Nielsen v. Alabama A&M University
Plaintiff: Penny Nielsen
Defendant: Alabama A&M University, Roderick DeWayne Watts, Kay Ivey, Perry Jones, Frank Williams, Board of Trustees for Alabama Agricultural and Mechanical University, Dr. Andrew Hugine, Jr., Trustee Kevin Ball, Lt Chris Robinson, Tiffany Johnson Cole, John Hackett, Jr, Scherrie Banks, Trustee Ginger Harper, Jerome Williams, Nichelle Gainey and Jeannette Jones
Case Number: 5:2019cv00725
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: C Lynwood Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against All Defendants filed by Penny Nielsen.(AHI)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the #10 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED and the #5 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 6/25/2019. (AHI)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and Motion for Leave to File the Attached Amended Complaint by Penny Nielsen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Strawn, Ralph)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that plaintiff is ORDERED to respond to the Motion Dismiss by 6/25/2019. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 6/11/2019. (AHI )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the #6 Motion to Stay is GRANTED and it is ORDERED that all discovery is STAYED pending the ruling on defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge C Lynwood Smith, Jr on 6/11/2019. (AHI)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S Consent to Defendant's Motion to Stay filed by Penny Nielsen. (Strawn, Ralph) ).
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay re #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Alabama A&M University. (Lunsford, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Alabama A&M University. (Lunsford, William)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed Alabama A&M University served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. (AHI)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Alabama A&M University. (AHI)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Penny Nielsen. (Strawn, Ralph)
May 13, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3345570 (B4601097670). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Alabama A&M University filed by Penny Nielsen.(AHI). (Strawn, Ralph)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand thereon against Alabama A&M University filed by Penny Nielsen.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nielsen v. Alabama A&M University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Nielsen
Represented By: Ralph K Strawn, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama A&M University
Represented By: Matthew B Reeves
Represented By: William R Lunsford
Represented By: A Redmond Debro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick DeWayne Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Ivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees for Alabama Agricultural and Mechanical University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Andrew Hugine, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Kevin Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Chris Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Johnson Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hackett, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scherrie Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Ginger Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichelle Gainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?