Bryant v. Blount County Jail
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bryant
Defendant: Blount County Jail
Case Number: 2:2019cv00029
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 3/4/2019. (AFS)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED; The plaintiff is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $2.30 in order to commence this action, and thereafter to make monthly installment payments toward payment of the full filing fee. The plaintiff must sign the attached Prisoner Consent Form and return it to the Clerk of Court, together with a check in the amount of the initial partial filing fee, within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 1/14/2019. (AFS)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Wayne Bryant. (AFS)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blount County Jail, filed by Steven Wayne Bryant.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Blount County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blount County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?