Rogers v. Fortis Institute et al
Plaintiff: Rogers and Julie Rogers
Defendant: Fortis Institute, Education Affiliates LLC, Education Affiliates, Inc. and Tri-State Computer Institute, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01465
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER- For the reasons stated on the record during the August 8, 2017 hearing, this matter is DISMISSED for want of prosecution; Costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 8/8/17. (MRR, )
August 8, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2017 re #17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney: atty Peter Fruin present; hrg adj. (Court Reporter Teresa Roberson) (MSN)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney T Christopher Donald terminated. A Status Conference is hereby set for Tuesday, August 8, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius which will be cancelled if new counsel for the plaintiff appears by 12:00 p.m. on August 7, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/14/2017. (JLC)
July 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 7/7/2017; attys Michael Parrish, Christopher Donald, and Peter Fruin present by telephone; conf adj. (chambers) (MSN)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: In light of the pending motion (Doc. #17 ) to withdraw filed by counsel for the plaintiff, this matter is SET for a telephone conference at 2:00 p.m. on July 7, 2017. Counsel for the parties as well as the plaintiff, Julie Rogers, are instructed to dial 877-336-1831 five minutes before the status conference is scheduled to begin. The access code is 2778178. The plaintiff's attorneys are instructed to provide a copy of this order to their client.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/27/17. (MRR, )
June 9, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Motion is RIPE 6/9/2017. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Julie Rogers. (Donald, T)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain deadlines apply as further set out within. Discovery due by 10/27/2017; Dispositive Motions due by 11/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 3/14/17. (MRR, )
March 9, 2017 Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fruin, Peter)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/14/17. (MRR, )
February 14, 2017 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (MRR, )
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: As noted during the February 3, 2017 status conference, by February 10, 2017, the parties are required to submit forms indicating whether they consent to dispositive magistrate judge jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Consistent with the General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, signed January 2, 2015, if consent is not unanimous, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reassign this matter to a randomly-drawn district judge after February 10, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/6/17. (MRR, )
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL- The plft's filed a motion to dismiss all claims against two defts(Doc #10 ); It is ORDERED ADJUDGED, and DECREED that,pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, all claims against Education Affiliates, LLC, and Education Affiliates, Inc are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 2/6/17. (MRR, )
February 3, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Certain Defendants without Prejudice by Julie Rogers. (Donald, T)
February 3, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/3/2017. (ASL)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: As noted during the January 4, 2017 status conference, the plaintiff's motion (Doc. #5 ) for an extension of time to serve the defendants is GRANTED IN PART. The deadline to serve the defendants is EXTENDED for thirty (30) days beyond the date of this order. A telephone status conference is SET for 10:00 a.m. on February 3, 2017. The parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1831 five minutes before the status conference is scheduled to begin. The access code is 2778178. The status conference will be cancelled if, by February 2, 2017: (1) it is clear that all defendants have been served; or (2) a triggering event occurs under the court's January 2, 2015 General Order for Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 1/4/17. (MRR, )
January 4, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Tri-State Computer Institute, Inc. filed by Tri-State Computer Institute (Fruin, Peter)
January 4, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius: Status Conference held on 1/4/2017; attys Christopher Donald, Kathryn Bushby, and Peter Fruin present by telephone; hrg adj. (chambers) (MSN)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: This matter is SET for a telephone status conference at 10:30 a.m. on January 4, 2017. The parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1831 to join the status conference. The access code is 2778178. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 12/27/16. (MRR, )
December 22, 2016 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Fortis Institute, Tri-State Computer Institute, Inc..(Fruin, Peter)
December 1, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Julie Rogers. (Donald, T)
December 1, 2016 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Julie Rogers.(Donald, T)
November 21, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S Fruin on behalf of Fortis Institute (Fruin, Peter)
October 28, 2016 Case Reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius. Assigned to Judge Hopkins in error (MRR, )
September 7, 2016 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2695858 (B4601074175). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Education Affiliates LLC, Fortis Institute, filed by Julie Rogers.(MRR, ). (Donald, T) Modified on 9/14/2016 (MRR, ).
September 6, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT (MRR, )
September 6, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Education Affiliates LLC, Fortis Institute, filed by Julie Rogers.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Fortis Institute et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Rogers
Represented By: Michael Parrish
Represented By: Thomas C Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortis Institute
Represented By: Kathryn J Bushby
Represented By: Peter S Fruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Education Affiliates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Education Affiliates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri-State Computer Institute, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn J Bushby
Represented By: Peter S Fruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?