Taylor v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Case Number: 6:2019cv08036
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Jasper Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00495. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 20, 2019 Case transferred to the Northern District of Alabama; ELECTRONICALLY transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk. (No PDF attached to this entry) (amf, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The #9 objections are overruled; 2) The magistrate judge's #8 recommendation is adopted; 3) This case is transferred to the U.S. District Court for Northern District of AL pursuant to 28 USC 1631; DIRECTING the Clerk to take appropriate steps to effect the transfer; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Appeals Checklist)(amf, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS and RESPONSE to #8 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge by Tracey Taylor. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1631; Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 8/15/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Declaratory relief. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/12/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Declaratory relief by Tracey Taylor. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: It is ORDERED that petitioner's #3 objections are overruled. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 8/5/2019. (alm, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AMENDING Court's #2 Order to further advise petitioner in compliance with Castro v. United States, 540 U.S. 375, 38283 (2003), that the re- characterization of his habeas petition as a motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. 2255 renders the 2255 motion and any subsequent 2255 motion subject to the procedural limitations imposed upon 2255 motions, in particular, the one-year limitation period and the successive-motion bar; further ORDERING the petitioner is granted an extension to 8/9/2019 to inform the court is he wishes to do one of the following, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/31/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Objection to re #2 Order (Amended petition with objections) filed by Tracey Taylor. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing that: (1) the The instant petition be construed as a motion to vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255; (2) The United States of America shall henceforth be listed as the sole respondent in this case; (3) On or before 8/1/2019, Taylor shall inform the court of his wishes to do one of the following: (a) Continue to proceed only on the claims he presents in the construed 2255 motion; or (b) Amend the construed 2255 motion to assert any additional claims he wishes to assert under 2255 in challenging his convictions and sentence; or (c) Withdraw the construed 2255 motion and dismiss this action, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/18/19. (djy, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (applicaton of habeas corpus), filed by Tracey Taylor.(djy, ) Modified on 7/17/2019 to clarify text to reflect correct filed date as of 7/12/2019 (qc/djy, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 9/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. United States of America (INMATE 3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?