Barber v. Preferred Credit Inc et al
Plaintiff: Donald Joe Barber
Defendant: Preferred Credit Inc, Easy Rest Adjustable Sleep System and Christopher Jarrot
Case Number: 2:2022cv01176
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: Anna M Manasco
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. Pursuant to the Notice of Reassignment filed on November 3, 2022, Doc. #17 , the order regarding Rule 26 compliance, Doc. #11 , is VACATED. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 11/4/2022. ** a copy of this order was provided to the pro se plff, this date, by US Mail. (FNC)
November 3, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT- The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Anna M. Manasco. Please use case number 2:22 CV 1176 AMM on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD)
November 3, 2022 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Easy Rest Adjustable Sleep System, Christopher Jarrot (AKD)
November 3, 2022 NOTICE: Telephone Conference set for November 9, 2022 is CANCELLED. (AKD)
November 2, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Easy Rest Adjustable Sleep Systems and Christopher Jarrot Motion is RIPE 11/2/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Donald Joe Barber. (AKD). Modified on 11/3/2022 (AKD).
November 2, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Preferred Credit Inc. (Bailey, James)
October 24, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Quash Respondents Motion to Dismiss by Donald Joe Barber. (AKD)
October 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Britney Marsha Williams on behalf of Preferred Credit Inc (Williams, Britney)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 VACATED - See #18 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/12/2022. (AKD) Modified on 11/4/2022 (FNC).
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER-Pursuant to the General Order For Referral of Civil Matters to the United States Magistrate Judges of the Northern District of Alabama, dated January 2, 2015, the parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than November 25, 2022. In the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after November 25, 2022. A telephone status conference is hereby SET for 10:00 a.m. on November 9, 2022. The parties are DIRECTED to call 877-873-8017 to access the telephone conference. The access code is 4577302. The parties should call in five minutes prior to the start time of the conference. The telephone conference will be cancelled if all forms are submitted twenty-four hours in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/12/2022. (AKD)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Preferred Credit Inc; Plaintiff's response to that motion is due by October 26, 2022. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by November 2, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 10/12/2022. (AKD)
October 12, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Responses due by 10/26/2022 Replies due by 11/2/2022. (AKD)
October 10, 2022 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Preferred Credit Inc. filed by Preferred Credit Inc (Bailey, James)
October 10, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Preferred Credit Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Bailey, James)
October 7, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Joe Barber. Easy Rest Adjustable Sleep System served on 10/4/2022, answer due 10/25/2022. (AKD)
October 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Joe Barber. Christopher Jarrot served on 9/29/2022, answer due 10/20/2022. (AKD)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donald Joe Barber. Preferred Credit Inc served on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/10/2022. (AKD)
September 14, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Easy Rest Adjustable Sleep System, Christopher Jarrot, Preferred Credit Inc. Mailed certified mail. (AKD)
September 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD)
September 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Easy Rest Adjustable Sleep System, Christopher Jarrot, Preferred Credit Inc, filed by Donald Joe Barber.(AKD)
September 13, 2022 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B-1134 (AKD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Preferred Credit Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Joe Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Credit Inc
Represented By: James B Bailey
Represented By: Britney Marsha Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easy Rest Adjustable Sleep System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Jarrot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?