Wistoft v. Ivey
Plaintiff: Kevin Wistott and Kevin Wistoft
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Case Number: 2:2020cv01497
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER- The court hereby ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the initial partial filing fee of $25.72 within 14 days from the entry date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 11/20/20. (MRR, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing by Kevin Wistoft (MEB2)
October 13, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER CONSENT FORM by Kevin Wistott (MRR, )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The pltf is ORDERED to pay an initial partial filing fee of $25.72 and make monthly installment payments until the entire filing fee has been paid in full; The initial partial filing fee and the Prisoner Consent Form are due within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/2/20. (MRR, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Wistott.
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kay Ivey, filed by Kevin Wistott.(MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wistoft v. Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wistott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Wistoft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?