. (JLC, )
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order 1848 AMENDMENT TO DISCOVERY ORDER No. 76. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/18/2017. (KAM)
December 18, 2017 1847 STATUS REPORT Defendants' Justifications for Keeping Sealed Opposition and Reply Briefs Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion Challenging Privilege Assertions by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Donnell, Sarah)
December 15, 2017 1846 RESPONSE to Defendants' Seal Justifications filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Stokes, Tammy)
December 15, 2017 1845 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/7/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 1/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certification) (KAM, )
December 14, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 12/14/2017. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (ASL)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1844 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #1795 Subscribers' Supplemental Motion to Compel BCBS-AL to Produce Truven Data, per the agreement of parties at the weekly telephone conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on December 14, 2017. (JTS)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1843 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #1751 and #1753 Providers' Motion to Compel BCBS-AL to Produce Truven, Thompson Reuters, and Milliman Data, per the agreement of the parties at the weekly telephone conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on December 14, 2017. (JTS)
December 13, 2017 1842 Brief re #1832 Status Report, . (Stokes, Tammy)
December 13, 2017 1841 ***Document Sealed ***PLAINTIFFS'*** AMENDED Reply in support of Motion challenging assertion of privilege over documents produced by defendants Anthem, Inc and Capital BlueCross (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 Part 1, #6 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #7 Exhibit 5 Part 3) (KAM)
December 13, 2017 1840 ***Document Sealed **PLAINTIFFS'** Reply in support of Motion challenging assertion of privilege over documents produced by defendants Anthem, Inc and Capital Bluecross (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 part 3) (KAM)
December 12, 2017 1839 STATUS REPORT Justifications to Maintain Seal on Its Response to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion to Compel Truven Data and Accompanying Exhibit by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Burkhalter, Carl)
December 12, 2017 1838 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/7/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 1/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 certification) (KAM, )
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 1835 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 84 granting in part and denying in part #1779 Motion to compel; the motion is GRANTED insofar as Avantgarde is ORDERED to provide certification as to its discovery responses to BCBS-MIs August 21, 2017, discovery requests. Otherwise, the Motion is DENIED; Documents responsive to Categories 2 4, 6, and 7 simply are not relevant to the prioritized Alabama Action, and documents responsive to Category 5 already have been produced; The court further DENIES BCBS-MIs request for an additional deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/12/20107. (KAM)
December 11, 2017 1837 ***Document Sealed **DEFENDANT Capital BlueCross's** RESPONSE to plaintiffs' motion challenging assertion of privilege (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (KAM)
December 11, 2017 1836 ***Document Sealed **DEFENDANTS'** Opposition to plaintiffs' motion challenging assertion of privilege over document produced by defendant Anthem, Inc (KAM)
December 8, 2017 1834 Justifications for Keeping Sealed Plaintiffs' Motion Challenging Certain Clawback Requests of Inadvertently Produced Privileged Documents by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Donnell, Sarah) Modified on 12/11/2017 (JLC).
December 8, 2017 1833 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 30, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number (205) 278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 12/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/8/2018. (MRR, )
December 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 12/7/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
December 6, 2017 1832 STATUS REPORT Justification to Maintain Redaction and Seal on Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order 76 and Accompanying Exhibit by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Burkhalter, Carl)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 1831 DISCOVERY ORDER No 83 granting #1775 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants Structured Data Production, specifically as it relates to Anthem ; Anthem is directed to certify medical, pharmacy and capitation clams data truly does not exist and why search for this data is impractical and unnecessary; Search again for the missing total claims expense data for BCBS of GA and BCBS Healthcare Plan of Georgia Inc in accordance with the instructions set forth in this order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/6/2017. (KAM, )
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 1830 DISCOVERY ORDER No 82 - granting in part and denying in part #1740 Motion to Compel non-party medical provider, Baycare Health System, Inc., to produce documents response to a subpoena served on it by defendants on December 1, 2016, as well as produce a Rule 30(b)(6) witness for deposition testimony as further set out in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/6/2017. (KAM)
December 6, 2017 1829 STATUS REPORT on Late Production of Documents by Defendants by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Hellums, Christopher)
December 6, 2017 1828 ***Document Sealed **DEFENDANTS' Reply in support of its Motion to compel Avantgarde Aviation Inc (Attachments: #1 EX 5) (KAM, )
December 6, 2017 1827 MOTION to Seal /Maintain Seal on Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Reply in Support of Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Accompanying Exhibits by Cahaba Medical Care. (Brown, W)
December 5, 2017 1826 STATUS REPORT Justifications to Maintain Seal on Exhibit 1 to Subcriber Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion to Compel BCBSAL to Produce Truven Data by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Burkhalter, Carl)
December 5, 2017 1825 STATUS REPORT Subscriber Plaintiffs' Updated Report on Motion to Compel Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Identifying Data by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Ragsdale, Barry)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 1824 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 81 granting #1747 Sealed Motion BCBS of Michigan's Motion to Compel the Production of certain documents from Non-Party Provider Healthcare Authority of the City of Huntsville; Huntsville is ORDERED to produce (1) redacted copies of its payer contracts from January 1, 2010, to December 31, 2015, containing exclusivity provisions sufficient to identify only the payer identity and the exclusivity provision contained in the contract and (2) documents from January 1, 2010, to December 31, 2015, sufficient to show the necessity for the exclusivity provisions but redacted to prevent disclosure of rates negotiated to acquire the exclusivity provisions.Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigans Motion to Compel the Production of Documents from Non-Party Provider Cahaba Medical Care #1733 is GRANTED, and Cahaba is ORDERED to produce its Medicaid, Medicare, and commercial payer rates from January 1, 2008, to December 31, 2013 Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/5/2017. (KAM) Modified on 12/6/2017 (KAM, ).
December 5, 2017 1823 ***Document Sealed **BCBS of ALABAMA Response to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion to Compel Truven Data (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (KAM)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 1822 ORDER pending before the court is #1816 SEALED MOTION Plaintiffs Motion Challenging Assertion of Privilege over Documents Produced by Defendants Anthem, Inc. and Capital Bluecross; any responses are due no later than Monday, December 11, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. CST; dfts may submit challenged documents for in camera review by email; any reply is due by Wednesday, December 13, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. CST; Motion is set for argument on 12/14/2017 03:00 PM during the weekly telephone conference before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/5/2017. (KAM)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 1821 TEXT ORDER-By agreement of the parties, BCBS-AL's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Velezis (Doc. # 1759) is MOOT.Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/5/2017. (KAM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order 1820 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 80: - DENYING #1676 Motion to Compel. Documents required to be produced pursuant to this Order shall be produced by December 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/4/17. (SAC )
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order 1819 JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER: re #1811 Motion for Protective order is GRANTED as set out within. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/4/17. (SAC )
December 4, 2017 1818 RESPONSE in Support re #1741 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1667 Order (Discovery Order No. 76) filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Sooy, Kathleen)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order 1817 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 79: re #1681 Motion to Compel Third Party AvMed, Inc.- The motion is GRANTED as set out within. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/4/17. (SAC ) Modified on 12/4/2017 (SAC ).
December 1, 2017 1816 SEALED MOTION **SUBSCRIBER AND PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS' Motion Challenging Assertion of Privilege Over Documents Produced by Defendants Anthem, Inc and Capital Bluecross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(KAM)
December 1, 2017 1815 ***Document Sealed **SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' Opposition to BCBS-MI's Motion to Compelo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhbit B, #3 Exhibit C) (KAM, )
November 30, 2017 1814 REPLY to re #1765 Provider Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Unseal Transcript of November 13, 2017 Conference filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 1813 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 78 denying #1790 Motion for Protective Order ; The deposition of Community Health is ORDERED to proceed on December 6, 2017, as scheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/30/2017. (KAM)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 1812 TEXT ORDER re #1669 Subscribers' Status Report on Outstanding Structured Data, which was construed as a motion as to United and Viva by #1721 Order dated November 9, 2017. The issue is MOOT, per the discussions of the parties at the Discovery Status Conference held on November 30, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 30, 2017. (JTS)
November 30, 2017 1811 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Non-Party Subpoena to Peter Kilmartin by Peter Kilmartin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Plant, Adam)
November 30, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Status Conference held on 11/30/2017 and Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2017: re #1681 , #1733 , #1740 , #1747 , #1775 , #1790 ; argument by counsel; status updates; hrg adj (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (ASL)
November 30, 2017 1810 SEALED MOTION **BCBS MICHIGAN's MOTION to Compel Subscriber Plaintiffs to supplement their responses to defendants' first set of discovery requests pursuant to Discovery Order No. 75 by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(KAM)
November 29, 2017 1809 ***Document Sealed ** Subscriber & Provider Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Rule 72 Objection to discovery order 76 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (KAM, )
November 29, 2017 1808 Opposition to re #1790 Provider Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order Barring the Deposition of Community Health Systems filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Sooy, Kathleen)
November 29, 2017 1807 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1742 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Rule 72 Objection, or Alternatively, to Treat Their Motion for Reconsideration as a Rule 72 Objection filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hellums, Christopher)
November 29, 2017 1806 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re #1775 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Structured Data Production by Subscriber Plaintiffs (Ragsdale, Barry)
November 29, 2017 1805 ***Document Sealed **Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Reply in support of its Motion to Compel the production of certain documents from non-party provider Healthcare Authority of the City of Huntsville (KAM)
November 29, 2017 1804 ***Document Sealed ** Blue Cross Blue Sheild of Michigan's REPLY in support of its Motion to Compel the production of documents from Non-Party Provider Cahaba Medical Care (KAM)
November 29, 2017 1803 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1775 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Structured Data Production filed by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCrossBlueShield. (Clark, Anna)
November 29, 2017 1802 RESPONSE to Motion re #1775 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Structured Data Production filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Norman, Brian)
November 29, 2017 1801 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1775 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Structured Data Production filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Hoover, Craig)
November 29, 2017 1800 RESPONSE to re #1765 Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal Transcript of November 13, 2017 Conference filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Laytin, Daniel)
November 29, 2017 1799 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan re: #1773 Response in Opposition to Motion, #1740 MOTION to Compel Baycare Health System Inc. filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan. (Campbell, Andrew)
November 29, 2017 1798 RESPONSE to Motion re #1765 MOTION to Unseal Document #1734 Transcript,,, Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal Transcript of November 13, 2017 Conference filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Kurtz, Glenn)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1797 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed by attorney J. Allen Schreiber. #1794 The Motion #1794 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate attorney Schreiber. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/28/2017. (KAM, )
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1796 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on (a) Subscriber Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response Regarding Subpoenas to Alabama Department of Insurance #1772 and (b) BCBS-AL's Reply to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Consolidated Response Regarding Subpoenas to Alabama Department of Insurance. #1793 In light of those filings #1772 #1793 : (1) BCBS-AL's Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Alabama Department of Insurance #1723 and (2) the Alabama Department of Insurance's Motion to Quash Subpoenas or for Protective Order #1762 are MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/28/2017. (KAM, )
November 28, 2017 1795 SEALED MOTION ** Subscriber Plaintiffs' Supplemental Motion to Compel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to produce Truven Data. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(KAM)
November 28, 2017 1794 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Schreiber, J)
November 28, 2017 1793 ***Document Sealed **BCBS of Alabama's Reply to Subscriber Plaintiffs' consolidated response regarding subpoenas to Alabama Department of Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (KAM)
November 28, 2017 1792 REPLY to re #1681 Motion to Compel Third Party AvMed, Inc. filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Cottrell, Christa)
November 28, 2017 1791 Opposition to Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel BCBSAL to Produce Truven, Thompson Reuters, and Milliman Data filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Malatesta, John)
November 27, 2017 1790 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of Community Health Systems (Provider Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, W)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 1789 TEXT ORDER re #1779 Defendant BCBS-MI's Motion to Compel Avantgarde Aviation, Inc. Any response to the motion is due no later than December 1, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. CST. A reply, if any, is due no later than December 6, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. CST. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 27, 2017. (JTS)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 1788 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENTfor services rendered and expenses incurred from October 1, 2017 through October 31, 2017 in this matter relating solely to services provided to the Plaintiffs, and totaling $53,000.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/27/2017. (KAM, )
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 1787 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from October 1, 2017 through October 31, 2017 in this matter as it relates to services rendered for both sides of the case, and totaling $14,000.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/27/2017. (KAM)
November 24, 2017 1785 STATUS REPORT Justifications to Maintain Redactions and Seals on Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel BCBSAL to Produce Truven, Thompson Reuters, and Milliman Data and Accompanying Exhibits by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Burkhalter, Carl)
November 24, 2017 1784 STATUS REPORT Justifications to Maintain Seals on Certain Exhibits Contained in Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel BCBSAL to Comply with its Rule 30(b)(6) Obligations by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Burkhalter, Carl)
November 22, 2017 1786 ***Document Sealed ** Third Party Provider Cahaba Medical Care's Response in Opposition to Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (KAM)
November 22, 2017 1783 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' and Defendants' Joint Status Report on Post-December 1, 2017 Depositions by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (West, Kimberly)
November 22, 2017 1782 RESPONSE to Motion re #1747 SEALED MOTION Provider Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents From Huntsville Hospital filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Brown, W)
November 22, 2017 1781 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1733 SEALED MOTION Third Party Provider Cahaba Medical Care's Response in Opposition to Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents (Redacted) filed by Cahaba Medical Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, W)
November 22, 2017 1780 ***Document Sealed ** SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS'** Exhibit A to Motion and Incorporated Memorandum to Compel Defendants' Structured Data Production #1775 (KAM, )
November 22, 2017 1778 RESPONSE to Motion re #1747 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville. (Kelly, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2017 1777 MOTION to Seal Motion of Non-Party to Maintain Seal, And For Other Relief by Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville. (Kelly, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2017 1776 STATUS REPORT Subscriber Plaintiffs' Report On Outstanding Non-Party Structured Data by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Hellums, Christopher)
November 22, 2017 1775 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Structured Data Production by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
November 22, 2017 1774 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1759 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Velezis filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ragsdale, Barry)
November 22, 2017 1773 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1740 MOTION to Compel Baycare Health System Inc. filed by Baycare Health System, Inc.. (White, James)
November 22, 2017 1772 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1723 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Alabama Department of Insurance, #1762 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
November 21, 2017 1779 ***Document Sealed **Defendant BCBS of Michigan's MOTION TO COMPEL Avantgarde Aviation Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (KAM, ) Modified on 11/27/2017 (KAM, ).
November 21, 2017 1771 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel Notice of Joinder in Motion to Unseal Transcript of November 13, 2017 Conference (Hellums, Christopher)
November 21, 2017 1770 MOTION Maintain Seal re #1733 SEALED MOTION Third Party Provider Cahaba Medical Care's Motion to Maintain Seal on Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Accompanying Exhibits by Cahaba Medical Care. (Brown, W)
November 21, 2017 1769 RESPONSE to the Court's November 9, 2017 Order filed by VIVA Health Inc.. (Ezelle, Jay)
November 21, 2017 1768 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1681 MOTION to Compel Third Party AvMed, Inc. filed by AvMed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Treadwell, Raymond)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 1767 ORDER granting #1661 Motion to Compel; granting #1663 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/21/2017. (KAM, )
November 21, 2017 1766 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/16/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christina Decker. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 12/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2018. (KAM)
November 21, 2017 1765 MOTION to Unseal Document #1734 Transcript,,, Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal Transcript of November 13, 2017 Conference by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Brown, W)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 1764 TEXT ORDER re #1674 Order dated November 6, 2017. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229), which was previously scheduled for 1:00 p.m. on November 30, 2017, is RESET for 10:00 a.m. on November 30, 2017, in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L. Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama, before the undersigned. Court reporter to be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 21, 2017. (JTS)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 1763 ORDER APPOINTING PRIVILEGE MASTER - Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 53, and with the agreement of the Parties, the court hereby APPOINTS R. Bernard Harwood, Jr., to serve as a Privilege Master in this action with regard to privilege log related issues. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/20/2017. (KAM, )
November 20, 2017 1762 MOTION for Protective Order by Alabama Department of Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(McDonald, John)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 1761 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on BCBS-AL's Motion to Quash Subpoenas to the Alabama Department of Insurance. #1723 Any response to the Motion is due on or before November 22, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. CST. A reply, if any, is due on or before November 29, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. CST. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/20/2017. (KAM)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 1760 TEXT ORDER re #1759 BCBS-AL's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Velezis. Any response to the motion is due no later than November 22, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. CST. A reply, if any, is due no later than November 29, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. CST. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 17, 2017. (JTS)
November 17, 2017 1759 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Michael Velezis by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burkhalter, Carl)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 1758 ORDER re #1741 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1667 Order (Discovery Order No. 76) filed by Defendants' Counsel, and #1742 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Rule 72 Objection, or Alternatively, to Treat Their Motion for Reconsideration as a Rule 72 Objection filed by Defendants' Counsel. The Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 72 Objection (doc. 1742) is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. To the extent the Motion requests an extension of time to file a Rule 72 objection, the Motion is DENIED. To the extent the Motion requests the Motion to Reconsider Discovery Order No. 76 (doc. 1741) be treated as a Rule 72 objection, the Motion is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/17/2017. (JLC)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 1757 TEXT ORDER re #1739 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Updated Status Report on Outstanding Structured Data. To the extent the Subscriber Plaintiffs wish to file any motions regarding any outstanding structure data issues, the motions may be filed no later than November 22, 2017, per the discussions of the Status Conference held on November 16, 2017. If a motion is filed, any response is due no later than November 29, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. CST. No replies will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 17, 2017. (JTS)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 1756 TEXT ORDER re #1751 #1753 Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel BCBS-AL to Produce Truven, Thompson Reuters, and Milliman Data and #1750 #1752 Motion to Compel BCBS-AL to Comply With its Rule 30(b)(6) Obligations. Any responses to the motions are due November 28, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. CST. Pursuant to the Discovery Status Conference held on November 17, 2017, no replies will be filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 17, 2017. (JTS)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 1755 TEXT ORDER re #1733 BCBS-MI's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents from Non-Party Provider Cahaba Medical Care, #1740 Defendants' Motion to Compel Baycare Health System, Inc., and #1747 BCBS-MI's Motion to Compel the Production of Certain Documents from Non-Party Provider Healthcare Authority of the City of Huntsville. Any responses to the motions are due no later than November 22, 2017, at 5:00 p.m. CST. Replies, if any, are due no later than November 29, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. CST. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 17, 2017. (JTS)
November 17, 2017 1754 RESPONSE to re #1746 / Defendant Anthem Inc.'s Response to the Subscriber Plaintiffs' Status Report Regarding Newly Produced Document Relating to Anthem's Chronology filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Kurtz, Glenn)
November 16, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam and Judge R. David Proctor: Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on 11/16/2017. (Court Reporter Christina Decker) (ASL)
November 16, 2017 1753 MOTION to Compel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Truven, Thompson Reuters, and Milliman Data (Redacted) (Provider Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Whatley, Joe)
November 16, 2017 1752 MOTION to Compel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Comply With Its Rule 30(b)(6) Obligations (Redacted) (Provider Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Whatley, Joe)
November 16, 2017 1751 SEALED MOTION ** PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS'** Motion to Compel Blue Corss and Blure Shield of Alabama to produce Truven, Thompson Reuters and Milliman Data. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(KAM)
November 16, 2017 1750 SEALED MOTION **PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS'** Motion to Compel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to comply with its Rule 30(B0(6) obligations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(KAM)
November 16, 2017 1749 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey John Fowler on behalf of Caring for Montanans, Inc. f/k/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Montana, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation (Fowler, Jeffrey)
November 16, 2017 1748 STATUS REPORT Regarding Sampling Process by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Ragsdale, Barry)
November 16, 2017 1747 SEALED MOTION to Compel the production of certain documents from the Non-Party Provider Healthcare Authority of the City of Huntsville by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan. (KAM, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2017: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (KAM, ).
November 16, 2017 1746 ***Document Sealed - SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' Status Report regarding newly produced document relating to Anthem's chronology (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (KAM, )
November 16, 2017 1745 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1742 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Rule 72 Objection, or Alternatively, to Treat Their Motion for Reconsideration as a Rule 72 Objection (Joint) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, W)
November 16, 2017 1744 REPLY to re #1680 Defendants' Corrected Reply Regarding Third-Party Depositions filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Cottrell, Christa)
November 16, 2017 1743 REPLY to re #1680 Defendants' Reply Regarding Third-Party Depositions filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Cottrell, Christa)
November 15, 2017 1742 MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Rule 72 Objection, or Alternatively, to Treat Their Motion for Reconsideration as a Rule 72 Objection by Defendants' Counsel. (Sooy, Kathleen)
November 15, 2017 1741 MOTION for Reconsideration re #1667 Order (Discovery Order No. 76) by Defendants' Counsel. (Sooy, Kathleen) Modified on 11/27/2017 (KAM, ).
November 15, 2017 1740 MOTION to Compel Baycare Health System Inc. by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Campbell, Andrew)
November 15, 2017 1739 STATUS REPORT on Outstanding Structured Data (Subscriber Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Hellums, Christopher)
November 15, 2017 1738 ***Document Sealed ** SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS** Unredacted version of their Reply is Support of their Motion to Compel Production of BCBS-AL's Statements in Connection with the Consent Order. (KAM)
November 15, 2017 1737 ***Document Sealed **SUBSCRIBER PLANTIFFS** unredacted version of the Reply in Support of Their Omnibus Motion to Compel (KAM)
November 15, 2017 1736 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel re: #1676 MOTION to Compel Subscriber Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Compel Remaining Filed Rate Discovery filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
November 15, 2017 1735 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel re: #1661 MOTION to Compel Production of BCBS-AL's Statements in Connection with the Consent Order [REDACTED] REDACTED filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
November 15, 2017 1734 SEALED Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/13/2017, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 12/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2018. (KAM, )
November 14, 2017 1733 SEALED MOTION to COMPEL the production of documents from non-party provider Cahaba Medical Care by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(KAM, )
November 14, 2017 1732 STATUS REPORT BCBSAL's Justifications to Maintain Seal on Exhibit Contained in Subscriber Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Compel Remaining Filed Rate Discovery by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Burkhalter, Carl)
November 14, 2017 1731 RESPONSE to re #1680 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Response Regarding Remaining Depositions filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Hellums, Christopher)
November 14, 2017 1730 RESPONSE to re #1680 Defendants' Notice Regarding Remaining Third-Party Depositions (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Brown, W)
November 13, 2017 1729 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/9/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 12/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certification page) (KAM, )
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 1728 ORDER APPOINTING SEAL MASTER - the Court appoints R. Bernard Harwood, Jr to serve as a Seal Master in this action with regard to seal-related issues. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/13/2017. (KAM)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 1727 DISCOVERY ORDER No 77 - denying #1610 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/13/2017. (KAM)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 1726 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #1670 and #1672 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of BCBS-AL's Documents About Out-of-State Sales of Insurance Services, per the agreement of the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 13, 2017. (JTS)
November 13, 2017 1725 Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Compel Remaining Filed Rate Discovery filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Burkhalter, Carl)
November 13, 2017 1724 Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of BCBSAL's Statement in Connection with Consent Order filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burkhalter, Carl)
November 13, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 11/13/2017. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (KLL)
November 13, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings (see order #1720 ): Motion Hearing #1681 set for Thursday, 11/30/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. (ASL)
November 10, 2017 1723 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas to Alabama Department of Insurance by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Burkhalter, Carl)
November 10, 2017 1722 STATUS REPORT BCBSAL's Justifications to Maintain Seal on Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Exhibit by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Burkhalter, Carl)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 1721 ORDER re #1669 Status Report; response is due no later than 11/21/17; reply, if any, is due no later than 11/28/17; court will hear argument regarding the issue on 11/30/17 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/9/2017. (ASL)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 1720 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #1681 MOTION to Compel Third Party AvMed, Inc: Motion Hearing set for Thursday, 11/30/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3B, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/9/2017. (ASL) Modified on 11/13/2017 (ASL).
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 1719 TEXT ORDER re #1680 Defendants' Notice Regarding Remaining Third-Party Depositions. A response is due no later than November 14, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. A reply, if any, is due no later than November 16, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. The issue is set for argument on November 16, 2017, at 2:00 P.M. in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L. Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama, before the undersigned, as set by the Order dated November 6, 2017 (doc. #1674 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 9, 2017. (JTS)
November 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 11/9/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 1718 TEXT ORDER amending 1677 Order. A response to #1676 & #1678 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Compel Remaining Filed Rate Discovery is due no later than Monday, November 13, 2017, at 12:00 p.m. A reply, if any, is due no later than Wednesday, November 15, 2017, at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 9, 2017. (JTS)
November 8, 2017 1717 NOTICE by Caring for Montanans, Inc. f/k/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Montana, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation Certification of Privilege Review Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Hogewood, Mark)
November 8, 2017 1716 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming's Certification of Consolidated Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Sooy, Kathleen)
November 8, 2017 1715 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel of Noridian Mutual Insurance Company's Certification of Consolidated Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Sooy, Kathleen)
November 8, 2017 1714 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel of HealthNow New York Inc.'s Certification of Consolidated Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Sooy, Kathleen)
November 8, 2017 1713 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska's Certification of Consolidated Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Sooy, Kathleen)
November 8, 2017 1712 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel of Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc.'s Certification of Consolidated Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Sooy, Kathleen)
November 8, 2017 1711 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City's Certification of Consolidated Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Sooy, Kathleen)
November 8, 2017 1710 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc.'s Certification of Consolidated Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Sooy, Kathleen)
November 8, 2017 1709 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona's Certification of Consolidated Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Sooy, Kathleen)
November 8, 2017 1708 NOTICE by Highmark BCBSD Inc., Highmark Inc., Highmark West Virginia Inc. Certification Regarding Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Hogewood, Mark)
November 8, 2017 1707 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel USAble's Certification Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Naranjo, Michael)
November 8, 2017 1706 NOTICE by Premera Blue Cross CERTIFICATION PURSUANT TO DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 76 (Payton, Gwendolyn)
November 8, 2017 1705 NOTICE by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCrossBlueShield NOTICE by Excellus BlueCertification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Clark, Anna)
November 8, 2017 1704 NOTICE by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama Certification Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Malatesta, John)
November 8, 2017 1703 NOTICE by Triple-S Salud, Inc. Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1702 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1701 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Horizon Blue Cross Blue Shield of New Jersey Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1700 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Hawaii Medical Service Association Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1699 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Cambia Health Solutions Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1698 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1697 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1696 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel BlueCross BlueShield of South Carolina Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1695 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1694 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel BlueCross BlueShield of North Carolina Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1693 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Blue Cross Blue Shield of Mississippi Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1692 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1691 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1690 Evidentiary Material Certification of CareFirst, Inc.'s, Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.'s, CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.'s, and CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc.'s Privilege Logs in Response to Discovery Order No. 76. (Norman, Brian)
November 8, 2017 1689 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1688 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Blue Cross Blue Shield of Florida Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1687 NOTICE by Anthem, Inc. Certification of Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Cohen, Lucile)
November 8, 2017 1686 NOTICE by Blue Shield of California Certification of Blue Shield of California's Cumulative Privilege Log Pursuant to Discovery Order No. 76 (Fronk, Casey)
November 8, 2017 1685 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Certification Pursuant To Discovery Order No. 76 On Behalf Of Independence Hospital Indemnity Plan, Inc. (Oppenheimer, Brooke)
November 8, 2017 1684 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan of Personal Certification regarding BCBS Michigan's Privilege Log (Campbell, Andrew)
November 8, 2017 1683 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel re #1667 Order Certification of Compliance with Discovery Order No. 76 (Donnell, Sarah)
November 8, 2017 1682 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Certification Pursuant To Discovery Order No. 76 On Behalf Of Capital BlueCross (Spotswood, Robert)
November 8, 2017 1681 MOTION to Compel Third Party AvMed, Inc. by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Cottrell, Christa)
November 8, 2017 1680 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Regarding Remaining Third-Party Depositions (Cottrell, Christa)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order 1679 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Production of BCBS-ALs Statements in Connection with the Consent Order. (Docs. # 1661 (redacted) and 1663 (sealed)). BCBS-AL's response is due no later than 12:00 noon on Monday, November 13, 2017. Any reply is due no later than 12:00 noon on November 15, 2017. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/8/2017. (KAM)
November 7, 2017 1678 SEALED MOTION ** SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS'** Omnibus Motion To Compel Remaining Filed Rate Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C)(KAM)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order 1677 TEXT ORDER re #1676 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Compel Remaining Filed Rate Discovery. Any response is due no later than November 10, 2017. Movant's reply, if any, is due no later than November 14, 2017. The Motion is set to be heard on November 16, 2017, at the Special Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on November 7, 2017. (JTS)
November 7, 2017 1676 MOTION to Compel Subscriber Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion to Compel Remaining Filed Rate Discovery by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ragsdale, Barry)
November 6, 2017 1675 ***Document Sealed - ANTHEM's Notice in compliance with the 11/3/2017 Order (Attachments: #1Anthem Chronology for MDL plaintiffs) (KAM,)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 1674 ORDER Special Status Conference set for 11/16/2017 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam.. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/6/2017. (KAM, )
November 6, 2017 1673 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel of Provider Plaintiffs' Response to Randall Abbott's Letter Motion of November 3, 2017 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Quillen, Henry)
November 3, 2017 1672 SEALED MOTION **SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS'** Motion to Compel Production of BCBS-AL's Documents about out-of-state sales of insurance services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(KAM)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 1671 ORDER: re #1658 Plaintiffs Motion to Enforce this Court's Previous Directive is GRANTED. By agreement, Anthem will prepare from its proposed chronology a new document, in the nature of a privilege log, reflecting a chronology of mediation-related disclosures. The log should indicate the date of the mediation-related disclosure, the type of communication, and identify the persons involved. Anthem SHALL file this document, under seal, on or before 12:00 noon on Tuesday, November 7, 2017. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/3/17. (SAC)
November 3, 2017 1670 MOTION to Compel Production of BCBS-AL's Documents About Out-of-State Sales of Insurance Services by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Ragsdale, Barry)
November 3, 2017 1669 STATUS REPORT on Outstanding Structured Data (Subscriber Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Hellums, Christopher)
November 3, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Telephone Conference held on 11/3/2017. (KLL)
November 1, 2017 1668 RESPONSE to Motion re #1658 MOTION to Enforce This Court's Previous Directive filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Kimble, Cavender)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1667 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 76, Protocols for Handling Privileged Documents, Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 11/1/17. (SAC )
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1666 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce this Court's Previous Directive. (Doc. # 1658). Anthem SHALL respond to Plaintiffs' Motion on or before 3:00 p.m. Central Time on Thursday, November 2, 2017. This issue is SET for a telephone conference at 10:00 a.m. Central Time on Friday, November 3, 2017. Representative counsel for Anthem and Plaintiffs, SHALL attend the telephone conference. To preserve confidentiality on this issue, the court requests that the Special Master distribute a call-in number to participating counsel only. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 11/1/2017. (KAM)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1665 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 75 granting #1463 Defendants' Sealed Motion to compel; Provider Plaintiffs are ORDERED to supplement their answers to the discrete subparts of Interrogatory No. 1 concerning RFAs Nos. 1 through 5, providing any unique facts and evidence that each Provider may possess that explain how the rules covered by RFA Nos. 1 through 5 affected any defendants conduct.2 If a Provider does not possess such unique facts and evidence beyond the general response supplied for all Providers, that Provider is ORDERED to admit the lack of such unique fact or evidence. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/31/2017. (KAM)
October 31, 2017 1664 STATUS REPORT Justifications to Maintain Seal on Subscriber Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Burkhalter, Carl)
October 31, 2017 1663 SEALED MOTION ***SUBCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' Motion to Compel Production of BCBS-AL's Statements in Connection with the Consent Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(KAM)
October 31, 2017 1662 STATUS REPORT Justification to Maintain Redactions Contained in Subscriber Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Motion for Reconsideration by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Clawback Letter)(Burkhalter, Carl)
October 31, 2017 1661 MOTION to Compel Production of BCBS-AL's Statements in Connection with the Consent Order [REDACTED] by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ragsdale, Barry)
October 31, 2017 1660 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Justin Kapatkin on behalf of Defendants' Counsel (Kapatkin, Brian)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 1659 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 74 granting #1612 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Dft BCBSAL to produce identifying data; Subscribers and BCBSAL have agreed on the production of an explanation of or a decipher of the Coverage Code Data, BCBSAL is ORDERED to produce such explanation or decipher as soon as possible. Within seven (7) days of receipt of said explanation or decipher, the plaintiffs are ORDERED to inform BCBSAL whether the explanation or decipher resolves the issue, and if the explanation or decipher fails to resolve the issue, to Meet and Confer with BCBSAL; If the Meet & Confer confirms that the data cannot be feasibly exported or produced, the plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a status report suggesting feasible ways the data may be produced.. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/31/2017. (KAM, )
October 30, 2017 1658 MOTION to Enforce This Court's Previous Directive by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Whatley, Joe)
October 30, 2017 1657 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/26/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 11/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 certification) (KAM, )
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 1656 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 73. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/27/2017. (KAM, )
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 1655 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 72 granting #1615 Motion to Compel ; The parties are further ORDERED to schedule a deposition to be held by November 15, 2017, at a time and place reasonably convenient to Abbott. Nonparty witness Robert Abbott is hereby ORDERED to comply with the subpoena served upon him and to appear and testify as required by law by not later than November 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/27/2017. (KAM)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 1654 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on BCBSAL's Motion to Maintain Seal. #1653 The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the Motion. #1653 The parties may respond, and the court will expect the Seal Team's report in due course. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/27/2017. (KAM)
October 26, 2017 1653 MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Maintain Seal as to Exhibit Contained in Subscriber Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Document Under Seal by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Burkhalter, Carl)
October 26, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2017; re Motions 1463, 1610, 1612, 1615 and Privilege Logs (doc 1624). (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1652 ORDER re: Joint Status Report and chronologies submitted in camera; Telephone Conference set for 11/13/2017 10:00 AM before Judge R David Proctor.Counsel for Anthem and Cigna, and no more than two attorneys for the Association shall attend the conference; To preserve confidentiality on this issue, the court requests that the Special Master distribute a call-in number to participating counsel only. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/25/2017. (KAM)
October 24, 2017 1651 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel re: #1615 MOTION to Compel Attendance at a Deposition (Provider Plaintiffs') filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Whatley, Joe)
October 24, 2017 1650 ***Document Sealed*** SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' Reply Memorandum in support of motion to compel dft BCBSAL to produce identifying data (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (KAM)
October 24, 2017 1649 ***Document Sealed *** SUBSCRIBERT PLAINTIFFS' Unredacted Reply in Support of their motion for reconsideration of 10/28/2016 Order and Discovery Order No. 33 (KAM)
October 24, 2017 1648 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel re: #1635 Opposition (other), #1610 MOTION for Reconsideration re #815 Order Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Oct 28, 16 Order and Discovery Order No. 33 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 1647 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Seal Teams October 23, 2017 Report regarding various documents which can be unsealed. In light of that Report, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the following documents: Provider Plaintiffs Response in Opposition to BCBSMIs Motion to Compel, and Exhibit 1 #1614 [1614-1]; Subscriber Plaintiffs Unredacted Motion For Reconsideration of October 28, 2016 Order and Discovery Order No. 33, and Exhibits A and E #1611 [1611-1] [1611-2]; and Subscriber Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendant BCBSAL to Produce Identifying Data, and Exhibits A-E and I #1612 [1612-1] [1612-2] [1612-3] [1612-4] [1612-5] [1612-9].. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/24/2017. (KAM)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 1646 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from September 1, 2017 through September 30, 2017 in this matter relating solely to services provided to the Plaintiffs, and totaling $46,500.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/24/2017. (KAM, )
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 1645 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from 9/1/2017 through 9/30/2017 in this matter as it relates to services rendered for both sides of the case, and totaling $7,500.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/24/2017. (KAM, )
October 24, 2017 1644 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Notice of Correction to #1623 Joint Status Report on Privilege Logs filed by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCrossBlueShield. (Clark, Anna)
October 23, 2017 1643 STATUS REPORT BCBSA's Seal Justification for Doc. # 1624-3 and 1624-4 by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Donnell, Sarah)
October 23, 2017 1642 REPLY to re #1463 in Support of its Motion to Compel Provider Plaintiffs to Answer Discovery Requests filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Andrew)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 1641 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on BCBSAL's Motion to Maintain the Seal. #1636 The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the Motion. #1636 The parties may respond, and the court will expect the Seal Team's report in due course. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/23/2017. (KAM)
October 20, 2017 1640 NOTICE by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama Notice of Filing Corrected Exhibit B to its Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of October 28, 2016 Order and Discovery Order No.33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Burkhalter, Carl)
October 20, 2017 1639 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/19/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 11/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2018. (KAM, )
October 20, 2017 1638 STATUS REPORT Joint by Anthem, Inc.. filed by Anthem, Inc. (Kimble, Cavender)
October 19, 2017 1637 RESPONSE to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce Identifying Data filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Malatesta, John)
October 19, 2017 1636 MOTION to Seal BCBSAL's Motion to Maintain Seal as to Certain Exhibits to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burkhalter, Carl)
October 19, 2017 1635 Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of October 28, 2016 Order and Discovery Order No. 33 filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Burkhalter, Carl)
October 19, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 10/19/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
October 19, 2017 1634 ***Document Sealed **SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS'**Notice of Filing Corrected Exhibit G to the 10/12/2017 motion to compel BCBSAL to Produce Identifying Data (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit G) (KAM)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 1633 TEXT ORDER. Per the discussions of last two telephone conferences held on October 12 and 19, 2017, the parties have raised and discussed an issue related to BCBS-ALs request for a clawback of inadvertently disclosed privileged documents, and the parties agree that the issue is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on October 19, 2017. (JTS)
October 19, 2017 1632 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jennifer Williams (Eisler, Robert)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 1631 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Seal Teams October 19, 2017 Report regarding Cigna Corporations and Anthem Inc.s Stipulation Resolving Show Cause Order. #1602 In light of that Report, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the following document: Document No. 1602. #1602 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/19/2017. (KAM)
October 19, 2017 1630 RESPONSE to re #1628 Plaintiffs' Status Report filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Hoover, Craig)
October 19, 2017 1629 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Notice of Correction to Joint Status Report on Privilege Logs filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Priester, James)
October 18, 2017 1628 STATUS REPORT Regarding Authenticity and Admissibility by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry)
October 17, 2017 1627 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1623 Status Report, (Correction to Joint Status Report) (Ragsdale, Barry)
October 17, 2017 1626 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Cigna Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. #1625 The Motion #1625 is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to UNSEAL
October 16, 2017 1625 **CIGNA CORPORATION'S Unopposed Motion for leave to file the attached letter under seal (KAM) Document unsealed Modified on 10/17/2017 (KAM, ).
October 16, 2017 1624 ***Document Sealed **PLAINTIFFS' and DEFENDANTS' JOINT STATUS REPORT OF PRIVILEGE LOGS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit H) (KAM)
October 16, 2017 1623 STATUS REPORT on Behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendants Regarding Privilege Logs by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D (SEALED), #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H (SEALED), #6 Exhibit I)(Ragsdale, Barry)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 1622 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 71 re #1608 Notice (Other) filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel--Plaintiffs' request for additional time to take Carden deposition is GRANTED; Plaintiffs may use 3.5 additional hours for the deposition. Oral Motion by BCBS-AL to postpone Carden deposition GRANTED, to be re-scheduled by October 30, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/13/2017. (Putnam, T)
October 13, 2017 1621 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/12/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 11/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2018. (KAM, )
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 1620 TEXT ORDER re #1615 Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Attendance at a Deposition. Any response to the motion by Randall Abbott is due no later than October 19, 2017. Movant's reply, if any, is due by October 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on October 13, 2017. (JTS)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 1619 TEXT Order. Per the discussions during the October 12, 2017, telephone conference, the following briefing schedule is set for the clawback issue raised by the defendants: If the issue has not been resolved, the defendants shall file a Motion to Compel the clawback by no later than October 19, 2017, and a response from the plaintiffs to such a motion will be due by no later than October 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on October 12, 2017. (JTS)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 1618 TEXT ORDER re #1463 Defendant BCBS-MI's Motion to Compel Provider Plaintiffs to Answer Discovery Requests. Oral arguments are set for October 26, 2017, at the Status Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on October 12, 2017. (JTS)
October 12, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 10/12/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 1617 TEXT ORDER re #1610 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of October 28, 2016 Order and Discovery Order No. 33 and #1612 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant BCBSAL to Produce Identifying Data. Responses to each motion shall be filed no later than October 19, 2017, and replies, if any, shall be filed no later than October 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on October 12, 2017. (JTS)
October 12, 2017 1616 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1463 SEALED MOTION (Provider Plaintiffs') Public Version filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Whatley, Joe)
October 12, 2017 1615 MOTION to Compel Attendance at a Deposition (Provider Plaintiffs') by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Whatley, Joe)
October 12, 2017 1614 ***Document Sealed ** PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE in opposition to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's MOTION to COMPEL Provider Plaintiffs to answer discovery requests (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (KAM)
October 12, 2017 1613 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/5/2017, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 11/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/10/2018. (KAM, )
October 12, 2017 1612 SEALED MOTION **SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL defendant BCBSAL to produce identifying data. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(KAM)
October 11, 2017 1611 ***Document Sealed ** SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' Unredated Motion for reconsideration of October 28, 2016 Order and Discovery Order No. 33 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit E) (KAM, )
October 11, 2017 1610 MOTION for Reconsideration re #815 Order Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Oct 28, 16 Order and Discovery Order No. 33 by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sealed, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E - Sealed)(Ragsdale, Barry)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 1609 TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on October 26, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L. Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, Alabama, before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discover Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on October 11, 2017. (JTS)
October 11, 2017 1608 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel Regarding Request for Additional Deposition Time for BCBS-AL Witness Noel Carden (Ragsdale, Barry)
October 11, 2017 1607 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/4/2017, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 11/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/9/2018. (KAM, )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 1606 ORDER that the parties having reached an agreement; Anthems Motion to Enter its Proposed Order Regarding this Courts Show Cause Order Dated April 21, 2017 #1590 is MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/10/2017. (KAM)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 1605 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Seal Teams October 9, 2017 Report regarding Subscriber Plaintiffs' Unredacted Interim Report of Documents Relevant to BCBS-AL's Contacts with Prospective Class Members and Exhibits A and B thereto. In light of that Report, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the following documents and/or exhibits: Documents No. 1584, 1584-1, and 1584-2. #1584 [1584-1] [1584-2].. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/10/2017. (KAM, )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 1604 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1515 Motion for Protective Order without prejudice; The Motion sought five separate categories of relief. (Doc. # 1515 at 8). The requests for relief in categories 1, 2, 3 and 5 are DENIED; The request for relief sought in category 4 (responses to Plaintiffs requests for information) is GRANTED IN PART, as discussed more fully on the record in open court. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/10/2017. (KAM)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 1603 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS PRIVILEGE LOGS - As discussed on the record in open court, on or before Friday, October 13, 2017, the parties are ORDERED to (1) meet and confer to narrow and crystalize the disputes and (2) develop a process1 and schedule for resolving those disputes. On or before Monday, October 16, 2017, the parties SHALL file a joint report regarding a proposed process and schedule for resolving any privilege log disputes.Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/10/2017. (KAM)
October 10, 2017 1602 CIGNA Corporation and ANTHEM Inc's STIPULATION RESOLVING SHOW CAUSE ORDER (KAM) ** unsealed per order 1631 Modified on 10/19/2017 (KAM).
October 6, 2017 1601 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander McInnis Boies on behalf of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Boies, Alexander)
October 5, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 10/5/2017. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (KLL)
October 5, 2017 1600 TRANSFER ORDER OF THE UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION transferring 2 civil actions to be included in MDL 2406 BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD ANTITRUST LITIGATION (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(KAM)
October 4, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 10/4/2017. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (KLL)
October 3, 2017 1599 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Hammond on behalf of Anthem, Inc. (Hammond, Andrew)
October 3, 2017 1598 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel re: #1515 MOTION for Protective Order Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and Related Relief as to BCBS-AL's Contacts With Class Members filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
October 2, 2017 1597 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1592 MOTION for Joinder in Anthem's Motion to Enter its Proposed Order Regarding This Court's Show Cause Order Dated April 21, 2017, #1590 MOTION to Enter It's Proposed Order Regarding This Court's Show Cause Order dated April 21, 2017 filed by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Weller, Christopher)
October 2, 2017 1596 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-28-2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 10/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 certification) (KAM, ) Modified on 10/5/2017 (KAM, ).
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order 1595 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants' Motion to Keep Sealed Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. #1570 The Motion #1570 is DENIED. Although privileged or proprietary material filed with discovery motions is not subject to the common-law right of access, see Romero v. Drummond Co., 480 F.3d 1234, 1245 (11th Cir. 2007), the Motion to Reconsider #1542 does not disclose any privileged or proprietary material except through general (i.e., non-specific) reference. Therefore, the Clerk of the Court is directed to UNSEAL document 1542. #1542 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 10/2/2017. (KAM, )
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order 1594 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 70 denying #1496 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 10/2/2017. (KAM, )
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order 1593 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #1563 Subscribers Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Outstanding Data from Non-Party Humana, following the Discovery Status Conference held September 28, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on October 2, 2017. (JTS)
September 29, 2017 1592 MOTION for Joinder in Anthem's Motion to Enter its Proposed Order Regarding This Court's Show Cause Order Dated April 21, 2017 by Defendants' Counsel. (Laytin, Daniel)
September 29, 2017 1591 Brief re #1576 Status Report, in Opposition to Seal Request (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Quillen, Henry)
September 29, 2017 1590 MOTION to Enter It's Proposed Order Regarding This Court's Show Cause Order dated April 21, 2017 by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Kurtz, Glenn)
September 29, 2017 1589 Brief re #1576 Status Report, in Opposition to Seal Request. (Stokes, Tammy)
September 29, 2017 1588 STATUS REPORT Report Regarding Proposed Agenda and Dial-In Instructions for Status Conference on October 4 and 5 2017 by Special Master. filed by Special Master (Attachments: #1 Exhibit October 4 2017 Dial In Instructions, #2 Exhibit October 5 2017 Dial In Instructions)(Gentle, Edgar)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1587 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT of Edgar C. Gentle, III, the Court-Appointed Special Master, for payment for services rendered and expenses incurred from August 1, 2017 through August 31, 2017 in this matter as it relates to services rendered for both sides of the case, and totaling $4,500.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/28/2017. (KAM)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1586 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT of Edgar C. Gentle, III, the Court-Appointed Special Master, for payment for services rendered and expenses incurred from August 1, 2017 through August 31, 2017 in this matter relating solely to services provided to the Plaintiffs, and totaling $47,000.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/28/2017. (KAM, )
September 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference and Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2017; arguments by counsel, re #1496 MOTION for Protective Order re: Discovery of 61 Non-Alabama Subscriber Plaintiffs; hrg adj (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
September 27, 2017 1585 ***Document Sealed - DEFENDANTS' Notice of filing Exhibits in support of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama's Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order #1582 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F) (KAM)
September 27, 2017 1584 ***Document Sealed - Subscriber Plaintiff's Unredacted Interim Report of Documents Relevant to BCBS-AL's Contacts with Prospective Class Members #1515 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhbiit B) (KAM)
September 27, 2017 1583 STATUS REPORT Subscriber Plaintiffs' Interim Report on Documents Relevant to BCBS-AL's contacts with Prospective Class Members (Doc 1515) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (Sealed))(Ragsdale, Barry)
September 27, 2017 1582 Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Burkhalter, Carl)
September 27, 2017 1581 NOTICE of Informative Motion regarding Hurricane Maria by Triple-S Salud, Inc. (Pabon Rico, Gustavo) Modified on 9/27/2017 (ASL).
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order 1580 ORDER - Due to the number of items anticipated on the agenda for the October 5, 2017 status conference, the order setting the October 5, 2017 status conference is AMENDED as follows: this case has been SET for a status conference at 1:00 p.m. on Wednesday, October 4, 2017, and continuing at 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, October 5, 2017. Both sessions will take place in Courtroom 7A; The Special Master will provide call in numbers for the conference. On or before Friday, September 29, 2017, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed agenda and schedule for items the parties wish to be addressed during the status conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/26/2017. (KAM)
September 26, 2017 1579 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles J Cooper on behalf of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Cooper, Charles)
September 26, 2017 1578 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1563 MOTION to Compel Oustanding Data from Non-Party Humana (Subscriber Plaintiffs) Non-Party Humana Inc.'s Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Outstanding Data from Non-Party Humana filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Turner, Sara)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1577 ORDER REGARDING CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTERS RULE 72 OBJECTION TO DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 6 - for the reasons set forth in this order, Cedars-Sinai's Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 60 #1417 is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/25/2017. (KAM)
September 22, 2017 1576 STATUS REPORT Seal Justification for Doc. # 1555, 1556, and 1557 by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Exhibits to Remain Sealed, #2 Appendix B - Exhibits to Unseal, #3 Appendix C - 9/21/2017 MultiPlan Hubbard Affidavit)(Donnell, Sarah)
September 22, 2017 1575 STATUS REPORT Regarding Post-9/25 Discovery on Behalf of Plaintiffs and Defendants by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Ragsdale, Barry)
September 22, 2017 1574 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D Battin on behalf of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Battin, Timothy)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order 1573 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Seal Teams September 22, 2017 Report regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Certain Retrospective Rate Credit Documents and Exhibits 1, 2 and 3. In light of that Report, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the following documents and/or exhibits: Documents No.1528, 1528-1, 1528-2, and 1528-3. #1528 , [1528-1], [1528-2], and [1528-3]. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/22/2017. (KAM)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order 1572 ORDER denying #1542 Sealed Motion- Defendants Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts August 31, 2017 Privilege Ruling. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/22/2017. (KAM)
September 21, 2017 1571 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1496 MOTION for Protective Order re: Discovery of 61 Non-Alabama Subscriber Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Hellums, Christopher)
September 21, 2017 1570 DEFENDANTS' MOTION to Keep Sealed Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's August 31, 2017 Privilege Ruling re #1542 SEALED MOTION by Defendants' Counsel. (Laytin, Daniel) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
September 21, 2017 1569 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1392 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Anthem, Inc. Regarding Issues Decided in United States v. Anthem (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Whatley, Joe)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 1568 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 69 granting in part and denying in part #1528 Sealed Motion to Compel; Subscriber Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED as to this category of document requests, and BCBS-AL is DIRECTED to produce to the Subscribers such documents or other information BCBS-AL used to report or disclose to the Alabama Department of Insurance the formulas, methods, or manner in which the RRC and the RRC renewal credits were calculated for each class member merit group (groups of between 50 to 200 members) from 2009 to 2016; BCBS-AL is DIRECTED to produce such full reports to the Subscribers for the years 2009 to 2016, including any documents showing RRC true-ups during that period; Insofar as there exists a distinct and identifiable set of reports related to the calculation of each groups RRC, the motion to compel is GRANTED, and BCBS-AL is DIRECTED to produce such reports; the Subscriber Plaintiffs may, by October 2, 2017, identify to BCBS-AL the 30 merit groups with the greatest positive RRC in any single year of their choice (noting for BCBS-AL the year from which these merit groups were chosen). By October 20, 2017, BCBS-AL shall produce to the Subscribers such reports or spreadsheets as may exist showing the calculation of the renewal premiums for each of these 30 merit groups in each year from 2009 to 2016; Unless otherwise stated herein, production required by this Order shall be made by October 20, 2017. In all other respects, the motion to compel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/21/2017. (KAM)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 1567 THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - GRANTING Subscriber Plaintiffs' #1546 MOTION to Continue Class Certification Deadlines ; Fact Discovery shall be completed by 12/1/2017; Class Certification Discovery is due as set out in this order; Motions for class certification and materials in support shall be filed by 1/15/2018; opposition briefs are due by 4/3/2018; reply briefs are due by 5/18/2018; Daubert motions seeking to exclude any class certification expert witness SHALL be filed within seventy-five days of disclosure of the experts report; Damages and Merits Expert Reports and Discovery are due from plaintiffs on 1/31/2018; due from defendants on 4/3/2018; rebuttals from plaintiffs are due on 5/18/2018; Dispositive Motions on issues of Liability and materials in support are due on 4/13/2018; The court will set a pretrial conference at its discretion Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/21/2017. (KAM, )
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 1566 TEXT ORDER re #1563 MOTION to Compel Oustanding Data from Non-Party Humana. Any response to the Motion is due no later than noon CDT on Tuesday, September 26, 2017. The motion will be heard at the Discovery Status Conference set for Thursday, September 28, 2017. (See Text Order 1519 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on September 21, 2107. (AMP)
September 20, 2017 1565 STIPULATION of the Provider Plaintiffs and Non-Parties McGriff Seibels & Williams, Inc. and Jed Skeete by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Brown, W)
September 20, 2017 1564 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/13/2017, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 10/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2017. (KAM, )
September 20, 2017 1563 SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION to Compel Oustanding Data from Non-Party Humana (Subscriber Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hellums, Christopher) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 1562 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 68 - granting #1503 Motion to enforce discovery order no. 8 ; insofar as Plaintiffs are LIMITED to conducting 117 depositions regarding factual discovery. To the extent Plaintiffs wish to conduct additional depositions, Plaintiffs MUST seek leave of the court and show good cause for each additional deposition sought. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/19/2017. (KAM) Modified on 9/20/2017 (KAM, ).
September 18, 2017 1561 RESPONSE to Motion re #1546 MOTION to Continue Class Certification Deadlines filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Cottrell, Christa)
September 18, 2017 1560 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 14, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie A. Martin, Telephone number (205) 278-2066. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 10/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2017. (MRR, )
September 18, 2017 1559 RESPONSE to re #1549 Subscriber and Provider Plaintiffs' List of Witnesses Disclosed by Defendants After August 1, 2016 filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart of Plaintiffs' Depositions, #2 Exhibit B - 5/24/2016 Butterfield Email to Yinger)(Cottrell, Christa)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order 1558 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed by attorney Jacob J. Franz. #1550 The Motion #1550 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate attorney Franz. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/18/20017. (KAM)
September 15, 2017 1557 ***Document Sealed - Reply is Support of Provider Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit KKKKK, #2 Exhibit LLLLL, #3 Exhibit 48, #4 Exhibit 49, #5 Exhibit 50, #6 Exhibit 51, #7 Exhibit 52, #8 Exhibit MMMMM, #9 Exhibit NNNNN) (KAM,)
September 15, 2017 1556 ***Document Sealed - Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Section 1, Per Se and Quick Look Claims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 160, #2 Exhibit 161, #3 Exhibit 162, #4 Exhibit 164) (KAM, )
September 15, 2017 1555 ***Document Sealed - EVIDENTIARY SUBMISSION in further support of Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the application of the per se rule. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 317, #2 Exhibit 318, #3 Exhibit 319, #4 Exhibit 320, #5 Exhibit 321, #6 Exhibit 322, #7 Exhibit 323, #8 Exhibit 324, #9 Exhibit 325, #10 Exhibit 327, #11 Exhibit 328, #12 Exhibit 329) (KAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/18/2017: #13 Exhibit 326) (KAM, ).
September 15, 2017 1554 ***Document Sealed - Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Subscriber plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the application of the per se rule (KAM)
September 15, 2017 1553 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1350 SEALED MOTION Provider Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit KKKKK, #2 Exhibit LLLLL, #3 Exhibit 48, #4 Exhibit 49, Part 1, #5 Exhibit 49, Part 2, #6 Exhibit 49, Part 3, #7 Exhibit 50, #8 Exhibit 51, #9 Exhibit 52, #10 Exhibit MMMMM, #11 Exhibit NNNNN)(Whatley, Joe)
September 15, 2017 1552 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel re: #1348 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Subscriber Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Slip Sheet for Sealed Exhibits 317-329)(Hellums, Christopher)
September 15, 2017 1551 REPLY to re #1353 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Section 1, Per Se, and Quick Look Claims filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Slip Sheet Regarding Sealed Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 163, #4 Exhibit 165)(Zott, David)
September 15, 2017 1550 MOTION to Withdraw by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Franz, Jacob)
September 15, 2017 1549 STATUS REPORT of List of Witnesses Disclosed by Defendants after August 1, 2016 by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Ragsdale, Barry)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order 1548 TEXT ORDER finding as MOOT #1340 Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance with Rule 45 by Navigant Consulting, Inc., following the Discovery Telephone Conference held September 14, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on September 15, 2017. (AMP)
September 15, 2017 1547 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1546 MOTION to Continue Class Certification Deadlines (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
September 14, 2017 1546 MOTION to Continue Class Certification Deadlines by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Hellums, Christopher)
September 14, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2017. (Court Reporter Julie Martin) (ASL)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1545 TEXT ORDER denying #1535 Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Enforce Discovery Order No. 3 (Dkt. # 327) and Continue Deposition of Harvard Pilgrim Health, Inc.,only insofar as the deposition of Harvard Pilgrim SHALL go forward on Tuesday, September 19, 2017, as previously scheduled. Further direction from the court as to the Plaintiffs' Motion to be entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on September 14, 2017. (AMP)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1544 ORDER re Defendants' #1503 MOTION to Enforce Discovery Order No. 8. Plaintiffs are DIRECTED to file with the Court, by no later than noon CDT on Friday, September 15, 2017, a list of witnesses disclosed after August 1, 2016, in the accelerated Alabama actions. Defendants shall have until noon CDT on Monday, September 18, 2017, to notify the Court of any objections to the Plaintiffs' list. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/14/2017. (JLC)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1543 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for a Protective Order and Related Relief as to BCBS-AL's Contacts with Class Members. #1515 Oral argument on this Motion will be heard by the undersigned at the October 5, 2017 Status Conference. The court adopts the parties' proposed briefing schedule: Defendant BCBS-AL's response is due on or before 12:00 noon on September 27, 2017; any reply by Subscriber Plaintiffs is due on or before 12:00 noon on October 3, 2017. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/14/2017. (KAM)
September 14, 2017 1542 SEALED MOTION - Defendants' MOTION for RECONSIDERATION of the Court's August 31, 2017 Privilege Ruling. (KAM)
September 14, 2017 1541 RESPONSE to re #1517 Response to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Amended Status Report on Structured Data for Anthem, BCBSFL, and BCBSMA filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Hoover, Craig)
September 14, 2017 1540 Opposition to re #1535 Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion to Enforce Discovery Order No. 3 and Continue Deposition of Harvard Pilgrim Health Care Inc. filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Campbell, Andrew)
September 14, 2017 1539 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1496 MOTION for Protective Order re: Discovery of 61 Non-Alabama Subscriber Plaintiffs filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Campbell, Andrew)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1538 TEXT ORDER re #1535 MOTION to Enforce Discovery Order 3 and Continue Deposition of Harvard Piligrim Health Care, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. Any interested party may respond to this motion by no later than 11:00 CDT on Friday, September 15, 2017. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this motion on Michelle Visser, counsel for Harvard Pilgrim Health Care Inc., at electronic mail address Michelle.Visser@ropesgray.com. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on September 14, 2017. (AMP)
September 14, 2017 1537 RESPONSE to re #1517 Wellmark's Response to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Amended Status Report on Structured Data filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 8/28/17 D. Bossier Email to A. Salomon, #2 Exhibit B - 4/18/17 A. Salomon Letter to D. Bossier)(Laytin, Daniel)
September 13, 2017 1536 Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Relating to Retrospective Rate Credits filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Priester, James)
September 13, 2017 1535 MOTION to Enforce Discovery Order 3 and Continue Deposition of Harvard Piligrim Health Care, Inc. by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ragsdale, Barry)
September 13, 2017 1534 STATUS REPORT on Plaintiffs' Depositions and Accompanying Memorandum by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart of Plaintiffs' Depositions)(Cottrell, Christa)
September 13, 2017 1533 STATUS REPORT with Updated List of Plaintiffs' Depositions Pursuant to the Court's September 8, 2017 Order by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Ragsdale, Barry)
September 13, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Seal Team Status Conference held on 9/13/2017. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (KLL)
September 13, 2017 1532 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 12, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie A. Martin, Telephone number (205) 278-2066. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 10/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2017. (MRR, )
September 12, 2017 1531 MOTION to Compel Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Certain Retrospective Rate Credit Documents by Subscriber and Provider Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ). Modified on 9/27/2017 (ASL).
September 12, 2017 1530 RESPONSE to re #1517 Excellus' Response to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Amended Status Report on Structured Data filed by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCrossBlueShield. (Clark, Anna)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 1529 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 67 - granting #1518 Motion to Continue; Subscriber Plaintiffs shall have until the week of October 2, 2017, to complete the deposition of Brian Edwards. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/12/2017. (KAM)
September 12, 2017 1528 SEALED MOTION - Subscriber and Provider plaintiffs' MOTION to COMPEL Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to produce certain retrospective rate credit documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(KAM)
September 12, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 9/12/2017. (Court Reporter Julie Martin) (ASL)
September 12, 2017 1527 Opposition to and Motion to Strike, Plaintiffs' Motion to Continue the Deposition of Brian Edwards filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Burkhalter, Carl)
September 12, 2017 1526 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re #1518 MOTION to Continue Depositions of Marshall Morrisette and Brian Edwards Supplement to Motion (Hellums, Christopher)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 1525 ORDER UNSEALING CERTAIN DOCUMENTS - This matter is before the court on (1) various Motions from the parties (and one non-party) to maintain the seal on certain documents filed with the court under seal (Docs. #1390 , #1415 , #1446 , #1475 , #1495 , #1497 , #1498 and #1500 ), (2) the Seal Teams September 1, 2017 Report regarding sealed exhibits to the parties initial Standard of Review briefing, and (3) Defendants Reconsideration of Exhibits to Keep Sealed #1506 ; In light of the Seal Teams September 1, 2017 Report, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal the following documents and/or exhibits:Document 1349-5;Document 1349-22;Document 1349-29;Document 1349-31;Document 1349-39;Document 1350-11 through Document 1350-14;Document 1350-19 through Document 1350-24;Document 1350-27;Document 1350-29;Document 1350-31;Document 1350-34 through Document 1350-58;Document 1352-14 through Document 1352-38;Document 1352-40;Document 1352-129 through Document 1352-163;Document 1352-182;Document 1352-207- 1352-210; Document 1352-212;Document 1352-214;Document 1352-228;Document 1352-229. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/12/2017. (KAM)
September 11, 2017 1524 RESPONSE to re #1491 Aetna, Inc.'s Response to Defendants' Seal Justifications to Keep Sealed Certain Trade Secret Exhibits to the Standard of Review Response Briefs (D.E. 1491) filed by AETNA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wells, H)
September 11, 2017 1523 RESPONSE to re #1491 Defendants' Request to Maintain Seal filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Stokes, Tammy)
September 11, 2017 1522 STIPULATION of the Provider Plaintiffs and Non-Parties McGriff Seibels & Williams, Inc. and Jed Skeete by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Brown, W)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 1520 TEXT ORDER re #1518 Motion to Continue the Depositions of Marshall Morrisette and Brian Edwards. Any response to the motion is due no later than 1:00 p.m. CDT. A Telephone Hearing on the motion is SET for Tuesday, September 12, 2017, at 3:00 p.m. CDT before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Parties are directed to attend the conference by dialing 888-636-3807 and entering access code 3676046. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on September 11, 2017. (AMP)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 1519 TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference SET by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, September 28, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on September 11, 2017. (AMP)
September 11, 2017 1518 MOTION to Continue Depositions of Marshall Morrisette and Brian Edwards by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Hellums, Christopher)
September 11, 2017 1517 STATUS REPORT on Structured Data (Subscriber Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Hellums, Christopher)
September 8, 2017 1521 ***Document Sealed - Notice of filing Subscriber Plaintiffs Unredacted version of their Motion for Protective order and related relief as to BCBS-AL's Contacts with class members and Exhibit D (Attachments: #1 unredated motion, #2 Exhibit D) (KAM)
September 8, 2017 1516 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/7/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 certification page) (KAM, )
September 8, 2017 1515 SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Protective Order Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and Related Relief as to BCBS-AL's Contacts With Class Members by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (Sealed), #5 Exhibit E)(Ragsdale, Barry) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
September 8, 2017 1514 REPLY to re #1490 in Support of Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 60 filed by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brady, P)
September 8, 2017 1513 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel Withdrawal of Appearance (Lyons, Michael)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order 1512 ORDER re #1503 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Enforce Discovery Order No. 8 filed by Defendants' Counsel ; the parties are directed to produced by 2:00 p.m. on Wednesday, 9/13/2017, an updated "Chart of Plaintiffs' Depositions" informing the court of how many depositions plaintiffs have completed. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/8/2017. (KAM, )
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order 1511 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 66 GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #1410 SEALED MOTION to Compel Prime Therapeutics LLC to Produce Documents and redacted version #1409 MOTION to Compel Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Prime Therapeutics LLC to Produce Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/7/2017. (JLC)
September 7, 2017 1510 NOTICE by Prime Therapeutics LLC re #1410 SEALED MOTION of Filing of [Proposed] Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lembke, Matthew)
September 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 9/7/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (AVC)
September 7, 2017 1509 RESPONSE to re #1508 by Certain Defendants' filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona, HealthNow New York, Inc. d/b/a BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York and BlueShield of Northeastern New York, Bluie Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraksa, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Dakota, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Wyoming. (Sooy, Kathleen)
September 6, 2017 1508 STATUS REPORT on Structured Data (Subscriber Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Hellums, Christopher)
September 6, 2017 1507 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1503 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Enforce Discovery Order No. 8 filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
September 6, 2017 1506 STATUS REPORT Defendants' Reconsideration of Exhibits to Keep Sealed From the Standard of Review Opening Briefs #1387 #1459 by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Donnell, Sarah)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 1505 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 65 DENYING #1424 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #1422 MOTION to Compel. Accordingly, the Subscriber Plaintiffs' #1422 MOTION to Compel is GRANTED to the limited extent that BCBS-AL and its non-charity subsidiaries shall produce to the Subscriber Plaintiffs, by October 2, 2017, one paper or electronic version of every contract entered into between BCBS-AL and any non-charity subsidiary in the years 2008 and 2013 only. In all other respects the motion to compel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/6/2017. (JLC)
September 6, 2017 1504 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M Knott on behalf of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Knott, Jason)
September 6, 2017 1503 MOTION Defendants' Motion to Enforce Discovery Order No. 8 by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Chart of Plaintiff Depositions)(Cottrell, Christa)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 1502 TEXT ORDER; This matter is before the court on the Seal Team's recent report regarding proposed modifications to the court's seal process. That report contained a request by Plaintiffs' Seal Team representative(s) for a conference with the court regarding the seal process. A conference with Seal Team members (only) is SET for 10:00 am on Wednesday, September 13, 2017. If at least one Seal Team member from each side cannot attend in person, the Seal Team members SHALL confer and notify chambers of alternative dates and times for the conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/5/2017. (JLC)
September 5, 2017 1501 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1410 SEALED MOTION of Filing Amended [Proposed] Order Re Motion to Compel Prime Therapeutics LLC to Produce Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
September 5, 2017 1500 MOTION to Seal Motion to Keep Sealed Subscriber Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (1) Prime Therapeutics and (2) BCBSAL and its Subsidiaries by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Burkhalter, Carl)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 1499 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 64 GRANTING #1345 SEALED MOTION to Enforce Discovery Order No. 44 as set out herein. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/5/2017. (JLC)
September 1, 2017 1498 MOTION to Seal Subscriber Plaintiffs' Request to Maintain Seal on Certain Documents Relating to their Opposition to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Standard of Review by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Guin, David)
September 1, 2017 1497 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits to Provider Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgement by VIVA Health Inc.. (Ezelle, Jay)
September 1, 2017 1496 SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Protective Order re: Discovery of 61 Non-Alabama Subscriber Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hellums, Christopher) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
September 1, 2017 1495 MOTION to Seal Provider Plaintiffs' Request to Maintain the Seal on Certain Documents Relating to Their Opposition to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Brown, W)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1494 ORDER - due to a conflict with the court's schedule, the Discovery Telephone Conference set for 9/7/2017 at 3:00 p.m. is RESET to the same day at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/1/2017. (KAM)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1493 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion of DCH Health Care Authority to Seal Certain Exhibits. #1486 The Motion seeks to retain the seal on relevant portions of DCH's corporate representative's deposition which were designated by DCH counsel as Confidential-Outside Counsel Only and filed by Defendants in opposition to Plaintiffs Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. [1433-14] The relevant portions of the deposition contain non-public, confidential information that could be of substantial value to DCHs competitors. Because DCH is a non-party, and because none of the parties object to the request for the deposition to remain under seal, the Motion of DCH Health Care Authority to Seal Certain Exhibits #1486 is GRANTED. The Deposition of DCH Health Care Authority's Rule 30(b)(6) representative Nina Dusang [1433-14] will remain under seal. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/1/2017. (KAM)
September 1, 2017 1492 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8/31/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 certification page) (KAM, )
September 1, 2017 1491 STATUS REPORT Seal Justification for Doc. # 1431, 1432, 1433, 1435, and 1436 by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Exhibits to Unseal, #2 Appendix B - Exhibits to Remain Sealed)(Zott, David)
September 1, 2017 1490 RESPONSE to re #1417 Cedars-Sinai Medical Center's Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 60 filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Cottrell, Christa)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1489 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on a request from Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan to unseal its Motion to Compel Provider Plaintiffs to Answer Discovery Requests #1463 , including the exhibits thereto. No request was made to keep the document sealed, and the Blues' seal team representative is apparently in agreement that the document should be unsealed. Therefore, the Clerk of the Court is directed to UNSEAL Document 1463 #1463 , and its exhibits. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 9/1/2017. (KAM, )
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1488 SUPPLEMENT TO QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER #550 . Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 9/1/2017. (KAM, )
September 1, 2017 1487 NOTICE by Prime Therapeutics LLC re #1474 Response in Opposition to Motion of Filing Signed Amended Declaration of Kyle Brua (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lembke, Matthew)
September 1, 2017 1486 MOTION to Seal of DCH Health Care Authority by Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406. (Tompkins, Terri)
August 31, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 8/31/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 1485 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #1395 Sealed Motion Subscriber and Provider Plaintiffs Motion Challenging Assertion of Privilege over Document Produced by Defendant BSC; denying #1401 Sealed Motion Plaintiffs Motion Challenging BCBS-KSs Clawback of November 11, 2011 Blue Caucus Antitrust Compliance Document. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/31/2017. (KAM)
August 31, 2017 1484 NOTICE by Prime Therapeutics LLC re #1474 Response in Opposition to Motion of Filing Amended Declaration of Kyle Brua (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lembke, Matthew)
August 31, 2017 1483 NOTICE of Appearance by Luther M Dorr, Jr on behalf of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama (Dorr, Luther)
August 30, 2017 1482 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1392 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Anthem, Inc. Regarding Issues Decided in United States v. Anthem (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Anthem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits 1 and 2)(Hoover, Craig)
August 30, 2017 1481 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1392 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Anthem, Inc. Regarding Issues Decided in United States v. Anthem (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Zott, David)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 1480 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 63 granting in part and denying in part #1426 Sealed Motion to compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/30/2017. (KAM)
August 30, 2017 1479 RESPONSE to re #1468 Plaintiffs' Status Report Regarding Third-Party Subpoenas filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan. (Campbell, Andrew)
August 30, 2017 1478 Brief re #1477 MOTION for Protective Order ("Defendants' Motion To Supplement The Qualified Protective Order To Correct An Inadvertent Typographical Error") ("Defendants' Brief In Support Of Their Motion To Supplement The Qualified Protective Order To Correct An Inadvertent Typographical Error") filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennedy, Lauren)
August 30, 2017 1477 MOTION for Protective Order ("Defendants' Motion To Supplement The Qualified Protective Order To Correct An Inadvertent Typographical Error") by Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406. (Kennedy, Lauren)
August 30, 2017 1476 NOTICE by Prime Therapeutics LLC re #1474 Response in Opposition to Motion of Filing Signed Declaration of Kyle Brua (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lembke, Matthew)
August 29, 2017 1475 MOTION to Seal BCBSAL's Motion to Keep Sealed Certain Portions of Subscriber Plaintiffs' Opposition to BCBSAL's Motion to Quash Document Subpoenas to Subsidiaries by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Burkhalter, Carl)
August 28, 2017 1474 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1410 SEALED MOTION Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Prime Therapeutics LLC to Produce Documents filed by Prime Therapeutics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lembke, Matthew)
August 28, 2017 1473 Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Relating to Prime Therapeutics, Inc. filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Priester, James)
August 28, 2017 1472 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Ragsdale, Barry)
August 28, 2017 1471 ***Document Sealed - Subscriber Plaintiffs' Statement in Support of Plaintiffs' MOTIONS To COMPEL (1) Prime Therapeutics and (2) Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama and its subsidiaries (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (KAM, )
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1470 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 62 re: #1413 Motion to Compel; re: #1414 Motion for Protective Order ;documents associated with these witnesses includes only those documents BCBS-AL intends to offer into evidence through their testimony. Such documents shall be produced to the plaintiffs as soon as possible, but not later than September 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/28/2017. (KAM, )
August 28, 2017 1469 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 24, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2017. (KAM, )
August 28, 2017 1468 STATUS REPORT Regarding Third Party Subpoenas by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Whatley, Joe)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1467 ORDER Parties interested in obtaining OptumInsight, Inc.s (Optum) archived data from the 2007-2009 time period are DIRECTED to inform the court, during the Discovery Telephone Conference to be held on August 31, 2017, whether they prefer to have an outside vendor or the Optum/HCCI team compile the documents for production. Counsel for Optum also is DIRECTED to attend the Discovery Telephone Conference on August 31, 2017, to discuss the pending issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/25/17. (SAC )
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1466 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #1411 Sealed Motion - Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants to Provide Answers to Interrogatory No. 9. Subscriber Plaintiffs confirmed at the Discovery Conference held August 24, 2017, that the motion is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on August 25, 2017. (AMP)
August 25, 2017 1465 ***FILED UNDER SEAL*** STATUS REPORT REGARDING OPTUMINSIGHT, INC. DATA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (JLC)
August 24, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor and Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference held on 8/24/2017; Motions #1395 , #1401 , #1457 , #1411 , #1413 , #1422 , #1424 , #1426 , arguments by counsel; hrg adj (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 1464 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1457 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; the parties' reply briefs on the standard of review SHALL be filed by 9/15/2017; the parties' request concerning the deadline for filing class certification motions are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/24/2017. (KAM)
August 24, 2017 1463 DEFENDANTS' SEALED MOTION - MOTION to COMPEL Provider Plaintiffs' to Answer Discovery Requests filed by Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(KAM) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 1462 ORDER approving the Special Master invoice for payment for services rendered and expenses incurred from 7/1/2017 - 7/31/2017 as it relates for both sides totally $5,500.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/23/2017. (KAM, )
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 1461 ORDER Approving Special Master Invoice for Payment for expenses occurred 7/1/2017 - 7/31/2017 solely to services provided to the plaintiffs totally $45,000.00 to be disbursed as set out in this order. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/23/2017. (KAM, )
August 23, 2017 1460 ***Document Sealed - Notice of filing Exhibit in support of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama's Corrected OPPOSITION to Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION to COMPEL production of financial information (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2) (KAM)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 1459 ORDER - On or before September 1, 2017, the Seal Team SHALL meet and confer on these issues and provide the court with recommendations for improving the process. If the Seal Team desires a conference with the court on those issues, that should be reflected in the report. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/23/2017. (KAM)
August 23, 2017 1458 RESPONSE to re #1457 Defendants' Motion for An Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs Regarding Standard of Review (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
August 23, 2017 1457 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1431 Document Sealed, #1435 Document Sealed, Regarding Standard of Review by Defendants' Counsel. (Zott, David)
August 23, 2017 1456 Opposition to CORRECTED Opposition to Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Burkhalter, Carl)
August 23, 2017 1455 Opposition to CORRECTED Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents Belonging to Subsidiaries and Affiliates filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Burkhalter, Carl)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 1454 ORDER re #1444 Notice (Other) filed by Prime Therapeutics LLC ; The court informed the parties in its order dated August 16, 2017, that the Subscriber Plaintiffs motion directed at Prime Therapeutics would be heard during the telephone conference scheduled for August 31, 2017. #1418 To that end, Prime Therapeutics also will have an opportunity to respond to the Subscriber Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama and Its Subsidiaries to Produce Documents during the telephone conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/23/2017. (KAM)
August 23, 2017 1453 ***Document Sealed - Notice of filing Exhibits in support of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama's OPPOSITION #1451 to Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION to COMPEL production of financial information (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2) (KAM)
August 22, 2017 1452 ***Document Sealed - Subscriber plaintiffs' OPPOSITION to Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama's MOTION to QUASH document subpoenas to subsidiaries (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (KAM)
August 22, 2017 1451 Opposition to Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Financial Documents filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Burkhalter, Carl)
August 22, 2017 1450 Opposition to Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents Belonging to Subsidiaries and Affiliates filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Burkhalter, Carl)
August 22, 2017 1449 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re #1411 SEALED MOTION Notice of Withdrawal as to Certain Defendants (Hellums, Christopher)
August 22, 2017 1448 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1424 MOTION to Quash Document Subpoenas to Subsidiaries filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
August 22, 2017 1447 STATUS REPORT (Subscriber Plaintiffs' Status Report on Discovery Order 56 and Indicator 17E by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Ragsdale, Barry)
August 22, 2017 1446 MOTION to Seal BCBSAL's Motion to Keep Sealed Certain Exhibits to Its Motion to Quash and to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Burkhalter, Carl)
August 22, 2017 1444 NOTICE by Prime Therapeutics LLC re #1418 Order,,, (Lembke, Matthew)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order 1443 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants' Partially Unopposed Motion for In Camera Review. #1440 The Motion #1440 is GRANTED. Defendants are directed to submit the referenced documents to the court for in camera review. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/21/2017. (KAM)
August 21, 2017 1445 ***Document Sealed - OPPOSITION of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas to plaintiffs' MOTION challenging privilege (KAM)
August 21, 2017 1442 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1414 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
August 21, 2017 1441 RESPONSE to Motion re #1413 MOTION to Compel /Enforce This Court's Previous Order filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Burkhalter, Carl)
August 21, 2017 1440 SEALED MOTION - Partially unopposed MOTION for IN CAMERA REVIEW of documents referenced in Defendants' OPPOSIITON to Subscriber and Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION challenging assertion of privilege over document produced by defendant BSC. (KAM)
August 21, 2017 1439 ***Document Sealed - Defendants' OPPOSITION to Subscriber and Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION Challenging Assertion of Privilege Over Document Produced by Defendant BSC (KAM)
August 21, 2017 1438 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1401 SEALED MOTION Challenging Assertion of Privilege filed by Highmark BCBSD Inc., Highmark West Virginia Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(West, Kimberly)
August 21, 2017 1437 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re #1411 SEALED MOTION Notice of Withdrawal as to Certain Defendants (Hellums, Christopher)
August 18, 2017 1436 ***Document Sealed - Evidentiary Submission for memorandum of points and authorizes in OPPOSITION to defendants' MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT on Section 1, per se and Quick Look Claims AND in SUPPORT of Subscriber plaintiffs' MOTION for PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT on defendants' "Single Entity' Defense (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 224 part 1, #2 Exhibit 224 part 2, #3 Exhibit 225, #4 Exhibit 226, #5 Exhibit 227, #6 Exhibit 228, #7 Exhibit 229, #8 Exhibit 230, #9 Exhibit 231, #10 Exhibit 232, #11 Exhibit 233, #12 Exhibit 234, #13 Exhibit 235, #14 Exhibit 236, #15 Exhibit 237, #16 Exhibit 238 part 1, #17 Exhibit 238 part 2, #18 Exhibit 239, #19 Exhibit 240, #20 Exhibit 241, #21 Exhibit 242, #22 Exhibit 243, #23 Exhibit 244, #24 Exhibit 245, #25 Exhibit 246, #26 Exhibit 247, #27 Exhibit 248, #28 Exhibit 249, #29 Exhibit 250, #30 Exhibit 251, #31 Exhibit 252 part 1, #32 Exhibit 252 part 2, #33 Exhibit 253, #34 Exhibit 254, #35 Exhibit 255, #36 Exhibit 256, #37 Exhibit 257, #38 Exhibit 258, #39 Exhibit 259, #40 Exhibit 260, #41 Exhibit 261, #42 Exhibit 262, #43 Exhibit 263, #44 Exhibit 264, #45 Exhibit 265, #46 Exhibit 266, #47 Exhibit 267, #48 Exhibit 268, #49 Exhibit 269, #50 Exhibit 270, #51 Exhibit 271, #52 Exhibit 272, #53 Exhibit 273, #54 Exhibit 274, #55 Exhibit 275, #56 Exhibit 276, #57 Exhibit 277, #58 Exhibit 278, #59 Exhibit 279 part 1, #60 Exhibit 279 part 2, #61 Exhibit 279 part 3, #62 Exhibit 279 part 4, #63 Exhibit 280, #64 Exhibit 281, #65 Exhibit 282, #66 Exhibit 283, #67 Exhibit 284, #68 Exhibit 285, #69 Exhibit 286, #70 Exhibit 287, #71 Exhibit 288, #72 Exhibit 289 part 1, #73 Exhibit 289 part 2, #74 Exhibit 290, #75 Exhibit 291, #76 Exhibit 292, #77 Exhibit 293, #78 Exhibit 294, #79 Exhibit 295, #80 Exhibit 296, #81 Exhibit 297, #82 Exhibit 298, #83 Exhibit 299, #84 Exhibit 300, #85 Exhibit 301, #86 Exhibit 302, #87 Exhibit 303, #88 Exhibit 304, #89 Exhibit 305, #90 Exhibit 306, #91 Exhibit 307, #92 Exhibit 308, #93 Exhibit 309, #94 Exhibit 310, #95 Exhibit 311, #96 Exhibit 312, #97 Exhibit 313, #98 Exhibit 314, #99 Exhibit 315, #100 Exhibit 316) (KAM, )
August 18, 2017 1435 ***Document Sealed - Memorandum of Points and Authorities in OPPOSITION to Defendants' MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT on Section 1, per se, and Quick Look Claims AND in support of Subscriber plaintiffs' MOTION for PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT on defendants' "Single Entity" Defense (KAM)
August 18, 2017 1434 SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' SEALED MOTION - Subscriber Plaintiffs' MOTION for PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT on Defendants' "SINGLE ENTITY" Defense. (KAM) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
August 18, 2017 1433 ***Document Sealed - Notice of filing EXHIBITS to Defendants' RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 128, #2 Exhibit 131, #3 Exhibit 135, #4 Exhibit 136, #5 Exhibit 137, #6 Exhibit 141, #7 Exhibit 142, #8 Exhibit 144, #9 Exhibit 145, #10 Exhibit 146, #11 Exhibit 147, #12 Exhibit 149, #13 Exhibit 150, #14 Exhibit 159) (KAM, )
August 18, 2017 1432 ***Document Sealed - Defendants' RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' MOTIONS for PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (KAM)
August 18, 2017 1431 ***Document Sealed - PROVIDER Plaintiffs' RESPONSE to Defendants' MOTION For SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit II, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26, #4 Exhibit 27, #5 Exhibit 28, #6 Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit 30, #8 Exhibit 31, #9 Exhibit 32, #10 Exhibit 33, #11 Exhibit 34, #12 Exhibit 35, #13 Exhibit 36, #14 Exhibit 37, #15 Exhibit 38, #16 Exhibit 39, #17 Exhibit 40, #18 Exhibit 41) (KAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2017: #19 Exhibit 42 part 1, #20 Exhibit 42 -Part 2, #21 Exhibit 42 Part 3, #22 Exhibit 42 -Part 4, #23 Exhibit 42 Part 5) (KAM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2017: #24 Exhibit 43, #25 Exhibit 44, #26 Exhibit 45, #27 Exhibit 46, #28 Exhibit 47, #29 Exhibit JJ, #30 Exhibit KK, #31 Exhibit LL, #32 Exhibit MM, #33 Exhibit NN, #34 Exhibit OO, #35 Exhibit PP, #36 Exhibit QQ, #37 Exhibit RR, #38 Exhibit SS, #39 Exhibit TT, #40 Exhibit UU, #41 Exhibit VV, #42 Exhibit WW, #43 Exhibit XX, #44 Exhibit YY, #45 Exhibit ZZ) (KAM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2017: #46 Exhibit AAA, #47 Exhibit BBB, #48 Exhibit CCC, #49 Exhibit DDD, #50 Exhibit EEE, #51 Exhibit FFF, #52 Exhibit GGG, #53 Exhibit HHH, #54 Exhibit III, #55 Exhibit JJJ, #56 Exhibit KKK, #57 Exhibit LLL, #58 Exhibit MMM, #59 Exhibit NNN, #60 Exhibit OOO, #61 Exhibit PPP, #62 Exhibit QQQ, #63 Exhibit RRR, #64 Exhibit SSS, #65 Exhibit TTT, #66 Exhibit UUU, #67 Exhibit VVV, #68 Exhibit WWW, #69 Exhibit XXX, #70 Exhibit YYY, #71 Exhibit ZZZ) (KAM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2017: #72 Exhibit AAAA, #73 Exhibit BBBB, #74 Exhibit CCCC, #75 Exhibit DDDD, #76 Exhibit EEEE, #77 Exhibit FFFF, #78 Exhibit GGGG, #79 Exhibit HHHH, #80 Exhibit IIII, #81 Exhibit JJJJ, #82 Exhibit KKKK, #83 Exhibit LLLL, #84 Exhibit MMMM, #85 Exhibit NNNN, #86 Exhibit OOOO, #87 Exhibit PPPP, #88 Exhibit QQQQ, #89 Exhibit RRRR, #90 Exhibit SSSS, #91 Exhibit TTTT, #92 Exhibit UUUU, #93 Exhibit VVVV part 1, #94 Exhibit VVVV part 2, #95 Exhibit VVVV part 3, #96 Exhibit WWWW, #97 Exhibit XXXX, #98 Exhibit YYYY, #99 Exhibit ZZZZ, #100 Exhibit AAAAA, #101 Exhibit BBBBB, #102 Exhibit CCCCC, #103 Exhibit DDDDD, #104 Exhibit EEEEE, #105 Exhibit FFFFF, #106 Exhibit GGGGG, #107 Exhibit HHHHH, #108 Exhibit IIIII, #109 Exhibit JJJJJ) (KAM, ).
August 18, 2017 1430 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1401 SEALED MOTION Notice of Joinder of Challenge to Defendant Highmark's Clawback Request to Plaintiffs' Pending Motion Challenging Assertion of Privilege over Document Produced by Defendant BCBS-KS (Ragsdale, Barry)
August 18, 2017 1429 RESPONSE to Motion re #1350 SEALED MOTION, #1348 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Subscriber Plaintiffs filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit Slip Sheet Regarding Sealed Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 129, #4 Exhibit 130, #5 Exhibit 131, #6 Exhibit 132, #7 Exhibit 133 Part 1, #8 Exhibit 133 Part 2, #9 Exhibit 134, #10 Exhibit 135, #11 Exhibit 138 Part 1, #12 Exhibit 138 Part 2, #13 Exhibit 138 Part 3, #14 Exhibit 138 Part 4, #15 Exhibit 138 Part 5, #16 Exhibit 139 Part 1, #17 Exhibit 139 Part 2, #18 Exhibit 140, #19 Exhibit 143, #20 Exhibit 148, #21 Exhibit 150, #22 Exhibit 151, #23 Exhibit 152, #24 Exhibit 153, #25 Exhibit 154 Part 1, #26 Exhibit 154 Part 2, #27 Exhibit 155, #28 Exhibit 156, #29 Exhibit 157, #30 Exhibit 158)(Zott, David)
August 18, 2017 1428 ***Document Sealed - NOTICE of filing EXHIBITS under seal in SUPPORT of Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama's Omnibus MOTION to QUASH document subpoenas to Subsidiaries (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3) (KAM, )
August 17, 2017 1427 SEALED MOTION - Subscriber Plaintiffs' MOTION to COMPEL Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama and it subsidiaries to produce documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(KAM)
August 17, 2017 1426 SEALED MOTION - Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION to COMPEL Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to produce financial documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(KAM, )
August 17, 2017 1424 MOTION to Quash Document Subpoenas to Subsidiaries by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4)(Burkhalter, Carl)
August 17, 2017 1423 NOTICE of Appearance by Casey R Fronk on behalf of Blue Shield of California (Fronk, Casey)
August 17, 2017 1422 MOTION to Compel Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama and Its Subsidiaries to Produce Documents by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry)
August 17, 2017 1421 NOTICE of Appearance by Syndey L Schneider on behalf of Highmark Inc., Highmark West Virginia Inc., Highmark BCBSD Inc. (Schneider, Syndey)
August 16, 2017 1425 ***Document Sealed - STATUS REPORT regarding Optuminsight, Inc Data (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (KAM)
August 16, 2017 1420 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re #1411 SEALED MOTION Notice of Withdrawal as to Certain Defendants (Hellums, Christopher)
August 16, 2017 1419 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 10, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie A. Martin, Telephone number (205) 278-2066. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 9/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2017. (MRR, )
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 1418 ORDER the following motions will be heard at the Discovery Status Conference set for 8/24/2017 at 1:00 p.m.; #1395 pla' motion challenging assertion of privilege over document produced by dft BSC; #1401 plas' motion challenging assertion of privilege over document produced by dft BCBS-KS; #1411 subscriber plas' motion to compel; #1413 plas' motion to enforce previous order; #1414 dft BCBS of Alabama's motion for protective order; Any written responses to these motions are due no later than Monday, August 21, 2017, and shall comply with the parameters set out in the Order Amending Discovery Order No. 1 #483 ; #1409 subscriber plas' motion to compel will be heard during the discovery telephone conference on 8/31/2017 at 3:00 p.m.; any response is due by 8/28/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/16/2017. (KAM, )
August 15, 2017 1417 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court ( Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order no. 60) by Cedars-Sinai Medical Center re #1393 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Brady, P) Modified 8/16/2017 (KAM)
August 14, 2017 1416 ***Document Sealed - Subscriber Plaintiffs' OPPOSITION to defendants' request to maintain seal on materials filed in connection with the Parties' Standard of Review Summary Judgment filings (Attachments: #1 App I, #2 App II, #3 App III, #4 App IV, #5 App V) (KAM)
August 14, 2017 1415 Brief Opposing Seal on Summary Judgment Materials. (Attachments: #1 Appendix I, #2 Appendix II, #3 Appendix III, #4 Appendix IV, #5 Appendix V)(Stokes, Tammy)
August 14, 2017 1414 MOTION for Protective Order by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Burkhalter, Carl)
August 14, 2017 1413 MOTION to Compel /Enforce This Court's Previous Order by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Whatley, Joe)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 1412 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 61 - granting #1053 Motion for Reconsideration; Discovery Order No. 44 is MODIFIED to eliminate any requirement that HCCI produce or procure the production of claims data; rather, that data is now being obtained under a subpoena to OptumInsight. The subpoena to HCCI for claims data is hereby QUASHED. In all other respects Discovery Order No. 44 remains in full force and effect; OptumInsight shall respond, by not later than Friday, August 18, 2017, to the proposals made by Provider Plaintiffs and Defendants for engaging vendors capable of extracting 2007 to 2009 claims data from archival sources at OptumInsight, providing a good faith estimate of the costs it will incur and a timeline for beginning and completing the process of extracting such claims data. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/11/2017. (KAM)
August 10, 2017 1411 SEALED MOTION - Subscriber Plaintiffs' motion to compel defendants to provide substantive answers or specific Bates number References to answer interrogatory no. 9. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhbiit D, #5 Exhibit E)(KAM, )
August 10, 2017 1410 SEALED MOTION - Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Prime Therapeutics LLC to Produce Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(KAM)
August 10, 2017 1409 MOTION to Compel Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Prime Therapeutics LLC to Produce Documents by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry)
August 10, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 8/10/2017. (Court Reporter Julie Martin) (ASL)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 1408 TEXT ORDER - This case is before the court on Subscriber Plaintiffs' amended Sealed Evidentiary Submission in support of their Motion for Partial Summary #1348 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to REMOVE the originally filed exhibits in support of Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion #1352 and to SUBSTITUTE the reduced size exhibits in the amended submission.Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/10/2017. (KAM)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 1407 ORDER re the parties proposed briefing schedule as to #1392 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Anthem, Inc. Regarding Issues Decided in United States v. Anthem (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel; the parties request is granted; Any responses in opposition to Provider Plaintiffs motion are due by August 30, 2017; Provider Plaintiffs reply is due by September 21, 2017. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/10/2017. (KAM)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 1406 ORDER the parties' joint request to extend the briefing schedule for the standard of review briefs is GRANTED: The parties responsive briefs are due on August 18, 2017; The parties reply briefs are due on September 1, 2017. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/10/2017. (KAM)
August 9, 2017 1405 STATUS REPORT Regarding OptumInsight, Inc., Data by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan. filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan (Campbell, Andrew)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 1404 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed on behalf of attorneys James C. Pennington and M. Tae Phillips. #1400 The Motion #1400 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate attorneys Pennington and Phillips. If necessary, the parties are directed to serve any future papers regarding non-party Regions Bank on its registered agent for service of process. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/9/2017. (KAM)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 1403 TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, August 24, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on August 9, 2017. (AMP)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order 1402 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed on behalf of attorneys James C. Pennington and M. Tae Phillips. #1371 The Motion #1371 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate attorneys Pennington and Phillips. If necessary, the parties are directed to serve any future papers regarding non-party Regions Bank on its registered agent for service of process. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/8/2017. (JLC)
August 8, 2017 1401 ***FILED UNDER SEAL*** MOTION Challenging Assertion of Privilege Over Document Produced by Defendant BCBS-KS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(JLC)
August 8, 2017 1400 MOTION to Withdraw by Regions Bank. (Pennington, James)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order 1399 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #1398 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney D Bruce Hoffman terminated. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/7/2017. (JLC)
August 4, 2017 1398 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendants' Counsel. (Hoffman, Donald)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order 1397 TEXT ORDER: This matter is before the court on the Provider Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Issues Decided in United States v. Anthem. #1392 Unless the parties otherwise agree on a briefing schedule for the Motion, any response SHALL be filed no later than twenty-one (21) calendar days after the date the Motion was filed. (However, if the due date falls on a weekend or court holiday, the due date shall be the next business day). Any reply SHALL be filed no later than fourteen (14) calendar days after the date on which the responsive brief is filed. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/4/17. (SAC )
August 3, 2017 1396 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/27/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindy M. Fuller. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 8/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/1/2017. (KAM, )
August 3, 2017 1395 SEALED MOTION - Subscriber and Provider Plaintiffs' Motion Challenging Assertion of Privilege Over Document Produced by Defendant BSC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(KAM)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order 1394 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the recent Motions and/or Requests to maintain the seal on certain documents recently filed under seal in connection with briefing on the appropriate standard of review. #1387 #1388 #1390 The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate these Motions/Requests. #1387 #1388 #1390 The parties may respond, and the court will expect the Seal Team's report, pursuant to the Revised Sealing Procedures #758 in due course. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 8/2/2017. (KAM)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1393 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 60. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/1/2017. (KAM)
August 1, 2017 1392 PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Against Anthem, Inc. Regarding Issues Decided in United States v. Anthem (Provider Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit B - Part 1, #5 Exhibit B - Part 2)(Whatley, Joe) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1391 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 59- granting #1341 Motion to Compel and Discovery Order No. 44 is AMENDED to the extent: Parties wishing to have access to the documents and data produced by Aetna, Humana, and United shall pay, according to their own agreement to split costs, a $100,000.00, good-faith deposit to each of those insurers; Upon payment of the deposit and agreement with the parties on discovery methodology and search terms, Aetna, Humana, and United are DIRECTED to begin making rolling productions. Productions shall be completed by September 1, 2017; in all other respects, the defendants motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 8/1/2017.(KAM)
July 31, 2017 1390 MOTION to Maintain the Seal on Certain Documents Relating to Motions for Summary Judgment re #1350 SEALED MOTION, #1353 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Section 1, Per Se, and Quick Look Claims (Corrected) (Provider Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Brown, W)
July 31, 2017 1389 MOTION Maintain the Seal on Certain Documents Relating to Motions for Summary Judgment re #1350 SEALED MOTION, #1353 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Section 1, Per Se, and Quick Look Claims (Provider Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Brown, W) Corrected version filed -Modified on 8/1/2017 (KAM, ).
July 31, 2017 1388 MOTION Maintain Seal on Select Exhibits re #1349 Document Sealed,,,, by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Stokes, Tammy)
July 31, 2017 1387 MOTION to Keep Sealed Certain Exhibits to the Standard of Review Briefs re #1350 SEALED MOTION, #1348 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Subscriber Plaintiffs, #1353 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Section 1, Per Se, and Quick Look Claims by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A: Exhibits That Defendants Request Remain Sealed)(Zott, David)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1386 DISCOVERY ORDER no. 58 granting in part and denying in part #1356 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/28/2017. (KAM, )
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1385 ORDER re #1345 SEALED MOTION filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel ; by no later than August 9, 2017, the provider plaintiffs, defendants, and OptumInsight are DIRECTED to file a report (jointly or separately) informing the court whether OptumInsight is capable of calculating and providing, consistent with HIPAA, the duration of time between the date of medical service and the date the service provider was paid for that service by the insurer; Also by August 9, 2017, the provider plaintiffs and defendants, together, will propose to OptumInsight up to three vendors they believe to be capable of extracting from OptumInsights data archives the data at issue for 2007 to 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/28/2017. (KAM)
July 28, 2017 1384 NOTICE of Appearance by P Michael Yancey on behalf of Plaintiffs' Counsel (Yancey, P)
July 27, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Motion Hearing held on 7/27/2017: arguments by counsel, re MOTIONS #1053 , #1305 , #1341 , #1345 & #1356 ; hrg adj (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller) (ASL)
July 26, 2017 1383 STATUS REPORT on Supplemental Disclosures on behalf of Subscriber Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Hellums, Christopher)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order 1381 TEXT ORDER re #1378 Motion to Seal Document #1368 Response to Motion, by OptumInsight, Inc. Having reviewed the Motion and the document OptumInsight wishes to place under seal, the court sees no reason to deviate from its general disinclination to seal documents. Accordingly, the Motion of Non-Party OptumInsight, Inc. to Place Doc. 1368 Under Seal is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on July 26, 2017. (AMP)
July 25, 2017 1382 ***Document Sealed - REPLY OF NON-PARTY OPTUMINSIGHT, INC. TODEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS MOTION TOENFORCE DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 44 OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE,TO COMPEL OPTUMINSIGHT, INC. TO PRODUCE CLAIMS DATAFOR THE 2007-2009 TIME PERIOD (KAM)
July 25, 2017 1380 RESPONSE to Motion re #1356 MOTION to Compel Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Blue Cross Studies and Data from the Blue Cross Liability Database filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Burkhalter, Carl)
July 25, 2017 1379 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1341 MOTION to Compel National Insurers to Produce Documents filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Cottrell, Christa)
July 25, 2017 1378 MOTION to Seal Document #1368 Response to Motion, by Optuminsight, Inc.. (Robertson, Douglas)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1377 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT - granting the application of the Special Master for payment for serviced rendered 6/1/2017 - 6/30/2017 as it relates to both sides; the Special Master's application for payment is hereby approved, with: (i) one-half, or $4,750.00, to be paid by the Defendants; and (ii) one-fourth, or $2,375.00, to be paid by the Subscriber Track, and one-fourth, or $2,375.00, to be paid by the Provider Track, from their Common Benefit monies. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/25/2017. (KAM, )
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1376 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT - the application for payment for serviced rendered 6/1/2017 - 6/30/2017 relating solely for services provided to the plaintiffs; payment is hereby approved, with one-half of the billing for common projects, plus the billing that=s specific only to Subscriber Track projects, or $28,850.00, to be paid by the Subscriber Track and one-half of the billing for common projects, plus the billing that=s specific only to Provider Track projects, or $18,850.00, to be paid by the Provider Track, from their Common Benefit monies. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/25/2017. (KAM)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 1375 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed on behalf of attorney John K. Bush. #1371 The Motion #1371 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate attorney John K. Bush. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/24/2017. (KAM)
July 21, 2017 1374 ***Document Sealed - Opposition of Non-Party Optuminsight, Inc to Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Discovery Order No. 44, or, in the alternative, to compel Optuminsignt Inc to produce claims data for the 2007 - 2009 Time Period (KAM)
July 21, 2017 1373 ***Document Sealed - Non-Party Health Care Cost Institute, Inc's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Discovery Order 44, or in the alternative, to compel Optuminsight, Inc to Produce Claims Data for the 2007 - 2009 Time Period (KAM)
July 21, 2017 1372 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie A Moore on behalf of Humana Inc. (Moore, Christie)
July 21, 2017 1371 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Humana Inc.. (Turner, Sara)
July 21, 2017 1370 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1341 MOTION to Compel National Insurers to Produce Documents Opposition of Non-Party Humana Inc. to Certain Defendants' Motion to Compel National Insurers to Produce Documents filed by Humana Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16)(Turner, Sara)
July 21, 2017 1369 RESPONSE in Support re #1341 MOTION to Compel National Insurers to Produce Documents Provider Plaintiffs' Response In Support of Certain Defendants' Motion to Compel National Insurers to Produce Documents filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Sheehan, Patrick)
July 21, 2017 1368 RESPONSE to Motion re #1345 SEALED MOTION to Enforce Discovery Order No. 44, or in the alternative, to compel Optuminsight Inc. to Produce Claims Data for the 2007-2009 Time Period filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan. (Campbell, Andrew)
July 21, 2017 1367 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1341 MOTION to Compel National Insurers to Produce Documents filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Robertson, Douglas)
July 21, 2017 1366 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: #1305 MOTION to Compel Third Parties to Respond to Subpoenas Before the Discovery Cut-off filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 7/18/2017 Snavely Email to Owen, #2 Exhibit B - 7/20/2017 Owen Letter to Snavely)(Cottrell, Christa)
July 21, 2017 1365 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re #1340 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Rule 45 By Navigant Consulting, Inc. (Provider Plaintiffs) (Brown, W)
July 21, 2017 1364 RESPONSE to Motion re #1341 MOTION to Compel National Insurers to Produce Documents filed by AETNA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11)(Wells, H)
July 21, 2017 1363 RESPONSE to Motion re #1341 MOTION to Compel National Insurers to Produce Documents filed by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Weller, Christopher)
July 20, 2017 1361 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel re #1305 MOTION to Compel Third Parties to Respond to Subpoenas Before the Discovery Cut-off (Cottrell, Christa)
July 20, 2017 1360 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 13, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number (205) 278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 8/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/18/2017. (MRR, )
July 19, 2017 1362 ***Document Sealed - Provider Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Substitute Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit F) (KAM)
July 18, 2017 1359 NOTICE by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation, Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, Tenet Healthcare, University of North Carolina Health Care System re #1347 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, of Filing Signed Declaration and Notice of Correction of Typographical Error (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Ex. 4 - Signed Decl. of S. Trott)(Brady, P)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order 1358 TEXT ORDER re #1356 Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Blue Cross Cost Studies and Data from the Blue Cross Liability Database. Any response to the Motion is due by July 25, 2017. No reply briefs will be accepted. Oral argument on the Motion will be heard at the Discovery Status Conference set for Thursday, July 27, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on July 18, 2017. (AMP, )
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order 1357 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed by attorney Erin M. Wilson. #1355 The Motion #1355 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate attorney Erin M. Wilson. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/18/2017. (KAM, )
July 18, 2017 1356 MOTION to Compel Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Blue Cross Studies and Data from the Blue Cross Liability Database by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Whatley, Joe)
July 18, 2017 1355 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Premera Blue Cross. (Wilson, Erin)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order 1354 TEXT ORDER granting #1327 Plaintiffs' Motion to Impose Deadline for BCBSAL to Produce Documents Responsive to Discovery Order No. 41 Search Terms. The Motion is GRANTED insofar as Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama shall produce responsive documents by August 9, 2017. Production, however, should be made prior to the deadline where possible. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on July 18, 2017. (AMP)
July 17, 2017 1353 DEFENDANTS' MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Section 1, Per Se, and Quick Look Claims by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of the Motion, #2 Exhibit Index, #3 Exhibit Slip Sheet Regarding Sealed Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 1 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 1 Part 3, #7 Exhibit 2 Part 1, #8 Exhibit 2 Part 2, #9 Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 7 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 8, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 10, #18 Exhibit 11, #19 Exhibit 12, #20 Exhibit 13, #21 Exhibit 15 Part 1, #22 Exhibit 15 Part 2, #23 Exhibit 16, #24 Exhibit 17, #25 Exhibit 18, #26 Exhibit 19 Part 1, #27 Exhibit 19 Part 2, #28 Exhibit 20 Part 1, #29 Exhibit 20 Part 2, #30 Exhibit 21, #31 Exhibit 22 Part 1, #32 Exhibit 22 Part 2, #33 Exhibit 22 Part 3, #34 Exhibit 22 Part 4, #35 Exhibit 23, #36 Exhibit 24 Part 1, #37 Exhibit 24 Part 2, #38 Exhibit 25 Part 1, #39 Exhibit 25 Part 2, #40 Exhibit 25 Part 3, #41 Exhibit 25 Part 4, #42 Exhibit 26 Part 1, #43 Exhibit 26 Part 2, #44 Exhibit 26 Part 3, #45 Exhibit 27, #46 Exhibit 28 Part 1, #47 Exhibit 28 Part 2, #48 Exhibit 29, #49 Exhibit 30, #50 Exhibit 31, #51 Exhibit 32, #52 Exhibit 35, #53 Exhibit 36, #54 Exhibit 39, #55 Exhibit 40, #56 Exhibit 46, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 62, #59 Exhibit 63, #60 Exhibit 65, #61 Exhibit 66, #62 Exhibit 68, #63 Exhibit 69, #64 Exhibit 71, #65 Exhibit 73, #66 Exhibit 74, #67 Exhibit 75, #68 Exhibit 76, #69 Exhibit 77, #70 Exhibit 78, #71 Exhibit 80 Part 1, #72 Exhibit 80 Part 1, #73 Exhibit 81, #74 Exhibit 83, #75 Exhibit 84, #76 Exhibit 85, #77 Exhibit 87, #78 Exhibit 89, #79 Exhibit 90, #80 Exhibit 91, #81 Exhibit 94, #82 Exhibit 96, #83 Exhibit 98, #84 Exhibit 99, #85 Exhibit 100, #86 Exhibit 101, #87 Exhibit 102, #88 Exhibit 103, #89 Exhibit 105, #90 Exhibit 106, #91 Exhibit 108, #92 Exhibit 109, #93 Exhibit 111, #94 Exhibit 113, #95 Exhibit 114 Part 1, #96 Exhibit 114 Part 1, #97 Exhibit 115, #98 Exhibit 116, #99 Exhibit 117, #100 Exhibit 118, #101 Exhibit 120, #102 Exhibit 121, #103 Exhibit 126, #104 Exhibit 127)(Zott, David) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
July 17, 2017 1352 ***Document Sealed - Subscriber Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Submission in support of it's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Application of the Per Se Rule (KAM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2017: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6-1, #10 Exhibit 6-2, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30) (KAM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2017: #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 36, #41 Exhibit 37, #42 Exhibit 38-1, #43 Exhibit 38-2, #44 Exhibit 39, #45 Exhibit 40, #46 Exhibit 41, #47 Exhibit 42, #48 Exhibit 43, #49 Exhibit 44, #50 Exhibit 45, #51 Exhibit 46, #52 Exhibit 47, #53 Exhibit 48, #54 Exhibit 49, #55 Exhibit 50, #56 Exhibit 51, #57 Exhibit 52, #58 Exhibit 53, #59 Exhibit 54, #60 Exhibit 55, #61 Exhibit 56, #62 Exhibit 57, #63 Exhibit 58, #64 Exhibit 59, #65 Exhibit 60, #66 Exhibit 61, #67 Exhibit 62, #68 Exhibit 63, #69 Exhibit 64, #70 Exhibit 65, #71 Exhibit 66, #72 Exhibit 67, #73 Exhibit 68, #74 Exhibit 69, #75 Exhibit 70, #76 Exhibit 71, #77 Exhibit 72, #78 Exhibit 73, #79 Exhibit 74, #80 Exhibit 75) (KAM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2017: #81 Exhibit 76, #82 Exhibit 77, #83 Exhibit 78, #84 Exhibit 79, #85 Exhibit 80, #86 Exhibit 81, #87 Exhibit 82, #88 Exhibit 83, #89 Exhibit 84, #90 Exhibit 85, #91 Exhibit 86, #92 Exhibit 87, #93 Exhibit 88, #94 Exhibit 89, #95 Exhibit 90, #96 Exhibit 91, #97 Exhibit 92, #98 Exhibit 93, #99 Exhibit 94, #100 Exhibit 95, #101 Exhibit 96, #102 Exhibit 97, #103 Exhibit 98, #104 Exhibit 99, #105 Exhibit 100-1, #106 Exhibit 100-2, #107 Exhibit 101, #108 Exhibit 102, #109 Exhibit 103, #110 Exhibit 104, #111 Exhibit 105) (KAM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2017: #112 Exhibit 106, #113 Exhibit 107, #114 Exhibit 108, #115 Exhibit 109, #116 Exhibit 110, #117 Exhibit 111, #118 Exhibit 112, #119 Exhibit 113, #120 Exhibit 114, #121 Exhibit 115, #122 Exhibit 116, #123 Exhibit 117, #124 Exhibit 118, #125 Exhibit 119, #126 Exhibit 120, #127 Exhibit 121, #128 Exhibit 122, #129 Exhibit 123, #130 Exhibit 124, #131 Exhibit 125, #132 Exhibit 126, #133 Exhibit 127, #134 Exhibit 128, #135 Exhibit 129, #136 Exhibit 130, #137 Exhibit 131, #138 Exhibit 132, #139 Exhibit 133, #140 Exhibit 134, #141 Exhibit 135, #142 Exhibit 136, #143 Exhibit 137, #144 Exhibit 138, #145 Exhibit 139, #146 Exhibit 140, #147 Exhibit 141, #148 Exhibit 142, #149 Exhibit 143, #150 Exhibit 144, #151 Exhibit 145, #152 Exhibit 146, #153 Exhibit 147, #154 Exhibit 148, #155 Exhibit 149, #156 Exhibit 150) (KAM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2017: #157 Exhibit 151, #158 Exhibit 152, #159 Exhibit 153, #160 Exhibit 154, #161 Exhibit 155, #162 Exhibit 156, #163 Exhibit 157, #164 Exhibit 159, #165 Exhibit 160, #166 Exhibit 161, #167 Exhibit 162, #168 Exhibit 163, #169 Exhibit 164, #170 Exhibit 165, #171 Exhibit 166, #172 Exhibit 167-1, #173 Exhibit 167-2, #174 Exhibit 168, #175 Exhibit 169, #176 Exhibit 170-1, #177 Exhibit 170-2, #178 Exhibit 171, #179 Exhibit 172, #180 Exhibit 173, #181 Exhibit 174, #182 Exhibit 175, #183 Exhibit 176, #184 Exhibit 177, #185 Exhibit 178, #186 Exhibit 179, #187 Exhibit 180, #188 Exhibit 181, #189 Exhibit 182, #190 Exhibit 183, #191 Exhibit 184, #192 Exhibit 185, #193 Exhibit 186, #194 Exhibit 187, #195 Exhibit 188, #196 Exhibit 189, #197 Exhibit 190) (KAM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2017: #198 Exhibit 191, #199 Exhibit 192, #200 Exhibit 193, #201 Exhibit 194, #202 Exhibit 195, #203 Exhibit 196, #204 Exhibit 197, #205 Exhibit 198, #206 Exhibit 199, #207 Exhibit 200, #208 Exhibit 201, #209 Exhibit 202, #210 Exhibit 203, #211 Exhibit 204, #212 Exhibit 205, #213 Exhibit 206, #214 Exhibit 207, #215 Exhibit 208, #216 Exhibit 209, #217 Exhibit 210, #218 Exhibit 211, #219 Exhibit 212, #220 Exhibit 213, #221 Exhibit 214, #222 Exhibit 215, #223 Exhibit 216, #224 Exhibit 217) (KAM, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/18/2017: #225 Exhibit 218, #226 Exhibit 219, #227 Exhibit 220, #228 Exhibit 221, #229 Exhibit 222, #230 Exhibit 223) (KAM, ).
July 17, 2017 1351 ***Document Sealed - Subscriber Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Application of the Per Se Rule. (KAM)
July 17, 2017 1350 PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS' SEALED MOTION - Provider Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 1, #3 2, #4 3, #5 4, #6 5, #7 6, #8 7, #9 8, #10 9, #11 10, #12 11, #13 12, #14 13, #15 14, #16 15, #17 16, #18 17, #19 18, #20 19, #21 20, #22 21, #23 22, #24 23, #25 24)(KAM, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2017: #26 Exhibit B, #27 Exhibit C, #28 Exhibit D, #29 Exhibit E, #30 Exhibit F, #31 Exhibit G, #32 Exhibit H, #33 Exhibit I, #34 Exhibit J, #35 Exhibit K, #36 Exhibit L, #37 Exhibit M, #38 Exhibit N, #39 Exhibit O, #40 Exhibit P, #41 Exhibit Q, #42 Exhibit R, #43 Exhibit S, #44 Exhibit T, #45 Exhibit U, #46 Exhibit V, #47 Exhibit W, #48 Exhibit X, #49 Exhibit Y, #50 Exhibit Z, #51 Exhibit AA, #52 Exhibit BB, #53 Exhibit CC, #54 Exhibit DD, #55 Exhibit EE, #56 Exhibit FF, #57 Exhibit GG, #58 Exhibit HH) (KAM, ). Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
July 17, 2017 1349 ***Document Sealed - Defendant's Brief in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment on plaintiffs' Section 1, Per Se, and Quick Look Claims and Certain Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 14, #3 Exhibit 32, #4 Exhibit 33, #5 Exhibit 34, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 41, #9 Exhibit 42, #10 Exhibit 43, #11 Exhibit 44, #12 Exhibit 45, #13 Exhibit 47, #14 Exhibit 48, #15 Exhibit 49, #16 Exhibit 50, #17 Exhibit 51, #18 Exhibit 52, #19 Exhibit 53, #20 Exhibit 54, #21 Exhibit 55, #22 Exhibit 56, #23 Exhibit 58, #24 Exhibit 59, #25 Exhibit 60, #26 Exhibit 61, #27 Exhibit 64, #28 Exhibit 67, #29 Exhibit 70, #30 Exhibit 72, #31 Exhibit 79, #32 Exhibit 82, #33 Exhibit 86, #34 Exhibit 88, #35 Exhibit 92, #36 Exhibit 93., #37 Exhibit 95, #38 Exhibit 97, #39 Exhibit 104, #40 Exhibit 107, #41 Exhibit 110, #42 Exhibit 112, #43 Exhibit 119, #44 Exhibit 122, #45 Exhibit 123, #46 Exhibit 124, #47 Exhibit 125) (KAM)
July 17, 2017 1348 SUBSCRIBER PLAINTIFFS' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Subscriber Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Hellums, Christopher) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
July 14, 2017 1347 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1305 MOTION to Compel Third Parties to Respond to Subpoenas Before the Discovery Cut-off and Motion to Quash filed by Adventist Health System Sunbelt Healthcare Corporation, Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, Tenet Healthcare, University of North Carolina Health Care System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 Owen Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - A1, #3 Exhibit Ex 1 - A2, #4 Exhibit Ex 1 - A3, #5 Exhibit Ex 1 - A4, #6 Exhibit Ex 1 - A5, #7 Exhibit Ex 1 - A6, #8 Exhibit Ex 1 - A7, #9 Exhibit Ex 1 - A8, #10 Exhibit Ex 1 - A9, #11 Exhibit Ex 1 - A10, #12 Exhibit Ex 1 - A11, #13 Exhibit Ex 1 - A12, #14 Exhibit Ex 1 - A13, #15 Exhibit Ex 1 - A14, #16 Exhibit Ex 1 - A15, #17 Exhibit Ex 1 - A16, #18 Exhibit Ex 1 - A17, #19 Exhibit Ex 1 - A18, #20 Exhibit Ex 1 - A19, #21 Exhibit Ex 1 - A20, #22 Exhibit Ex 1 - A21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 2 McCaffery Declaration, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Jordan Declaration, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Trott Declaration, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Ridgell Declaration, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 6 Parrott Declaration)(Brady, P)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1346 TEXT ORDER re #1345 Provider Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Discovery Order No. 44 or, in the Alternative, to Compel OptumInsight, Inc., to Produce Claims Data for the 2007-2009 Time Period. Any response to the motion is due by Friday, July 21, 2017. Movant's reply, if any, is due no later than Tuesday, July 25, 2017. Argument on the motion will be heard at the Discovery Status Conference set for Thursday, July 27, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on July 14, 2017. (AMP, )
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1344 TEXT ORDER re #1341 Certain Defendants' MOTION to Compel National Insurers to Produce Documents. Any response to the motion is due by Friday, July 21, 2017. Movant's reply, if any, is due no later than Tuesday, July 25, 2017. Argument on the motion will be heard at the Discovery Status Conference set for Thursday, July 27, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on July 14, 2017. (AMP)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1343 TEXT ORDER re #1340 Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Compliance with Rule 45 By Navigant Consulting, Inc. Any response to the motion is due by Friday, July 21, 2017. Movant's reply, if any, is due no later than Tuesday, July 25, 2017. Argument on the motion will be heard at the Discovery Status Conference set for Thursday, July 27, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on July 14, 2017. (AMP)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1342 ORDER granting #1338 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; It is ORDERED as follows: (1) The page limit for opening legal standard of review briefs due July 17, 2017 is increased to 50 pages; (2) The page limit for responsive briefs due August 14, 2017 is increased to 50 pages; and (3) The page limit for reply briefs due August 28, 2017 is increased to 20 pages. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/14/2017. (KAM)
July 13, 2017 1345 SEALED MOTION - PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 44 OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO COMPEL OPTUMINSIGHT, INC. TO PRODUCE CLAIMS DATA FOR THE 20072009 TIME PERIOD (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(KAM, )
July 13, 2017 1341 MOTION to Compel National Insurers to Produce Documents by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Aetna, #2 Exhibit B - 10/14/16 Stenerson Letter to Lipton, #3 Exhibit C - 10/17/16 Stenerson Letter to Bial, #4 Exhibit D - 1/19/17 Stenerson Letter to Lipton, #5 Exhibit E - 6/22/17 Lipton Email to Stenerson, #6 Exhibit F - 6/27/17 McPhie Letter to Stenerson, #7 Exhibit G - 5/30/17 Bush Letter to Stenerson, #8 Exhibit H - 7/10/17 Wilson Email to Stenerson, #9 Exhibit I - 8/9/16 Tompkins Letter to Stenerson)(Cottrell, Christa)
July 13, 2017 1340 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Rule 45 By Navigant Consulting, Inc. (Provider Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, W)
July 13, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 7/13/2017. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (ASL)
July 13, 2017 1339 RESPONSE to Motion re #1338 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion To Extend Page Limit for Legal Standard of Review Briefs filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Zott, David)
July 13, 2017 1338 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion To Extend Page Limit for Legal Standard of Review Briefs by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry)
July 12, 2017 1337 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Consolidated Fourth Amended Provider Complaint by Defendants' Counsel.(DeMasi, Karin)
July 12, 2017 1336 ANSWER to Complaint Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Consolidated Fourth Amended Provider Complaint by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama.(Burkhalter, Carl)
July 12, 2017 1335 Answer to Consol 4th Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan.(Campbell, Andrew)
July 12, 2017 1334 ANSWER TO Providers' Consoliated Fourth Amended Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield Michigan. (Campbell, Andrew) Correcting docket - not a motion) Modified on 7/13/2017 (KAM).
July 12, 2017 1333 Defendant General Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Consolidated Fourth Amended Provider Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendants' Counsel.(Norman, Brian)
July 12, 2017 1332 Defendant CareFirst of Maryland, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Consolidated Fourth Amended Provider Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendants' Counsel.(Norman, Brian)
July 12, 2017 1331 Defendant CareFirst, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Consolidated Fourth Amended Provider Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendants' Counsel.(Norman, Brian)
July 12, 2017 1330 Blue Shield of California's Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Consolidated Fourth Amended Provider Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Blue Shield of California.(West, Kimberly)
July 12, 2017 1329 Highmark Inc.'s Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Consolidated Fourth Amended Provider Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Highmark Inc..(West, Kimberly)
July 12, 2017 1328 Wellmark's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track's Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Zott, David)
July 12, 2017 1327 MOTION Plaintiffs' Motion to Impose Deadline For BCBSAL To Produce Documents Responsive To Discovery Order No. 41 Search Terms by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
July 11, 2017 1326 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7/6/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 8/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 certification) (KAM, )
July 11, 2017 1325 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 29, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number (205) 278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 8/1/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2017. (MRR, )
July 10, 2017 1324 Premera Blue Cross's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Consolidated Fourth Amended Provider Complaint ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Premera Blue Cross.(Payton, Gwendolyn)
July 10, 2017 1323 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Health Care Service Corporation, Caring for Montanans, Inc. f/k/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Montana, Inc..(Zeiger, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2017 1322 Independence Hospital Indemnity Plan, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track's Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Adcox, Rachel)
July 10, 2017 1321 Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track's Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Zott, David)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order 1320 ORDER OF DISMISSAL in accordance with the stipulation of the parties, the claims of plaintiffs Heritage Medical Partners, LLC, Jon Clifton Crosby, MD and Wini Hamilton DC shall be and are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; the parties to bear their own costs, expenses and atty fees. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/7/2017. (KAM, )
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order 1319 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1314 Motion for Disclosure; granting #1315 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/7/2017. (KAM, )
July 6, 2017 1318 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Claims of Plaintiffs Heritage Medical Partners, LLC; John Clifton Crosby, M.D.; and Wini Hamilton, D.C. Without Prejudice (Joint) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Whatley, Joe)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 1317 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 57 - granting in part and denying in part #1235 Motion to Compel as further set out in this order; finding as moot #1297 Motion to Quash; finding as moot #1298 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 7/6/2017. (KAM, )
July 6, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 7/6/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
July 6, 2017 1316 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1314 MOTION for Disclosure Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Require Known Witness Disclosure by July 25, 2017 filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Hoover, Craig)
July 5, 2017 1315 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production of Documents Pursuant to Provider Plaintiffs' Supplemental Search Terms by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Malatesta, John)
July 5, 2017 1314 MOTION for Disclosure Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Require Known Witness Disclosure by July 25, 2017 by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 1313 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #1305 MOTION to Compel Third Parties to Respond to Subpoenas Before the Discovery Cut-off :The subpoena targets, Viva Health, Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, Tenet Healthcare, the University of North Carolina Health Care, and Adventist Health System, may respond to the Motion to Compel no later than Friday, July 14, 2017. A reply brief by the moving defendants, if any, is due Friday, July 21, 2017; Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2017 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam.. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/30/2017. (KAM, )
June 29, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Motion Hearing held on 6/29/2017: re #1235 , #1297 , #1298 ; argument by counsel; hrg adj (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (ASL)
June 29, 2017 1312 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendants' Counsel re #1305 MOTION to Compel Third Parties to Respond to Subpoenas Before the Discovery Cut-off Filed in Response to #1308 Order (Cottrell, Christa)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order 1311 TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Thursday, July 27, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on June 29, 2017. (AMP)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order 1310 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #849 Motion to Compel following the Discovery Conference held June 29, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on June 29, 2017. (AMP)
June 28, 2017 1309 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1298 MOTION to Quash Provider Plaintiffs' Subpoenas to BCS Insurance Company and BCS Financial Corporation or in the alternative Motion for Protective Order, #1297 MOTION to Quash or Modify Provider Plaintiffs' Subpoenas to BCS Financial Corporation and BCS Insurance Company or, in the Alterntaive, Motion for Protective Order (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Whatley, Joe)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1308 ORDER Defendants are DIRECTED to certify, by no later than Friday, June 30, 2017, that non-parties who have not appeared in the CM/ECF filing system for this case have been served with the motion. Along with the certification, Defendants are DIRECTED to provide to the court the appropriate service address for the non-parties targeted by the motion and, if the non-parties are represented by counsel, the contact information for the attorney(s) representing the non-parties.Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/28/2017. (KAM)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1307 ORDER in accordance with the accompanying memo opinion, denying #1187 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/28/2017. (KAM)
June 28, 2017 1306 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/28/2017. (KAM)
June 27, 2017 1305 DEFENDANTS' MOTION to Compel Third Parties to Respond to Subpoenas Before the Discovery Cut-off by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6/8/17 Hearing Transcript Excerpt, #2 Exhibit 2 - 12/2/16 Subpoena to Cedars-Sinai, #3 Exhibit 3 - 11/30/16 Subpoena to Tenet Healthcare, #4 Exhibit 4 - 1/31/17 Snavely Email to Owen, #5 Exhibit 5 - 4/13/17 Salomon Letter to Owen, #6 Exhibit 6 - 5/18/17 Salomon Letter to Owen, #7 Exhibit 7 - 6/14/17 Salomon Letter to Owen, #8 Exhibit 8 - 2/29/16 Subpoena to Viva Health, #9 Exhibit 9 - 4/26/17 Salomon Letter to Ezelle)(Cottrell, Christa) Modified on 9/25/2017 (KAM, ).
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 1304 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Provider Plaintiffs' #1064 MOTION for Order Directing Provider Plaintiffs and Subscriber Plaintiffs to Proceed on Separate Tracks for All Discovery Purposes. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/27/2017. (JLC)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 1303 ORDER GRANTING #1299 Consent MOTION to Amend Discovery Order No. 56 as set out herein. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/27/2017. (JLC)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order 1302 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT The court ORDERS that the Special Master's application for payment is approved as setout within. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/26/17. (SAC )
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order 1301 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT The court ORDERS that the Special Master's application for payment is approved as set out within. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/26/17. (SAC )
June 23, 2017 1300 RESPONSE to re #1235 Motion to Compel filed by BCS Financial Corporation, BCS Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Razzano, Susan)
June 23, 2017 1299 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1287 Order on Motion to Compel, Discovery Order No. 56 by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemmon, Andrew)
June 23, 2017 1298 MOTION to Quash Provider Plaintiffs' Subpoenas to BCS Insurance Company and BCS Financial Corporation or in the alternative Motion for Protective Order by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. (Given, Robert)
June 23, 2017 1297 MOTION to Quash or Modify Provider Plaintiffs' Subpoenas to BCS Financial Corporation and BCS Insurance Company or, in the Alterntaive, Motion for Protective Order by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Andrew)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order 1296 ORDER AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER NO 55. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/22/2017. (KAM, )
June 21, 2017 1295 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Discovery Order No. 55 by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, Craig)
June 20, 2017 1294 STATUS REPORT for BCBS Tennessee Regarding 30(b)(6) Topics for Standard of Review Depositions by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Kennedy, Lauren)
June 20, 2017 1293 STATUS REPORT Report of CareFirst, Inc., CareFirst of Maryland, Inc., Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc., and CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc. Regarding 30(b)(6) Topics for Standard of Review Depositions and Notice of Joinder in Motion to Amend Discovery Order 55 by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Norman, Brian)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 1292 TEXT ORDER re #1288 Report for Anthem, BCBSFL, BCBSSC, and BCBSNC Regarding 30(b)(6) Topics for Standard of Review Depositions and Motion to Amend Discovery Order No. 55. Any response to the Motion is due by no later than 10:00 a.m. CDT on Thursday, June 22, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on June 20, 2017. (AMP)
June 20, 2017 1291 STATUS REPORT Report of Capital BlueCross Regarding 30(b)(6) Topics for Standard of Review Deposition and Joinder in Motion to Amend Discovery Order No. 55 by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Payne, Joshua)
June 20, 2017 1290 STATUS REPORT for BCBS Michigan regarding 30(b)(6) Topics for Standard of Review Depositions by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Andrew)
June 20, 2017 1289 STATUS REPORT Regarding 30(b)(6) Topics for Standard of Review Depositions and Motion to Amend Discovery Order No. 55 by Health Care Service Corporation, Highmark Inc., Blue Shield of California. filed by Health Care Service Corporation, Highmark Inc., Blue Shield of California (Zolner, Erica)
June 20, 2017 1288 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1285 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief and Status Report regarding 30(b)(6) Topics for Standard of Review Depositions by Anthem, BCBSFL, BCBSNC, and BCBSSC by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- M. Jones email, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, Craig)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 1287 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 56 granting #1241 Motion to Compel certain defendants to produce structured data relating to total claims expense per group per year during the class period as set out in this order; data shall be produced to the Subscriber Plaintiffs within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/20/2017. (KAM)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 1286 ORDER overruling #1251 Objection to Discovery Order No 51 by Defendants' Counsel ; Status Conference set for 10/5/2017 09:00 AM before Judge R David Proctor.The Special Master will provide a call in number for the conference. On or before Friday, September 29, 2017, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed agenda of items the parties wish to be addressed during the status conference, including a briefing schedule on anticipated motions for class certification. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/20/20017. (KAM, )
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 1285 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 55 granting #1273 Motion to set timeline for plaintiffs to indentify documents for standard of review depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/19/2017. (KAM, )
June 19, 2017 1284 STATUS REPORT of Liaison Counsel Regarding 30(b)(6) Topics for Standard of Review Discovery by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Ragsdale, Barry)
June 19, 2017 1283 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 15, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 7/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 certification) (KAM, )
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 1282 TEXT ORDER re #1066 Motion to Clarify Discovery Order No. 45. Following discussions with the parties during the telephone conference held on June 15, 2017, the motion hereby is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on June 16, 2017. (AMP)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 1281 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 54 denying #1232 Subscriber pla's Motion to Compel supplemental production custodians. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/16/2017. (KAM) Modified on 6/16/2017 (KAM, ).
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 1280 ORDER - parties are directed to report to the court, by filing, no later than 4:00 p.m. CDT on Monday, June 19, 2017, whether agreement has been reached with regard to the non-Alabama 30(b)(6) depositions related to legal standard of review.Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/16/2017. (KAM)
June 15, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
June 15, 2017 1279 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/9/2017, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 7/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2017. (KAM, )
June 15, 2017 1278 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/8/2017, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 7/6/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/16/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2017. (KAM, )
June 14, 2017 1277 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1241 MOTION to Compel by Subscriber Plaintiffs' of Production of Data Regarding Premiums and Total Claims Data filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Lemmon, Andrew)
June 14, 2017 1276 Brief re #1232 SEALED MOTION Supplemental Brief in Support of Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Production Custodians filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ragsdale, Barry)
June 14, 2017 1275 STATUS REPORT on Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Production Custodians by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G)(Sooy, Kathleen)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1274 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 53. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/14/2017. (KAM)
June 14, 2017 1273 MOTION to Set Timeline for Plaintiffs to Identify Documents for Standard of Review Depositions by Defendants' Counsel. (Hoover, Craig)
June 13, 2017 1272 STIPULATION Defendants' Stipulation as to the Authentication and Admissibility of Certain License Agreements by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Zott, David)
June 13, 2017 1271 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1266 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Notice to Take the Deposition of Robin Stone, Vice President of Governmental Affairs filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
June 13, 2017 1270 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 8, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 7/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 certification page) (KAM, )
June 12, 2017 1269 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1241 MOTION to Compel by Subscriber Plaintiffs' of Production of Data Regarding Premiums and Total Claims Data (as to certain Hogan Lovells Defendants) filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 (Declaration of Robert Tierney), #8 Exhibit 8 (Declaration of Renee Baxter), #9 Exhibit 9 (Declaration of Sam Griffin), #10 Exhibit 10 (Declaration of Catherine Mitchell), #11 Exhibit 11 (Declaration of Nancy Colton), #12 Exhibit 12 (Declaration of Adrian Serio))(Hoover, Craig)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 1268 TEXT ORDER re #1266 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Notice to Take the Deposition of Robin Stone, Vice President of Governmental Affairs filed by Defendants' Counsel. Any response to the motion is due no later than 4:00 p.m. CST on Tuesday, June 13, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on June 12, 2017. (AMP)
June 12, 2017 1267 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1241 MOTION to Compel by Subscriber Plaintiffs' of Production of Data Regarding Premiums and Total Claims Data (Ragsdale, Barry)
June 12, 2017 1266 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Notice to Take the Deposition of Robin Stone, Vice President of Governmental Affairs by Defendants' Counsel. (Burkhalter, Carl) Modified on 6/14/2017 (KAM, ).
June 12, 2017 1265 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gwendolyn C Payton (Payton, Gwendolyn)
June 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: hearing terminated. (KLL)
June 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 6/9/2017. (KLL)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order 1264 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 52. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 6/8/2017. (KAM, )
June 8, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference held on 6/8/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (ASL)
June 8, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 6/8/2017. (Court Reporter Leah Turner.) (KLL)
June 7, 2017 1263 STATUS REPORT Subscriber Plaintiffs' Supplement To Status Report On Paper Discovery And Depositions For Legal Standard Briefing by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Hellums, Christopher)
June 7, 2017 1262 SUBCRIBER PLAINTIFFS'RESPONSE to re #1251 Defendants'Rule 72 Objections to DISCOVERY ORDER NO> 51 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry) Modified on 6/8/2017 (KAM, ).
June 7, 2017 1261 Opposition to re #1251 Defendants' Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 51 (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Whatley, Joe)
June 7, 2017 1260 STATUS REPORT Regarding Discovery and Depositions for Standard of Review Briefing (Provider Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Brown, W)
June 7, 2017 1259 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/18/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindy M. Fuller, Telephone number 205-278-2062. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 6/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2017. (JLC)
June 6, 2017 1258 STATUS REPORT Subscriber Plaintiffs' Status Report On Paper Discovery and Depositions for Legal Standard Briefing by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Hellums, Christopher)
June 6, 2017 1257 Defendants' Submission Regarding Standard of Review Discovery. (Zott, David) Modified on 6/7/2017 (JLC).
June 6, 2017 1256 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Cipriano on behalf of BCS Financial Corporation, BCS Insurance Company (Cipriano, Lisa)
June 6, 2017 1255 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan M Razzano on behalf of BCS Financial Corporation, BCS Insurance Company (Razzano, Susan)
June 5, 2017 1254 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1232 SEALED MOTION Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Production Custodians filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2017.04.20 C&M Plan Letter to Subscribers, #2 Exhibit B - 2017.05.23 C&M Plan Letter to Subscribers, #3 Exhibit C - 2017.06.05 C&M Plan Letter to Subscribers, #4 Exhibit D - 2016.04.13 Letter re C&M Plan Unstructured Scope)(Sooy, Kathleen)
June 5, 2017 1253 SUBSCRIBER plaintiffs' notice of withdrawal of Motion to Compel Additional Custodians #1232 SEALED MOTION (Hellums, Christopher) Modified on 6/6/2017 (KAM, ).
June 2, 2017 1252 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: #1187 MOTION to Dismiss Providers' Consolidated Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Campbell, Andrew)
June 2, 2017 1251 Brief re #1226 Order Defendants' Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 51 filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 4/21/2017 Hearing Transcript Excerpt)(Zott, David)
June 2, 2017 1250 STATUS REPORT Report Regarding Proposed Agenda for Status Conference on June 8 2017 by Special Master. filed by Special Master (Gentle, Edgar)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order 1249 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the parties' Joint Notice Regarding Sealing of Subscriber Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Supplemental Production Custodians. #1246 In light of the Joint Notice #1246 , the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal Document 1232. #1232 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 6/2/2017. (KAM, )
June 1, 2017 1248 STATUS REPORT Regarding Provider Plaintiffs' Tranche 3 Productions by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Brown, W)
June 1, 2017 1247 NOTICE of Appearance by Hamish P.M. Hume on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hume, Hamish)
June 1, 2017 1246 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Regarding Sealing of Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Production Custodians (Joint) (Hogewood, Mark)
May 31, 2017 1245 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re #1231 MOTION For Additional Anthem Custodians Notice of Withdrawal (Hellums, Christopher)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 1244 ORDER granting #1240 Motion appointing Charles J. Cooper to serve as Co-Chair, along with David Guin, of the Brief Writing and Submissions Committee for the Subscriber Tract. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/31/2017. (KAM, )
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 1243 TEXT ORDER re #1241 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Data Regarding Premiums and Total Claims Data. Defendants named in the motion shall have until Monday, June 12, 2017, to respond to the motion. The possible need for a special setting on the motion shall be addressed at the Discovery Conference set for June 8, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on May 31, 2017. (AMP)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 1242 TEXT ORDER re #1236 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #1235 MOTION to Compel, filed by BCS Insurance Company, BCS Financial Corporation. Argument on the motion shall be heard at the Discovery Conference set for June 8, 2017. Any written response to the motion is governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on May 31, 2017. (AMP)
May 30, 2017 1241 MOTION to Compel by Subscriber Plaintiffs' of Production of Data Regarding Premiums and Total Claims Data by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1. Appendix D, #3 Exhibit 2. January 19, 2017 letter from Stenerson to Bush, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry)
May 30, 2017 1240 MOTION Unopposed Motion of Co-Lead Counsel to Obtain Court Approval for the Appointment of Charles J. Cooper to Serve as Co-Chair of the Brief Writing and Submissions for the Subscriber Track by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Hellums, Christopher)
May 30, 2017 1239 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A Walsh on behalf of Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCrossBlueShield (Walsh, Stephen)
May 30, 2017 1238 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1236 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1235 MOTION to Compel BCS Financial Corporation and BCS Insurance Company to Produce Documents (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
May 26, 2017 1237 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1187 MOTION to Dismiss Providers' Consolidated Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
May 26, 2017 1236 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1235 MOTION to Compel BCS Financial Corporation and BCS Insurance Company to Produce Documents (Provider Plaintiffs) by BCS Financial Corporation, BCS Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pennington, Michael) #1264 granted in part and denied in part this motion Modified on 6/14/2017 (KAM, ).
May 25, 2017 1235 MOTION to Compel BCS Financial Corporation and BCS Insurance Company to Produce Documents (Provider Plaintiffs) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Whatley, Joe) Modified on 6/16/2017 (KAM, ).
May 25, 2017 1234 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 11, 2017, before Judge R. David Proctor and Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number (205) 278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 6/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017. (MRR, )
May 25, 2017 1233 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 3, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number (205) 278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 6/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2017. (MRR, )
May 25, 2017 1232 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Supplemental Production Custodians. (KAM)(Motion unsealed Modified on 6/2/2017) (KAM, ). Modified on 6/16/2017 (KAM, ).
May 25, 2017 1231 MOTION For Additional Anthem Custodians by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hellums, Christopher) withdrawn by #1245 Modified on 6/14/2017 (KAM, ).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 1230 MEDIATION ORDER - a mediation involving Subscriber Plaintiffs and Defendants shall take place on 6/6/2017 in Birmingham, AL; every party SHALL designate to the mediator a representative who will attend the mediation in person. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/24/2017. (KAM)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 1229 ORDER APPOROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT - payment for services rendered and expenses incurred from 4/1/2017 through 4/30/2017 in this matter relating solely to services provided to the plaintiffs, and totaling $41,800.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/23/2017. (KAM, )
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 1228 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT - Payment for services rendered and expenses incurred from 4/1/2017 through 4/30/2017 in this matter as it relates to services rendered for both sides, and totaling $8,000.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/23/2017. (KAM, )
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 1227 TEXT ORDER. The Discovery Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229)shall be held on June 8, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on May 19, 2017. (AMP)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 1226 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 51. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/19/2017. (JLC)
May 18, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 5/18/2017. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller) (ASL)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order 1225 ORDER re #1187 MOTION to Dismiss Providers' Consolidated Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants' Counsel ; Unless the parties otherwise agree on a briefing schedule for the Motion, any response SHALL be filed no later than ten (10) calendar days after the date the Motion was filed. (However, if the due date falls on a weekend or court holiday, the due date shall be the next business day). Any reply SHALL be filed no later than five (5) calendar days after the date on which the responsive brief is filed. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/18/2017. (KAM, )
May 17, 2017 1224 Defendant USAble Mutual Insurance Company, d/b/a Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Docket no. 1083] ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendants' Counsel.(Naranjo, Michael)
May 17, 2017 1223 Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. (Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1222 Hawaii Medical Service Association (Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Hawaii) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1221 Cambia Health Solutions, Inc.; Regence Blue Shield of Idaho; Regence Blue Cross Blue Shield of Utah; Regence Blue Shield (in Washington); Regence Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oregon ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1220 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1219 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1218 Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1217 HealthNow New York Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1216 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1215 Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1214 BCBSM, Inc. (Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1213 Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1212 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1211 Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company (Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1210 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1209 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1208 Noridian Mutual Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1207 Anthem, Inc., f/k/a WellPoint, Inc., and all of its named subsidiaries in this consolidated action ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1206 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1205 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1204 Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1203 Triple-S Salud, Inc.'s ANSWER to #897 Amended Complaint (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Pabon Rico, Gustavo)
May 17, 2017 1202 Triple-S Salud, Inc.'s ANSWER to #86 Amended Complaint (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Pabon Rico, Gustavo)
May 17, 2017 1201 Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wyoming ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1200 Noridian Mutual Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1199 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCrossBlueShield.(Clark, Anna)
May 17, 2017 1198 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nebraska's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1197 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas City's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1196 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1195 HealthNow New York Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1194 Blue Cross of Idaho Health Service, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1193 Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Miller, Margot)
May 17, 2017 1192 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona.(Sooy, Kathleen)
May 17, 2017 1191 Group Hospitalization and Medical Services, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Norman, Brian)
May 17, 2017 1190 CareFirst of Maryland, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Norman, Brian)
May 17, 2017 1189 CareFirst, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Norman, Brian)
May 17, 2017 1188 Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Provider Track Fourth Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406.(McDowell, M)
May 17, 2017 1187 MOTION to Dismiss Providers' Consolidated Fourth Amended Complaint by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief In Support of MTD, #2 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Andrew)
May 17, 2017 1186 Premera Blue Cross's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Premera Blue Cross.(Payton, Gwendolyn)
May 17, 2017 1185 CareFirst BlueChoice, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Defendants' Counsel.(Norman, Brian)
May 17, 2017 1184 Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for the Subscriber Track's Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Defendants' Counsel.(Campbell, Andrew)
May 17, 2017 1183 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Excellus Health Plan, Inc. d/b/a Excellus BlueCrossBlueShield.(Clark, Anna)
May 17, 2017 1182 Horizon Healthcare Services, Inc. (Horizon Blue Cross and Blue Shield of New Jersey) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1181 Hawaii Medical Service Association (Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Hawaii) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1180 Cambia Health Solutions, Inc.; Regence Blue Shield of Idaho; Regence Blue Cross Blue Shield of Utah; Regence Blue Shield (in Washington); Regence Blue Cross Blue Shield of Oregon ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1179 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Vermont ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1178 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1177 Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Rhode Island ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1176 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of North Carolina, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1175 BCBSM, Inc. (Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1174 Wellmark, Inc., d/b/a Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Iowa, and Wellmark of South Dakota, Inc., d/b/a Wellmark Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Dakota's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track's Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Zott, David)
May 17, 2017 1173 Blue Cross Blue Shield of Mississippi, A Mutual Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406.(McDowell, M)
May 17, 2017 1172 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1171 Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company (Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1170 Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1169 Anthem, Inc., f/k/a WellPoint, Inc., and all of its named subsidiaries in this consolidated action ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Hoover, Craig)
May 17, 2017 1168 Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama's ANSWER to Complaint (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Burkhalter, Carl)
May 17, 2017 1167 Independence Hospital Indemnity Plan, Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Adcox, Rachel)
May 17, 2017 1166 Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand (Subscriber Track's Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(Zott, David)
May 17, 2017 1165 Defendant USAble Mutual Insurance Company, d/b/a Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to the Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Docket no. 1082] ANSWER to Complaint by Defendants' Counsel.(Naranjo, Michael)
May 17, 2017 1164 Health Care Service Corp. & Caring For Montanans, Inc.'s Answer & Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(West, Kimberly)
May 17, 2017 1163 Highmark Inc.'s Answer & Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(West, Kimberly)
May 17, 2017 1162 Blue Shield of California's Answer & Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint (Subscriber Track Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Defendants' Counsel.(West, Kimberly)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 1161 TEXT ORDER-This case is SET for an ex parte telephone conference with certain Subscribers Counsel at 12:00 noon, Central time, on Friday, May 19, 2017. Subscribers Lead Counsel, Subscriber Plaintiffs Steering Committee Members and the Subscribers Liaison Counsel SHALL attend. The Special Master is asked to circulate dial in information for the call.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/17/2017. (KAM)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 1160 ORDER - No future mediation may be unilaterally cancelled by any party. All future mediation sessions SHALL take place pursuant to this courts order and occur in Birmingham, Alabama. The Mediator and Special Master SHALL submit an appropriate order in relation to all such future sessions. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/16/2017. (KAM)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 1159 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on the parties' filings regarding justifications for maintaining the seal on documents filed in response to the court's April 21, 2017 Show Cause Order. #1097 In light of those filings, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal Documents 1128-1, 1128-2 and 1128-7. [1128-1] [1128-2] [1128-7]. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/16/2017. (KAM, )
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 1158 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Enlarge the Time for Responding to the Amended Complaints. #1154 The Motion #1154 is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the recently amended complaints on or before May 17, 2017. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/16/2017. (KAM)
May 15, 2017 1157 Brief re #1097 Order to Show Cause,, Defendants' Reply to Cigna's and Plaintiffs' Responses to the Court's April 21, 2017 Show Cause Order - Public Version - filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Zott, David)
May 15, 2017 1156 Brief re #1097 Order to Show Cause,, Defendants' Response to the Court's April 21, 2017 Show Cause Order - Public Version - filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 4/12/2017 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - 4/13/2017 Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3-6 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 7 - 4/28/2017 Laster Letter to Counsel, #5 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal)(Zott, David)
May 15, 2017 1155 Brief re #1149 Response (other) Defendants' Justification for Filings Submitted Under Seal and Reply to Subscribers' May 11, 2017 Response Regarding Sealing. (Zott, David)
May 15, 2017 1154 MOTION for Extension of Time For Responding To The Amended Complaints (Unopposed) by Defendants' Counsel. (Hoover, Craig)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order 1153 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 50. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/15/2017. (KAM)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 1152 SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 48. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/12/2017. (KAM, )
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 1151 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 49.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/12/2017. (KAM)
May 11, 2017 1150 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel of Agreement Regarding BCBS-AL Custodians (Subscriber Plaintiffs) (Hellums, Christopher)
May 11, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 5/11/2017. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (ASL)
May 11, 2017 1149 RESPONSE to Defendants' Request to Maintain the Seal on Their Show Cause Response filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Stokes, Tammy)
May 11, 2017 1148 RESPONSE to Motion re #1142 MOTION to Extend Time for Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions on Behalf of BCBSA & BCBS-AL filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Donnell, Sarah)
May 10, 2017 1147 ***Document Sealed - Anthem's Reply to the Responses to the Court's 4/21/2017 Show Cause Order (KAM)
May 10, 2017 1146 ***Document Sealed - Cigna Corporation's Reply in Further Support of its Response to Show Cause Order Regarding Privilege Issues #1097 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (KAM, )
May 10, 2017 1145 REPLY Brief filed by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Counsel re: #1097 Order to Show Cause,, (Provider Plaintiffs) filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One, #2 Exhibit Two)(Whatley, Joe)
May 10, 2017 1144 ***Document Sealed - DEFENDANTS REPLY TO CIGNAS AND PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO THE COURTS APRIL 21, 2017 SHOW CAUSE ORDER (SAC )
May 10, 2017 1143 MOTION for Additional Time for Depositions by Subscriber Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Hellums, Christopher)
May 9, 2017 1142 MOTION to Extend Time for Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(Lemmon, Andrew)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 1141 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Cigna Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. #1140 The Motion #1140 is GRANTED. See #145 #758 .. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/9/2017. (KAM, )
May 9, 2017 1140 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Weller, Christopher)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 1139 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed on behalf of attorneys Samuel C. Leifer and Stephen R. DiPrima. #1137 #1138 The Motions #1137 #1138 are GRANTED.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/9/2017. (KAM, )
May 8, 2017 1138 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Weller, Christopher)
May 8, 2017 1137 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Weller, Christopher)
May 5, 2017 1136 ***Document Sealed Subscriber Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause #1097 (KAM, )
May 5, 2017 1135 ***Document Sealed - Notice of Substitution of Exhibits by dft Blue Cross Blue Shield Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 6) (KAM)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 1134 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the responses #1123 #1127 #1128 #1129 #1130 to the court's April 21, 2017 Show Cause Order #1097 . In light of the responses, this matter is SET for a telephone conference at 3:00 p.m. Central Time on Thursday, May 11, 2017, to discuss the matters addressed in the order and the responses. The telephone conference regarding this issue will occur at the beginning of Judge Putnam's weekly discovery call. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/5/2017. (KAM, )
May 5, 2017 1133 NOTICE by Blue Cross Blue Shield Antitrust Litigation MDL 2406 of Withdrawal of Appearance (Leary, Paul)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 1132 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on correspondence dated May 4, 2017 from the Subscriber Seal Team regarding the status of the seal on their Motion for Additional BCBS-AL Custodians. #1102 In light of that correspondence, the clerk of the court is directed to unseal Document No. 1102. #1102 .. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/5/2017. (KAM, )
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order 1131 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 48. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 5/4/2017. (KAM)
May 4, 2017 1130 ***Document Sealed CIGNA Corporation's Response to Show Cause Order #1097 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (KAM, )
May 3, 2017 1129 ***Document Sealed Defendant Anthem Inc's Response to Order to Show Cause (KAM)
May 3, 2017 1128 ***Document Sealed - Defendant's Response to the Court's 4/21/2017 Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (KAM, )
May 3, 2017 1127 RESPONSE to re #1097 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Reponse to Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
May 3, 2017 1126 NOTICE by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company re #1097 Order to Show Cause,, (Weller, Christopher)
May 3, 2017 1125 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn M Kurtz on behalf of Anthem, Inc. (Kurtz, Glenn)
May 3, 2017 1124 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudine Columbres on behalf of Anthem, Inc. (Columbres, Claudine)
May 3, 2017 1123 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Whatley, Joe)
May 3, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2017 re #1102 , #1107 ; arguments by counsel; court's remarks; taken under submission; hrg adj (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (ASL)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order 1122 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on correspondence dated May 1, 2017 from Defendants regarding the status of the seal on their Reply in Support of Defendants' Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 44. #1101 In light of that correspondence, the clerk of the court is directed to unseal Document No. 1101. #1101 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/2/2017. (KAM, )
May 1, 2017 1121 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel Additional Custodians filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Malatesta, John)
May 1, 2017 1120 STATUS REPORT by Provider Plaintiffs Regarding Tranche 2 Productions by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Brown, W)
May 1, 2017 1119 STATUS REPORT Subscriber Plaintiffs' Status Report on Depositions, Custodians and Search Terms by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Ragsdale, Barry)
May 1, 2017 1118 STATUS REPORT of Provider Plaintiffs Regarding Discovery by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Whatley, Joe)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1117 ORDER that this case is hereby set for a Status Conference at 9:00 a.m. on Thursday, June 8, 2017, in Courtroom 8 of the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama before Judge R David Proctor. On or before Friday, June 2, 2017, the parties SHALL submit a Joint Report as set out herein. Economics Day Part II is SET at 9:00 a.m. on Friday, June 9, 2017, in Courtroom 8 of the Hugo L. Black United States Courthouse, 1729 5th Avenue North, Birmingham, Alabama. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/1/2017. (JLC)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1116 ORDER REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 44. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/1/2017. (JLC)
May 1, 2017 1115 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 27, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number (205) 278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 5/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/30/2017. (MRR, )
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1114 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 47. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/28/2017. (KAM, )
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1113 TEXT ORDERThis matter is before the court on the parties' Joint Notice Regarding Sealing of Subscriber Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint and Provider Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint. #1110 In light of the Joint Notice #1110 , the clerk of the court is directed to unseal Documents No. 1082 and 1083. #1082 #1083 . Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/28/2017. (KAM)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order 1112 TEXT ORDER re #1102 SEALED MOTION - Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Additional BCBS-AL Custodians; and #1107 Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Designate Annette Baker, Cynthia Vice, Sherry Lemier, and Jerry Chambers as Document Production Custodians. A Motion Hearing is SET for Wednesday, May 3, 2017, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on April 28, 2017. (AMP, )
April 27, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Telephone Conference held on 4/27/2017. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (ASL)
April 27, 2017 1111 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 21, 2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie Martin, Telephone number (205) 837-5266. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 5/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2017. (MRR, )
April 26, 2017 1110 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel Regarding Sealing of Subscriber Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint and Provider Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint - Joint (Hogewood, Mark)
April 26, 2017 1109 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/21/2017, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Teresa Roberson, Telephone number (205) 492-2483. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 5/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 ct rptr certification page) (AVC)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order 1108 TEXT ORDER re #1102 SEALED MOTION - Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Additional BCBS-AL Custodians; and #1107 Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION to Compel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Designate Annette Baker, Cynthia Vice, Sherry Lemier, and Jerry Chambers as Document Production Custodians. Any response to the motions is due no later than Monday, May 1, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on April 26, 2017. (AMP)
April 25, 2017 1107 MOTION to Compel Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Designate Annette Baker, Cynthia Vice, Sherry Lemier, and Jerry Chambers as Document Production Custodians by Provider Plaintiffs by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Whatley, Joe) (Granted in Discovery Order 48 #1131 Modified on 5/11/2017 (KAM, ).
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1106 ORDER granting #1063 Motion to Stay Discovery Deadlines in Discovery Order No. 44; insofar as the deadlines for providing an estimate of costs and the April 30, 2017, deadline for production of strategic documents described in subsection II.B. of Discovery Order No. 44 are STAYED, to be reset following the resolution of the defendants Rule 72 Objection to Discovery. The Non-Party Insurers are not, however,relieved of their duty to continue searching for, screening, and preparing documents for production, and to continue actually producing responsive documents that are historical or fact-based, as opposed to forward-looking strategic documents, as described in subsection II.B. of Discovery Order No. 44, or to provide cost estimates for production of such historical or fact-based market entry/exit documents.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/25/2017. (KAM, )
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1105 ORDER the Provider Plaintiffs Motion for an Extension of the March 29, 2017 Deadline to Produce Non-Alabama Named Provider Plaintiffs Discovery #1051 is GRANTED: Provider Plaintiffs will substantially complete their structured and unstructured productions on April 18, 2017, May 1, 2017, and June 1, 2017, as further set out in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/25/2017. (KAM, )
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1104 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT - The Court therefore ORDERS that the Special Master=s application for payment is hereby approved, with: (i) one-half, or $1,500.00, to be paid by the Defendants; and (ii) one-fourth, or $750.00, to be paid by the Subscriber Track, and one-fourth, or $750.00, to be paid by the Provider Track, from their Common Benefit monies.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/25/2017. (KAM, )
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1103 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT - The Court therefore ORDERS that the Special Master=s application for payment is hereby approved, with one-half of the billing for common projects, plus the billing that=s specific only to Subscriber Track projects, or $22,500.00, to be paid by the Subscriber Track and one-half of the billing for common projects, plus the billing that=s specific only to Provider Track projects, or $19,500.00, to be paid by the Provider Track, from their Common Benefit monies. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/25/2017. (KAM)
April 25, 2017 1102 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Additional BCBS-AL Custodians by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AVC) Document un-sealed 5/5/2017 see 1132 Modified on 5/5/2017 (KAM, ).
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order 1100 DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 46. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 4/25/2017. (KAM)
April 24, 2017 1101 Reply in support of defendants' Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 44 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (KAM, ) Document unsealed 5/2/2017 Modified on 5/2/2017 (KAM, ).
April 24, 2017 1099 REPLY to re #1058 in Support of Defendants' Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 44 filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Andrew)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 1098 ORDER for the reasons stated on the record during the 4/21/2017 status conference; #1046 Motion for Reconsideration is denied without prejudice; the parties and the court will reassess the questions raised by the motion at a later date. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/24/2017. (KAM, )
April 21, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Motion Hearing held on 4/21/2017; re #849 , #1051 , #1063 , #1053 , #1064 , #1065 ; arguments by counsel; hrg adj (Court Reporter Julie Martin) (ASL)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 1097 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE the parties are directed to appear and show cause why an injunction should not be entered to either (a) enjoin Anthem, Defendants, Provider Plaintiffs, and Subscriber Plaintiffs from providing information and documents deemed confidential under the Qualified Protective Order and the courts Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan to Cigna in connection with the litigation before the Delaware Chancery Court, and/or (b) enjoin Cigna from requesting such confidential information and documents; parties to simultaneously file briefs by 5/3/2017; reply briefs may be filed by 5/10/2017. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/21/2017. (KAM)
April 21, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge R David Proctor: Status Conference held on 4/21/2017. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson.) (KLL)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 1096 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on the Motion to Withdraw filed by attorney D. Keith Andress. #1095 The Motion #1095 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate attorney Andress. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/20/2017. (KAM)
April 20, 2017 1095 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Excellus Heath Plan, Excellus BlueCross Blue Shield by Defendants' Counsel. (Andress, D)
April 20, 2017 1094 RESPONSE to re #1072 Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding the Filed Rate Summary Judgment Motions filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Hoover, Craig)
April 20, 2017 1093 STATUS REPORT (PROVIDER PLAINTIFFS' REPORT REGARDING STATUS CONFERENCE ON APRIL 21, 2017) by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Whatley, Joe)
April 19, 2017 1092 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1063 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines in Discovery Order No. 44 Joint Reply by Non-Party Insurers Aetna, Inc.; UnitedHealthGroup, Incorporated; Humana, Inc.; and Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company in Support of their Joint Motion to Stay Discovery Deadlines in Discovery Order No. 44 filed by AETNA, Inc.. (Wells, H)
April 19, 2017 1091 RESPONSE to re #1058 Joint Response by Non-Party Insurers Aetna, Inc.; UnitedHealthGroup, Incorporated; Humana, Inc.; and Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company to Defendants Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 44 filed by AETNA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wells, H)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order 1090 TEXT ORDER-The court's March 24, 2017 Order Setting April Status Conference #1049 is AMENDED as follows: the status conference is set for 9:00 a.m. (CDT) on April 21, 2017 in CR 8.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/19/2017. (KAM)
April 18, 2017 1089 STATUS REPORT by Provider Plaintiffs on Tranche 1 Productions by Plaintiffs' Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel (Brown, W)
April 18, 2017 1088 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1064 Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION for Order Directing Provider Plaintiffs and Subscriber Plaintiffs to Proceed on Separate Tracks for All Discovery Purposes filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoover, Craig)
April 18, 2017 1087 RESPONSE to Motion re #1053 MOTION for Reconsideration of Discovery Order No. 44 #1040 or, Alternatively, to Enlarge the Deadline for Objecting to Such Order by Health Care Cost Institute, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
April 18, 2017 1086 RESPONSE to re #1065 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion Concerning Certain Deposition Time Limitations filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - In re Anthem Data Breach Litig 12/8/2016 Order)(Zott, David)
April 18, 2017 1085 RESPONSE to re #1052 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Zott, David)
April 18, 2017 1083 CONSOLIDATED FORTH AMENDED PROVIDER COMPLAINT (this document relates to 2:12-cv-2532) (KAM, )Unsealed 4/28/2017 see order 1113 Modified on 5/2/2017 (KAM, ).
April 17, 2017 1084 ***Document Sealed - Defendants' response to Non-Party Health Care Cost Institute Inc's MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION of Discovery Order No.44 or, alternatively, to enlarge the deadline for objection to such order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (KAM)
April 17, 2017 1082 SUBSCRIBER TRACK THIRD AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (KAM) Document unsealed 4/28/2017, see order 1113 Modified on 5/2/2017 (KAM, ).
April 17, 2017 1081 RESPONSE to re #1063 Provider Plaintiffs' Response to Non-Party Insurers' Motion to Stay Deadlines in Discovery Order No. 44 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
April 17, 2017 1080 RESPONSE to re #1057 Provider Plaintiffs' Response to Non-Party Humana, Inc.'s Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 44 filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
April 17, 2017 1079 RESPONSE to Non-Party Humana Inc.'s Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 44 Filed as Dkt 1057 Under Seal filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Campbell, Andrew)
April 17, 2017 1078 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1053 MOTION for Reconsideration of Discovery Order No. 44 #1040 or, Alternatively, to Enlarge the Deadline for Objecting to Such Order by Health Care Cost Institute, Inc. FILED UNDER SEAL filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Campbell, Andrew)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 1077 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Subscriber Track Second Amended Consolidated Amended Complaint. #1074 The Motion #1074 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs are directed to file the proposed Third Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint with the Clerk of the Court.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/17/2017. (KAM)
April 17, 2017 1076 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1063 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines in Discovery Order No. 44 filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Campbell, Andrew)
April 17, 2017 1075 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel Of Filing Under Seal of Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fourth Amended Provider Complaint, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Whatley, Joe)
April 17, 2017 1074 MOTION to Amend/Correct #897 Amended Complaint with Subscriber Plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Complaint by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Amended Complaint)(Guin, David)
April 17, 2017 1073 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel re #1051 MOTION for an Extension of the March 29, 2017 Deadline to Produce Non-Alabama Named Provider Plaintiffs' Discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whatley, Joe)
April 17, 2017 1072 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel Subscriber Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding the Filed Rate Summary Judgment Motions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
April 14, 2017 1071 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Pursuant to Discovery Order 45 by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Ragsdale, Barry)
April 14, 2017 1070 MOTION for Leave to File Amend by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Class Action Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hatch, Robert)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 1069 TEXT ORDER re 1059 . The Discovery Conference set for Friday, April 21, 2017, will begin immediately following Judge Proctor's April Status Conference and caucuses. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on April 14, 2017. (AMP)
April 14, 2017 1068 REPORT Regarding Proposed Agenda for Status Conference on April 21, 2017 by Special Master. (Gentle, Edgar)
April 12, 2017 1067 Subscriber Plaintiffs' REPLY in Support of #1046 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Regarding Filed Rate Summary Judgment Motions filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
April 7, 2017 1066 MOTION to Clarify Discovery Order No. 45 by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry)
April 7, 2017 1065 Subscriber Plaintiffs' MOTION Concerning Certain Deposition Time Limitations by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Hellums, Christopher) See Discovery order 46 Modified on 5/11/2017 (KAM, ).
April 7, 2017 1064 Provider Plaintiffs' MOTION for Order Directing Provider Plaintiffs and Subscriber Plaintiffs to Proceed on Separate Tracks for All Discovery Purposes by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Whatley, Joe)
April 7, 2017 1063 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery Deadlines in Discovery Order No. 44 by CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company. (Weller, Christopher)
April 7, 2017 1062 NOTICE of Filing by Defendants' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoover, Craig)
April 6, 2017 1061 Opposition to #1046 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Regarding Filed Rate Summary Judgment Motions filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Hoover, Craig)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 1060 TEXT ORDER re #1053 MOTION for Reconsideration of Discovery Order No. 44 #1040 or, Alternatively, to Enlarge the Deadline for Objecting to Such Order filed by Health Care Cost Institute, Inc.. Any response to the motion is due no later than Tuesday, April 18, 2017. Argument on the motion will be heard at the Discovery Status Conference set for Friday, April 21, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on April 6, 2017. (AMP)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order 1059 TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Friday, April 21, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on April 6, 2017. (AMP)
April 5, 2017 1058 Defendants' Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 44 by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Campbell, Andrew) Modified on 6/28/2017 (KAM, ).
April 5, 2017 1057 ***Document Sealed -Non-Party Humana Inc.'s Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 44. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (AVC)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 1056 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Regarding Filed Rate Summary Judgment Motions. #1046 Defendants' Response to the Motion is due on or before April 6, 2017. Any Reply by Subscriber Plaintiffs is due on or before April 12, 2017. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/5/2017. (AVC)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 1055 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Non-Party Humana Inc.'s Motion to File Under Seal. #1054 Humana contends the Objection and an attachment contain proprietary and confidential business information regarding Humanas technical systems and IT infrastructure. Because it appears the material sought to be filed under seal relates to a discovery issue, rather than a merits issue, the Motion #1054 is GRANTED. Humana is granted leave to file its Rule 72 Objection and the Declaration of Heather Kolasinsky under seal. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 4/5/2017. (AVC)
April 5, 2017 1054 MOTION to File Under Seal by Humana Inc.. (Turner, Sara)
April 5, 2017 1053 MOTION for Reconsideration of Discovery Order No. 44 #1040 or, Alternatively, to Enlarge the Deadline for Objecting to Such Order by Health Care Cost Institute, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mays, Joseph)
April 3, 2017 1052 Subscriber Plaintiffs' NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Advance of Economics Day II by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hellums, Christopher)
March 29, 2017 1051 MOTION for an Extension of the March 29, 2017 Deadline to Produce Non-Alabama Named Provider Plaintiffs' Discovery by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order 1050 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 45-Motion to Compel Production #1013 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set out. The Motions for Extension of Time #1029 , #1030 , #1031 , #1033 , and #1034 are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 3/27/2017. (AVC)
March 24, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference held on 3/24/2017. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (ASL)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 1049 ORDER SETTING APRIL STATUS CONFERENCE - Status Conference set for 4/21/2017 09:00 AM before Judge R David Proctor. On or before Friday, April 14, 2017, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed agenda of items the parties wish to be addressed during the status conference.The Special Master will provide a call in number for the conference.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/24/2017. (KAM, )
March 24, 2017 1048 RESPONSE to #1042 Status Report Regarding Non-Party Alabama Provider Discovery filed by Grandview Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mays, Joseph)
March 24, 2017 1047 RESPONSE to Subscribers' Status Report on Production of Explanatory Information filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kimble, Cavender)
March 23, 2017 1046 Subscriber Plaintiffs' MOTION for Reconsideration of #998 Order Regarding Filed Rate Summary Judgment Motions by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
March 22, 2017 1045 STATUS REPORT Regarding Subscriber Plaintiffs' Position on Defendants' Motions to Extend the Time to Substantially Produce Non-Claims Structured Data by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order 1044 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENTfor services rendered and expenses incurred from January 1, 2017 through February 28, 2017 in this matter relating solely to services provided to the Plaintiffs, and totaling $65,600.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/22/2017. (KAM)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order 1043 ORDER APPROVING SPEICAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for payment for services rendered and expenses incurred from January 1, 2017 through February 28, 2017 in this matter as it relates to services rendered for both sides of the case, and totaling $11,000.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/22/2017. (KAM)
March 22, 2017 1042 STATUS REPORT Defendants Status Report Regarding Non-Party Alabama Provider Discovery by Defendants' Counsel. filed by Defendants' Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stenerson to Kelly re BCBSM Subpoena to Huntsville, #2 Exhibit Stenerson to Kelly re BCBSM Subpoena to Russellville, #3 Exhibit Stenerson to Kelly re BCBSM Subpoena to Grandview, #4 Exhibit Stenerson to Kelly re BCBSM Subpoena to Andrews, #5 Exhibit Stenerson to Kelly re BCBSM Subpoena to Dr. Waits, #6 Exhibit Brown to Stenerson re Waits Costs, #7 Exhibit Kelly to Stenerson re Huntsville Costs, #8 Exhibit Kelly to Stenerson re Russellville Costs, #9 Exhibit Mays to Stenerson re Grandview Costs, #10 Exhibit Stenerson to Kelly re Huntsville Invoice, #11 Exhibit Stenerson to Kelly re Russellville Invoice, #12 Exhibit Stenerson to Mays re Grandview Invoice, #13 Exhibit Stenerson to Brown re Waits & Cahaba Invoice, #14 Exhibit Stenerson to Wilson re Andrews Production Status)(Campbell, Andrew)
March 22, 2017 1041 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Update Regarding Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order 1040 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 44. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 3/22/2017. (AVC)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 1039 ORDER SETTING INTERIM DEADLINE FOR THE PROVISIONOF SUPPLEMENTAL SEARCH TERM PROPOSALS-re: Motion to Compel the Provision of Supplemental Search Term Proposals #1028 . It is ORDERED that Section 7 of the Second Amended Discovery Order is AMENDED as set out. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/21/2017. (AVC)
March 21, 2017 1038 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2/28/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sabrina Lewis, Telephone number 205-278-2065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 4/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2017. (JLC)
March 21, 2017 1037 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/9/2017, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie A. Martin. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 4/11/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/19/2017. (KAM, )
March 21, 2017 1036 NOTICE by Defendants' Counsel re #1028 MOTION to Compel the Provision of Supplemental Search Term Proposals (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoover, Craig)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 1035 TEXT ORDER re #1033 MOTION for Extension of Time, and #1034 MOTION for Extension of Time. The parties are notified that these motions also are subject to the instructions set out in the Text Order dated March 15, 2017 1032 . Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on March 16, 2017. (AMP)
March 15, 2017 1034 MOTION for Extension of Time to Substantially Produce Non-Claims Structured Data (as to USAble Mutual Insurance Company, d/b/a Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield) by Defendants' Counsel. (Naranjo, Michael)
March 15, 2017 1033 MOTION for Extension of Time to Substantially Produce Non-Claims Structured Data by California Physicians' Services by Defendants' Counsel. (Fronk, Casey)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order 1032 TEXT ORDER. This matter is before the court on three motions to extend Judge Proctor's March 15, 2017 deadline to substantially complete production of non-claims structured data. #1029 #1030 #1031 . The parties SHALL continue their efforts to reach an agreement as to an extended deadline. On or before March 22, 2017, Plaintiffs SHALL file a report summarizing their position on the Motions, or a report on any agreement if one has been reached by that time. The parties also should be prepared to provide a report to the court on this issue at Judge Putnam's March 24, 2017 discovery conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on March 15, 2017. (AMP, )
March 14, 2017 1031 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Substantially Complete Production of Non-Claims Structured Data (as to Hogan Lovells Plans and BCBS-MI) by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Hoover, Craig)
March 14, 2017 1030 MOTION for Extension of Time for the Production of Non-Claims Structured Data by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Briggs, John)
March 14, 2017 1029 MOTION for Extension of Time for BlueCross BlueShield of Tennessee to Produce Non-Claims Structured Data by Defendants' Counsel. (Miller, Margot)
March 13, 2017 1028 MOTION to Compel the Provision of Supplemental Search Term Proposals by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoover, Craig)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 1027 TEXT ORDER re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data. (Doc. 1013). After reviewing the defendants' production, plaintiffs are directed to update their motion to specify what explanatory information remains to be produced. The plaintiffs' update shall be filed no later than noon on Wednesday, March 22, 2017. The Hogan Lovells Defendants may respond to the plaintiffs' update no later than noon on March 24, 2017. Oral argument on the updated motion will be heard at the Discovery Conference set for Friday, March 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on March 13, 2017. (AMP, )
March 10, 2017 1026 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data (as to Hogan Lovells plans) filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Hoover, Craig)
March 10, 2017 1025 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data (Ragsdale, Barry)
March 10, 2017 1024 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data (Ragsdale, Barry)
March 10, 2017 1023 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data (Ragsdale, Barry)
March 9, 2017 1022 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data (Ragsdale, Barry)
March 9, 2017 1021 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data (Ragsdale, Barry)
March 9, 2017 1020 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data (Ragsdale, Barry)
March 9, 2017 1019 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data (Ragsdale, Barry)
March 8, 2017 1018 NOTICE by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data (Ragsdale, Barry)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order 1017 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Defendants' Notice #1016 that document number 1010 and the exhibits thereto need not be sealed. The clerk of the court is directed to UNSEAL document number 1010 and the exhibits thereto. #1010 [1010-1] [1010-2] [1010-3] [1010-4]. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/8/2017. (AVC)
March 7, 2017 1016 NOTICE (Letter) by Defendants' Counsel re #1010 Document Sealed Justification (Campbell, Andrew) Modified on 3/9/2017 (KAM, ).
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 1015 TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Friday, March 24, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on March 3, 2017. (AMP)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 1014 TEXT ORDER re #1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. Any response to the motion is due no later than March 10, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on March 3, 2017. (AMP)
March 1, 2017 1013 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Explanatory Information Accompanying Structured Data by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1012 ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY ORDER No. 42-The deadline for discovery in the streamlined action is extended to 9/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 3/1/2017. (AVC)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order 1011 ORDER-The Motions to Quash Subpoenas #883 , #884 , #885 , #886 are MOOT without prejudice to the movant's ability to refile the motions, should attempts to reach an agreement fail. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 3/1/2017. (AVC)
February 28, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference held on 2/28/2017. (Court Reporter Sabrina Lewis) (ASL)
February 28, 2017 1010 ***Document Sealed-Supplemental Filing in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data from Third-Party National Insurers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (AVC)
February 28, 2017 1009 Statement Regarding the Objecting Non-Party Alabama Providers' Responses to Provider Plaintiffs' Subpoenas filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Campbell, Andrew)
February 27, 2017 1008 Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama STATUS REPORT by Defendants' Counsel. (Malatesta, John)
February 27, 2017 1007 Subscriber Plaintiffs' STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
February 24, 2017 1006 Provider Plaintiffs' RESPONSE to #994 the Court's February 16, 2017 Order Regarding Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Whatley, Joe)
February 24, 2017 1005 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Position Paper Regarding Status of Discovery Requests From Third Party Insurers by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ragsdale, Barry)
February 24, 2017 1004 RESPONSE to Order Regarding Non-Party Subpoenas Issued by Provider Plaintiffs by Andrews Sports Medicine and Orthopaedic Center, LLC. (Wilson, Benjamin)
February 24, 2017 1003 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and Data from Third-Party National Insurers by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Supplement Letter Brief)(Campbell, Andrew)
February 24, 2017 1002 SUBMISSION in Response to #994 the Court's Order filed by Grandview Medical Center. (Mays, Joseph)
February 24, 2017 1001 JOINT Opposition to #996 Motion to Compel and Joint Response to #995 Provider Plaintiffs' Status Report filed by AETNA, Inc., CIGNA Health and Life Insurance Company, Humana Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Wells, H)
February 24, 2017 1000 RESPONSE to #994 Order Regarding Non-Party Subpoenas Issued by Provider Plaintiffs filed by Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville, Russellville Hospital, Inc.. (Kelly, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 999 ORDER UNSEALING CERTAIN DOCUMENTS; The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to unseal the following documents and/or exhibits as set out herein: Document 685-2, Document 685-3, Document 729-1, Document 729-2, Document 729-7, Document 729-8, Document 729-9, Document 738, Documents 738-2 through Document 738-87, Document 771, and Documents 773-1 through 773-12. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/23/2017. (JLC)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order 998 ORDER GRANTING #733 AMENDED and RESTATED MOTION Based on Filed Rate Doctrine for Summary Judgment on the Alabama Subscribers' Damages Claims to the extent that the money damages claims of Plaintiffs CB Roofing, Inc. and American Electric Motor Service, Inc. against all Defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. In all other respects, the #733 Motion is DENIED, GRANTING #770 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment to the extent that the Filed Rate affirmative defense is UNAVAILABLE as a defense to the claims of any Subscriber Plaintiff who paid a rate that varied upward from the filed rate. In all other respects, the #770 Motion is DENIED in accordance with the #997 Memorandum Opinion entered contemporaneously herewith. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/23/2017. (JLC)
February 23, 2017 997 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/23/2017. (JLC)
February 17, 2017 996 ***Document Sealed -Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Data from Third-Party National Insurers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #9 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #10 Exhibit 8 Part 3, #11 Exhibit 8 Part 4, #12 Exhibit 8 Part 5, #13 Exhibit 8 Part 6, #14 Exhibit 8 Part 7, #15 Exhibit 8 Part 8, #16 Exhibit 8 Part 9, #17 Exhibit 8 Part 10, #18 Exhibit 8 Part 11, #19 Exhibit 9, #20 Exhibit 10) (AVC)
February 17, 2017 995 Provider Plaintiffs' Status Report on Non-Party Insurers' Productions by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Sheehan, Patrick)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order 994 ORDER- re: Objections and Motions to Quash Subpoenas #883 , #884 , #885 , #886 . The provider plaintiffs and non-party movants are DIRECTED to file with the court, by 2/24/2017, briefs addressing why the subpoenas issued by the provider plaintiffs require a different ruling than what already was adjudicated in Discovery Order No. 34 #832 and Judge Proctor's Order Regarding Objections to Discovery Order No. 34 #955 . Oral argument on this issue and the motions will be heard at the Discovery Status Conference set for 2/28/2017 at 1:00p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/16/2017. (AVC)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order 993 ORDER AMENDING DISCOVERY ORDER No. 39-re: Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Non-Alabama Named Provider Plaintiffs' Discovery #983 . Discovery Order No. 39 is AMENDED: The provider pltfs are ORDERED to produce to the dfts unstructured and structured data requested from the non-Alabama named provider pltfs by 3/29/2017. The provider pltfs also are ORDERED to provide proposed custodians and search terms to the dfts by 2/22/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/15/2017. (AVC)
February 14, 2017 992 RESPONSE to #983 Provider Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Non-Alabama Provider Plaintiffs' Discovery filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Zott, David)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order 991 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 43-Motion to Compel Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Eddie Harris for Deposition and for an Order Setting Parameters for Discovery Scheduling #973 is GRANTED. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama is DIRECTED to produce all remaining documents related to Eddie Harris no later than 2/16/2017, and to make Mr. Harris available to sit for a deposition on 3/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 2/14/2017. (AVC)
February 14, 2017 990 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/14/2017. (AVC)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 989 SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER-It is ORDERED that the schedule SHALL apply to the prioritized proceedings in American Electric Motor Services Inc. v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama et al., Conway v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama et al., and Pettus Plumbing & Piping, Inc., v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama et al. as set out. Pltf's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order #959 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/13/2017. (AVC)
February 10, 2017 988 RESPONSE to #973 Motion to Compel Production of Eddie Harris for Deposition and for an Order Setting Parameters for Discovery Scheduling filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Burkhalter, Carl)
February 10, 2017 987 RESPONSE #977 Plaintiffs' Status Report filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 10/21/2016 Brown Letter to Salomon, #2 Exhibit B - 2/6/2017 Brown Letter to Salomon)(Cottrell, Christa)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order 986 ORDER SETTING STATUS MARCH CONFERENCE for 3/24/2017 at 09:00a.m., in Courtroom 7A of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse. By 3/20/2017, the parties SHALL submit a joint report containing a proposed agenda of items the parties wish to be addressed during the status conference. The Special Master will provide a call in number for the conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/10/2017. (AVC)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 985 TEXT ORDER re #983 MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Non-Alabama Named Provider Plaintiffs' Discovery. The defendants have until February 15, 2017, to notify the court whether the motion is opposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on February 9, 2017. (AMP)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order 984 TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (doc. 229) shall be held on Tuesday, February 28, 2017, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Any written submissions are governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on February 9, 2017. (AMP)
February 8, 2017 983 MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Non-Alabama Named Provider Plaintiffs' Discovery by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Whatley, Joe)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order 982 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the Court on Non-parties SK&A Information Services, Inc. and Quintiles IMS Incorporated, f/k/a IMS Health Incorporateds Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance. #980 The Motion #980 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Non-parties SK&A Information Services, Inc. and Quintiles IMS Incorporated, f/k/a IMS Health Incorporated, as well as attorney Daniel R. Walworth. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/8/2017. (AVC)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order 981 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on Defendants' Motion to Remove the Seal on their Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Proposed Class Members. #979 The Motion #979 is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to UNSEAL the unredacted version of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Proposed Class Members. #951 In light of Defendant's Motion #979 , its earlier Motion to Maintain the Seal #947 is MOOT. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/8/2017. (AVC)
February 7, 2017 980 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Quintiles IMS Incorporated, f/k/a IMS Health Incorporated, SK&A Information Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walworth, Daniel)
February 7, 2017 979 Defendants' MOTION to Remove the Seal on their #946 Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Proposed Class Members by Defendants' Counsel. (Cottrell, Christa)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order 978 TEXT ORDER re #973 MOTION to Compel Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Eddie Harris for Deposition and for an Order Setting Parameters for Discovery Scheduling filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. Any response to the motion by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama is due by February 10, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on February 7, 2017. (AMP)
February 6, 2017 977 Provider Plaintiff's STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
February 6, 2017 976 REPLY in Support of #959 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Whatley, Joe)
February 3, 2017 975 CORRECTED Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/31/2017, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone number (256) 656-8239. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 2/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2017. (AVC)
February 3, 2017 974 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/31/2017, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone number (256) 656-8239. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 2/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2017. (AVC)
February 1, 2017 973 MOTION to Compel Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Eddie Harris for Deposition and for an Order Setting Parameters for Discovery Scheduling by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Whatley, Joe)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 972 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 42-The deadline for discovery in both the Multidistrict Litigation and the streamlined action is extended to 9/25/2017. Any remaining deadlines for filing will be set by the district judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/31/2017. (AVC)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 971 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 41-re: Motion for Clarification of Discovery Order No. 37 #952 . Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama is ORDERED to produce responsive documents from the sample set that are retrieved by search strings with a responsive rate of greater than 0% but less than 4%. Production of the documents shall be made by 2/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/31/2017. (AVC)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 970 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 40-The Motion to Compel Anthem to Produce Documents Related to the Anthem-Cigna Merger Litigation #945 is GRANTED insofar as Anthem is ORDERED to produce the documents set out. Production is to be made by 2/20/2017. In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/31/2017. (AVC)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 969 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 39-The Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Non-Alabama Names Provider Plaintiffs #846 is GRANTED, and the provider plaintiffs are ORDERED to produce to the defendants unstructured and structured data by 3/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/31/2017. (AVC)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 968 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 38- Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/31/2017. (AVC)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 967 ORDER -Pursuant to the discussion at the Discovery Conference held on 1/24/2017, Subscriber Pltfs' Motion to Quash Third Party Subpoenas #920 is WITHDRAWN as set out in the Subscriber Pltfs' Reply Regarding Motion to Quash Absent Class Member Subpoenas #958 . Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/31/2017. (AVC)
January 30, 2017 966 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/24/2017, before Magistrate Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lindy M. Fuller, Telephone number (205) 527-2958. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 2/20/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/30/2017. (AVC)
January 30, 2017 965 Certain Defendants' Opposition to #959 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Sooy, Kathleen)
January 25, 2017 964 RESPONSE to #963 Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Anthem to Produce Documents Related to the Anthem-Cigna Merger Litigation filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hoover, Craig)
January 24, 2017 963 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Support of #945 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Anthem to Produce Documents Related to the Anthem-Cigna Merger Litigation by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ragsdale, Barry)
January 24, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference held on 1/24/2017; Motions #849 , #801 , #846 , #920 , #945 , #952 ; arguments by counsel; discovery status updates; hrg adj. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (ASL)
January 24, 2017 962 NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles C Hunter (Hunter, Charles)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 961 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from November 1, 2016 through December 31, 2016 in this matter relating solely to services provided to the Plaintiffs, and totaling $50,800.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/24/2017. (AVC)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order 960 ORDER APPROVING SPECIAL MASTER INVOICE FOR PAYMENT for services rendered and expenses incurred from November 1, 2016 through December 31, 2016 in this matter as it relates to services rendered for both sides of the case, and totaling $10,000.00. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/24/2017. (AVC)
January 23, 2017 959 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whatley, Joe)
January 20, 2017 958 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Reply Regarding #920 Motion to Quash Absent Class Member Subpoenas filed by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
January 20, 2017 957 Provider Plaintiffs' Response to #950 Status Report of Third-Party Managed Care Companies filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sheehan, Patrick)
January 20, 2017 956 Opposition to #945 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Anthem to Produce Documents Related to the Anthem-Cigna Merger Litigation filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hoover, Craig)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 955 ORDER REGARDING OBJECTIONS TO DISCOVERY ORDER NO. 34- Nothing in Discovery Order No. 34 is either clearly erroneous or contrary to law. Dfts' Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 34 #845 is OVERRULED IN PART AND SUSTAINED IN PART. The non-party targets' Objections to Discovery Order No. 34 #851 - #853 are OVERRULED as not properly presented to the court. Dfts' Motion to Strike Grandview Medical Center's Brief in Support of its Appeal and Objection to Discovery Order No. 34 #912 is DENIED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/20/2017. (AVC)
January 19, 2017 954 STATUS REPORT for January 24, 2017 Discovery Conference by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hoover, Craig)
January 19, 2017 953 JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Schedule by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Ragsdale, Barry)
January 18, 2017 952 MOTION for Clarification of Discovery Order No. 37 by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
January 18, 2017 951 ***Document Sealed -Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Proposed Class Members. (AVC)
January 17, 2017 950 STATUS REPORT of Third-Party Managed Care Companies filed by AETNA, Inc. (Wells, H)
January 17, 2017 949 JOINT STATUS REPORT on Non-Party Insurers Productions by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Sheehan, Patrick)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order 948 TEXT ORDER-This matter is SET for a telephone conference at 9:00 a.m. Central time on Tuesday, January 31, 2017, to discuss Economics Day part 2. The Special Master will provide a call in number for the conference. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/17/2017. (AVC)
January 13, 2017 947 MOTION to Maintain the Seal on its Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Proposed Class Members by Defendants' Counsel. (Cottrell, Christa)
January 13, 2017 946 RESPONSE to #920 Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Proposed Class Members Redacted filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Compilation re Subpoenas, #2 Exhibit F - 6/9/2016 Letter from Cottrell to Ragsdale, #3 Exhibit G - 6/14/2016 Letter from Ragsdale to Cottrell)(Cottrell, Christa)
January 12, 2017 945 MOTION to Compel Anthem to Produce Documents Related to the Anthem-Cigna Merger Litigation by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Whatley, Joe)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order 944 ORDER-re: Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadlines for Responding to the Amended Complaints #942 . The Motion is GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that all deadlines set forth in the court's December 15 Order 915 are STAYED. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/12/2017. (AVC)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order 943 DISCOVERY ORDER No. 37-The Motion to Compel #847 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 1/11/2017. (AVC)
January 11, 2017 942 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadlines for Responding to the Amended Complaints by Defendants' Counsel. (Hoover, Craig)
January 10, 2017 941 POST-HEARING Submission of Amended Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Unstructured Data. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry)
January 9, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2017 re #847 #849 MOTIONS; arguments by counsel; court's remarks; order to be entered; hrg adj (Court Reporter Julie Martin.) (ASL)
January 9, 2017 940 Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama's REPLY to #939 Plaintiffs' Status Report Regarding Motion to Compel filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Malatesta, John)
January 5, 2017 939 STATUS REPORT Regarding Motion to Compel Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Unstructured Data by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 938 TEXT ORDER-This matter is before the court on the Motion of Certain Defendants for Certification Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(B) which was filed in the four pending Alabama actions ((1) Conway, et al., v. Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Alabama, et al., Case No. 2:12-cv-02169-RDP (N.D. Ala.); (2) American Electric Motor Services, Inc., et al., v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, et al., Case No. 2:12-cv-02532-RDP (N.D. Ala.); (3) Pettus Plumbing & Piping, Inc. v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, et al., Case No. 3:16-cv-00297-RDP (N.D. Ala.); and (4) Pearce, Bevill, Leesburg, Moore, P.C. v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama, et al., Case No. 2:16-cv-00464-RDP (N.D. Ala.)). A status conference to discuss the Motions is SET in Courtroom 7A immediately following the Special Discovery Status Conference before Judge Putnam on Monday, January 9, 2017. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/5/2017. (AVC)
January 4, 2017 937 STATUS REPORT Regarding Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alabama to Produce Unstructured and Structured Data by Defendants' Counsel. (Malatesta, John)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 936 TEXT ORDER re 935 Order Setting Deadlines. The Order is WITHDRAWN as it relates to #924 Non-Party Sutter Health, Inc.'s Objections to Subpoena Duces Tecum and Subpoena for Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on January 3, 2017. (AMP)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order 935 TEXT ORDER re #920 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Third Party Subpoenas, and #924 Non-Party Sutter Health, Inc.'s Objections to Subpoena Duces Tecum and Subpoena for Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition. Any response to the motions is due no later than January 13, 2017. Any reply by the movants is due no later than January 20, 2017. Argument of the motions will be heard at the Discovery Conference set for Tuesday, January 24, 2017, by Order 928 dated December 27, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on January 3, 2017. (AMP, )
January 3, 2017 934 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 19, 2016, before Judge T. Michael Putnam. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret Wasmund, Telephone number 601-329-6113. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 1/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/3/2017. (MRR, )
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order 933 TEXT ORDER -This matter is before the court on Grandview Medical Center's Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery Deadlines in Discovery Order No. 34. #931 The Motion #931 is GRANTED. The deadlines in Discovery Order No. 34 are STAYED pending a ruling on the appeals of that order. The court will address the deadlines in any ruling on the appeals. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/30/2016. (AVC)
December 30, 2016 932 JOINDER in Motion to Extend Stay of Discovery Deadlines in Discovery Order No. 34 MOTION by Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville, Russellville Hospital, Inc. (Kelly, Jeffrey)
December 29, 2016 931 MOTION to Extend Stay of Discovery Order Deadlines in Discovery Order No. 34 by Grandview Medical Center. (Mays, Joseph)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order 930 TEXT ORDER. A Special Discovery Status Conference is SET for Monday, January 9, 2017, at 2:00 PM in COURTROOM 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on December 28, 2016. (AMP)
December 27, 2016 929 REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Defendants' Counsel re: #912 MOTION to Strike #901 Response in Opposition to Motion, Grandview Medical Center's Brief in Support of its Appeal and objection to Discovery Order No. 34 filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Campbell, Andrew)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order 928 TEXT ORDER. The Status Conference set by Discovery Order No. 1 (Doc. 229) shall be held on Tuesday, January 24, 2017, at 9:00 AM in COURTROOM 3B of the Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam. Court reporter to be present. Caucuses to follow. Parties are directed to file, jointly to the extent possible, proposed discovery deadlines no later than Wednesday, January 18, 2017. All other written submissions shall be governed by subsection II.D.2 of Discovery Order No. 1, as amended, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on December 27, 2016. (AMP, )
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order 927 ORDER denying #907 Motion for Order to Show Cause with regard to the dfts' intention to subpoena providers outside the state of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam on 12/22/2016. (KAM, )
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order 926 ORDER in accordance with the memo opn entered contemporaneously, This case is before the court on five Motions to Dismiss (e.g., Docs. # 208, 210, 211, 212, 213, Case No. 2:12-cv-02169-RDP), based on personal jurisdiction and venue defenses, that have been filed in four pending Alabama actions; these Motions to Dismiss are DENIED. The court will address the denial of these Motions to Dismiss in subsequent orders in the appropriate related cas. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/21/2016. (KAM, )
December 21, 2016 925 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/21/2016. (KAM, )
December 21, 2016 924 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Blue Cross Blue Shield Association by Sutter Health, Inc..(Sowatzka, Adam)
December 20, 2016 923 RESPONSE in Opposition re #912 MOTION to Strike #901 Response in Opposition to Motion, Grandview Medical Center's Brief in Support of its Appeal and objection to Discovery Order No. 34 filed by Grandview Medical Center. (Mays, Joseph)
December 19, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge T Michael Putnam: Discovery Status Conference held on 12/19/2016. (Court Reporter Margaret Wasmund.) (ASL)
December 16, 2016 922 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Status Report for the December 19, 2016 Conference by Plaintiffs' Counsel, Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jones, Megan)
December 16, 2016 921 Provider Plaintiffs' STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1, #2 Ex 2, #3 Ex 3, #4 Ex 4, #5 Ex 5, #6 Ex 6)(Whatley, Joe)
December 16, 2016 920 ***WITHDRAWN, pursuant to Order #967 *** Subscriber Plaintiffs' Motion to Quash Third Party Subpoenas by Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Ragsdale, Barry) Modified on 1/31/2017 (AVC).
December 16, 2016 919 RESPONSE to Provider Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order to Show Cause filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 11/11/2016 Letter from Whatley to Bush)(Cottrell, Christa)
December 16, 2016 918 STATUS REPORT for December 19, 2016 Discovery Conference by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hoover, Craig)
December 15, 2016 917 JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Plaintiffs' Motions To Compel Defendant Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Alabama To Produce Unstructured And Structured Data by Defendants' Counsel. (Malatesta, John)
December 15, 2016 916 JOINT STATUS REPORT on Non-Party Insurers Productions by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Sheehan, Patrick)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order 915 TEXT ORDER- This matter is before the court on the parties' Unopposed Motion to Enlarge the Time for Responding to the Amended Complaints in the prioritized proceedings. #914 The Motion #914 is GRANTED. It is ORDERED as follows: On or before January 17, 2017, any motions to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) as well as motions to dismiss based on lack of personal jurisdiction and improper venue SHALL be filed; and on or before January 31, 2017 any answers to the amended complaints SHALL be filed. With respect to any Rule 12(b)(6) motions to dismiss filed on January 17, plaintiffs will have 30 days to file opposition briefs. Reply briefs will be due within 15 days. Any defendants that have preserved their jurisdictional defenses under the Stipulated Order dated September 9, 2016, continue to preserve such defenses. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/15/2016. (AVC)
December 15, 2016 914 Unopposed MOTION to Enlarge the Time for Responding to the Amended Complaints by Defendants' Counsel. (Hoover, Craig)
December 14, 2016 913 RESPONSE to #846 Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Non-Alabama Named Provider Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Whatley, Joe)
December 14, 2016 912 MOTION to Strike #901 Grandview Medical Center's Brief in Support of Its Appeal and Objection to Discovery Order No. 34 by Defendants' Counsel. (Campbell, Andrew)
December 14, 2016 911 Consolidated REPLY in Support of #845 Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 34 filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Campbell, Andrew)
December 14, 2016 910 REPLY Brief in Support of #898 Appeal and Objection to Discovery Order No. 34 and in Response to Defendants' Appeal and Objection to Discovery Order No. 34 filed by Grandview Medical Center. (Mays, Joseph)
December 14, 2016 909 Provider Plaintiffs' NOTICE Regarding Motions to Quash Their Subpoenas and Request the Motions be Held in Abeyance by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Brown, W)
December 14, 2016 908 REPLY in Support of Objections to and Appeal of Discovery Order No. 34 filed by Health Care Authority of the City of Huntsville, Russellville Hospital, Inc. (Kelly, Jeffrey)
December 9, 2016 907 MOTION for an Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Ex-A, #2 Ex-B)(Whatley, Joe)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order 906 ORDER REGARDING ECONOMICS DAY. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 12/9/2016. (AVC)
December 9, 2016 905 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/29/2016, before Judge R. David Proctor. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leah S. Turner, Telephone number (256) 656-8239. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (A copy can be obtained at http://www.alnd.uscourts.gov/local/court%20forms/transcripts/Transcript% 20Redaction%20Policy.pdf) See Transcript Redaction Policy Redaction Request due 12/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2017. (AVC)
December 8, 2016 904 Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Their Amended and Restated Motion on the Filed Rate Doctrine for Summary Judgment on the Alabama Subscribers' Damages Claims and in Opposition to Subscribers' Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on filed by Defendants' Counsel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hoover, Craig)
December 8, 2016 903 Subscriber Plaintiffs' Post-Hearing Brief on the Filed Rate Doctrine by Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Ragsdale, Barry)
December 7, 2016 902 RESPONSE on Non-Party to #845 Defendants' Rule 72 Objection to Discovery Order No. 34 filed by Andrews Sports Medicine and Orthopaedic Center, LLC. (Wilson, Benjamin)