Rutledge v. Sansing et al
Plaintiff: Laventra Denice Rutledge
Defendant: Tim Pope, Kenneth Peters, Christie Sansing, Phyllis Morgan and Cory Eller
Case Number: 2:2021cv00226
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 Brief re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . (Harmon, Bart)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Cory Eller, Phyllis Morgan, Kenneth Peters, Tim Pope, Christie Sansing. (Harmon, Bart)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the court on Defendants unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Complaint #6 . For good cause shown, the Motion #6 is GRANTED. Defendants SHALL respond to Plaintiffs Complaint #1 on or before April 12, 2021. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 3/15/2021. (KAM)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Cory Eller, Phyllis Morgan, Kenneth Peters, Tim Pope, Christie Sansing. (Harmon, Bart)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laventra Denice Rutledge. Cory Eller served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021; Phyllis Morgan served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021; Tim Pope served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Smith, L)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Laventra Denice Rutledge. Kenneth Peters served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Smith, L)
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bart G Harmon on behalf of Cory Eller, Phyllis Morgan, Kenneth Peters, Tim Pope, Christie Sansing (Harmon, Bart)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cory Eller, Phyllis Morgan, Kenneth Peters, Tim Pope, Christie Sansing delivered to plaintiff for service (KAM)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cory Eller, Phyllis Morgan, Kenneth Peters, Tim Pope, Christie Sansing, filed by Laventra Denice Rutledge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM)
February 12, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3776023 (B4601111475). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Cory Eller, Phyllis Morgan, Kenneth Peters, Tim Pope, Christie Sansing, filed by Laventra Denice Rutledge. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (KAM). (Goldfarb, Jon) Modified on 2/17/2021 (MEB2).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutledge v. Sansing et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Pope
Represented By: Bart G Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Peters
Represented By: Bart G Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Sansing
Represented By: Bart G Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Morgan
Represented By: Bart G Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Eller
Represented By: Bart G Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laventra Denice Rutledge
Represented By: Christina Maxine Malmat
Represented By: L William Smith
Represented By: Jon C Goldfarb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?