Burns et al v. Meta Platforms Inc
Plaintiff: Steven Burns, Charmaine Starnes, Sandra K Garrison, David Wang, monica Wang, Kristi Briggs-Holley, Michael E Robinson, Greg . Davis and Heather Weaver
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc
Case Number: 2:2023cv01580
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 20 RESPONSE to re (13 in 2:23-cv-01581-ACA), (15 in 2:23-cv-01572-ACA), (10 in 2:23-cv-01590-ACA) Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Meta Platforms Inc. Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-01572-ACA, 2:23-cv-01580-ACA, 2:23-cv-01581-ACA, 2:23-cv-01590-ACA(Olson, Lana)
January 11, 2024 Filing 19 Case Reassigned to Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Judge Corey L. Maze no longer assigned to the case. (RMM)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER The court GRANTS Meta's motion to consolidate. (Doc. 11). The court DIRECTS the Clerk to reassign Burns v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 4:23-cv- 01580-CLM and Schatz v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 2:23-cv-01581-MHH to the undersigned. Further, the court CONSOLIDATES the three above-styled matters (Burns v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 4:23-cv-01580-CLM; Schatz v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 2:23-cv-01581-MHH; and Bolden v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 7:23-cv- 01590-ACA) with Roberts v. Meta Platforms, Inc., 2:23-cv-01572-ACA. The court DIRECTS the parties to file all documents under case number 2:23- cv-01572-ACA and to use the style that appears in this order. The caption of any pleading or motion should indicate by case number whether the filing pertains to one particular case or all three cases. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/10/2024. (RMM)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS the joint motion to continue the parties obligations to conduct a Rule 26(f) Conference. (Doc. 16). The court will set new deadlines, if necessary, after ruling on the pending Motion to Remand (doc. 5) and Motion to Stay (doc. 13). Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 1/3/2024. (LCB)
December 26, 2023 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Continue by Meta Platforms Inc. (Olson, Lana)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by M Wesley Smithart on behalf of Meta Platforms Inc (Smithart, M)
December 15, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Stay (Opposed) filed by Kristi Briggs-Holley, Steven Burns, Greg. Davis, Sandra K Garrison, Michael E Robinson, Charmaine Starnes, David Wang, monica Wang, Heather Weaver. (Daniel, Jeffrey)
December 14, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay (Opposed) by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Olson, Lana)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY to Meta's Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Kristi Briggs-Holley, Steven Burns, Greg. Davis, Sandra K Garrison, Michael E Robinson, Charmaine Starnes, David Wang, monica Wang, Heather Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ExA JPML proof of service, #2 Exhibit ExB JPML Opposition schedule, #3 Exhibit ExC In re NFL Order re Remand and Vacate)(Daniel, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE by Meta Platforms Inc re #9 Opposition (other) of Supplemental Authority (Olson, Lana)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Kristi Briggs-Holley, Steven Burns, Greg. Davis, Sandra K Garrison, Michael E Robinson, Charmaine Starnes, David Wang, monica Wang, Heather Weaver. (Daniel, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2023 Filing 9 Opposition to re #5 Meta Platform's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Meta Platforms Inc. (Olson, Lana)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendant Meta Platforms Inc. ("Meta")'s Motion for Extension of Time, (doc. 6), for good cause shown. Meta's deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, originally November 27, 2023, is now fourteen days after the court rules on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, (doc. 5). Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 11/27/2023. (LCB)
November 24, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Lana)
November 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, (doc. 5). Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. has on or before Monday, December 4, 2023, to file a response, in no more than 15 pages (double-spaced and size-14 font). Plaintiffs' Reply is due on or before Monday, December 11, 2023, and shall not exceed 15 pages (double-spaced and size-14 font). Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 11/23/2023. (LCB)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Kristi Briggs-Holley, Steven Burns, Greg. Davis, Sandra K Garrison, Michael E Robinson, Charmaine Starnes, David Wang, monica Wang, Heather Weaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B)(Daniel, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 11/22/2023. (RMM)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Loose by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing)(Olson, Lana)
November 22, 2023 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4475030 (B-8641). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Meta Platforms Inc from St Clair County Circuit Court, case number 23-900235., filed by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(KAM). (Olson, Lana)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Timothy Loose added as attorney for Defendant Meta Platforms Inc. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 11/22/2023. (AMC)
November 22, 2023 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4475045 (B-8642). (Olson, Lana)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Meta Platforms Inc (KAM)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Meta Platforms Inc from St Clair County Circuit Court, case number 23-900235., filed by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns et al v. Meta Platforms Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Burns
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmaine Starnes
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra K Garrison
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wang
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: monica Wang
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Briggs-Holley
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Robinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg . Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Weaver
Represented By: Jeffrey Stuart Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta Platforms Inc
Represented By: Lana Alcorn Olson
Represented By: Timothy W Loose
Represented By: M Wesley Smithart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?