Wilhite v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Wilhite
Defendant: Jameson T. Parker, Marcus Haynes, Charles Monk and Andrew Cutts, Sr.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00847
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andrew Cutts, Sr., Marcus Haynes, Charles Monk and Jameson T. Parker, returned to Plaintiff for service via USPS on this the 29th day of June, 2020. (JLC)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, MOTION to Appoint ad Litem by Joseph Wilhite. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit)(Anderson, Kristopher)
June 17, 2020 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3611683, NDAL receipt #B4601106624.(Anderson, Kristopher) Modified on 6/17/2020 (JLC).
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Cutts, Sr, Marcus Haynes, Charles Monk, Jameson T. Parker, filed by Joseph Wilhite. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilhite v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jameson T. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Monk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cutts, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Wilhite
Represented By: Kristopher O Anderson
Represented By: Henry H Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?