Gaines v. Hines et al
Plaintiff: Phillip J Gaines
Defendant: Monk, Hines, Cutts, Jr and Cutts, Sr
Case Number: 2:2020cv01190
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Gray M Borden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Accordingly, it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due by 10/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 10/5/2020. (KEK)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - The plaintiff has submitted an application to proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by certified copies of his jail and/or prison account statements. Doc. #2 . The application is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). The undersigned therefore ORDERS the plaintiff to sign and return to the Clerk of Court, within 30 days of the entry date of this Order, the attached Prisoner Consent Form to signify that he wishes to continue with this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/19/2020. (KEK)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Phillip J Gaines. (KEK)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cutts, Sr, Cutts, Jr, Hines, Monk, filed by Phillip J Gaines.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaines v. Hines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutts, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutts, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip J Gaines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?