D.S. v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: David Smith and D. S.
Defendant: Allen Knott, Terry, Gwendolyn Givens, William Ragsdale, Charles Daniels, Karla Jones, Jeffery Willilams, Grantt Culliver, McCordles, Anthony Brooks, Pickett, Tanya Ary, Lisa Bonner, Christy Vincent, Gary Malone, Streeter, Carla Graham, Angelia Gordy, Gerald McMillian, Neketris Estelle, Jeffery Baldwin, Jefferson Dunn, Capt. Shannon Caldwell, Christopher Boyd, Errol Pickens, Garland, Carl Sanders, Kevin White and Edward Ellington
Case Number: 2:2020cv02012
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 30 Alias Summons Issued as to Anthony Brooks, Karla Jones, Gerald McMillian, Carl Sanders delivered to plaintiffs for service (KAM)
February 9, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE by D. S. Summons Returned Executed as to Allen Knott, 2/2/2021 (Brown, Ruth)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Using Pseudonyms. 27 . The Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff may proceed in this action using his initials. However, the granting of the motion is WITHOUT PREJUDICE to allow unserved Defendants to object to Plaintiff proceeding under Pseudonym. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend entries with redacted files. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to SEAL docket entries [1-8], 15 , 17 , 19 , and [23-26]. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/29/2021. (KAM)
December 16, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3736155 (B4601110300). related document 1 COMPLAINT against Grantt Culliver, Charles Daniels, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Neketris Estelle, Garland, Gwendolyn Givens, Angelia Gordy, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Allen Knott, Gary Malone, McCordles, Gerald McMillian, Errol Pickens, Pickett, William Ragsdale, Carl Sanders, Streeter, Terry, Christy Vincent, Kevin White, filed by D.S. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KAM). (Mujumdar, Anil) Modified on 12/16/2020 (MEB2). Modified on 2/1/2021 (KAM, ).
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by David Smith. (KAM)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grantt Culliver, Charles Daniels, Jefferson Dunn, Edward Ellington, Neketris Estelle, Garland, Gwendolyn Givens, Angelia Gordy, Carla Graham, Karla Jones, Allen Knott, Gary Malone, McCordles, Gerald McMillian, Errol Pickens, Pickett, William Ragsdale, Carl Sanders, Streeter, Terry, Christy Vincent, Kevin White, filed by David Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D.S. v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Knott
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Givens
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ragsdale
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Jones
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Willilams
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grantt Culliver
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCordles
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Brooks
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickett
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Ary
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Bonner
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Vincent
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Malone
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Streeter
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Graham
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelia Gordy
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald McMillian
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neketris Estelle
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Baldwin
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Dunn
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Shannon Caldwell
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Boyd
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Errol Pickens
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garland
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Sanders
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin White
Represented By: Robert F Northcutt
Represented By: C Richard Hill, Jr
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Represented By: James N Walter, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ellington
Represented By: Stephanie Lynn Dodd Smithee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Smith
Represented By: Ruth Zemel Brown
Represented By: Anil A Mujumdar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. S.
Represented By: Ruth Zemel Brown
Represented By: Anil A Mujumdar
Represented By: Megan Colleen Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?