Bailey v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Petitioner: Sandra Kay Bailey
Respondent: Chad Garrett, Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Medley, Katina Heckard, Shoulders and Patricia Bradley
Case Number: 7:2020cv01042
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Gray M Borden
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Petitioner shall have twenty calendar (20) days from the date of this Order to supply any additional evidentiary materials or legal arguments she may wish to offer with regard to whether the petition is subject to summary disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 9/18/2020. (SRD)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 RESPONSE to re #2 Order to Show Cause filed by Federal Bureau Of Prisons. (Chambers, William)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER It is hereby ORDERED that the respondents appear and show cause in writing within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on 8/27/2020. (SRD)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 NDAL RECEIPT# B4601107315), filed by Sandra Kay Bailey.(MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Garrett
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: William Russell Chambers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau Of Prisons
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: William Russell Chambers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Medley
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: William Russell Chambers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Katina Heckard
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: William Russell Chambers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shoulders
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: William Russell Chambers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patricia Bradley
Represented By: Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Represented By: William Russell Chambers, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sandra Kay Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?