Arnold v. Kilby Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Kelvin Renaldo Arnold
Defendant: Kilby Correctional Facility, Classification Department, Social Services, ICS, Stielman, Allen, Madison County Jail and Jackson County Jail
Respondent: Attorney General State of Alabama
Case Number: 2:2022cv01235
Filed: September 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Referring Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court DENIES the #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The petitioner has 30 to correct the deficiency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/10/2022. (AHI)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED recharacterize this 1983 action to a 2254 action as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/10/2022. (AHI)
October 26, 2022 Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kelvin Renaldo Arnold and Attorney General State of Alabama. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI)
October 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE to Court regarding continued problem with being released from prison by Kelvin Renaldo Arnold (AHI)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is to notify the Court within 30 days whether he wishes to continue with this action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983; continue with this action as a petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254; or dismiss this action without prejudice to allow him an opportunity to pursue his state-court remedies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/19/2022. (AHI)
October 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE to Court regarding continued problem with being released from prison by Kelvin Renaldo Arnold (AHI)
October 13, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Court regarding continued problem with being released from prison by Kelvin Renaldo Arnold (AHI)
September 26, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Prisoner Case Number (AHI)
September 22, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelvin Renaldo Arnold. (AHI)
September 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kelvin Renaldo Arnold.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. Kilby Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Renaldo Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilby Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classification Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stielman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General State of Alabama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?