Christian v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
Case Number: 2:2019cv01187
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Southern Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00457. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 25, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/25/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: it ORDERED that the #3 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED and that, pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a), this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama; This court makes no determination about the merits of Plaintiff's claims; DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to take the necessary steps to effectuate the terms of this Order. Signed by Honorable Judge William Keith Watkins on 7/25/2019. (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/25/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Response to Order re #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by James Allen Christian. (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/25/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1404; Objections to R&R due by 7/16/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/2/2019. (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/25/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by James Allen Christian. (bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/25/2019.] Modified on 7/25/2019 (KEK).
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Jefferson S. Dunn, Christopher Gordy, Kay Ivey, filed by James Allen Christian. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(bes, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 7/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian v. Ivey et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?