Alexander v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Petitioner: Betty Alexander
Respondent: Federal Bureau Of Prisons, Patricia Bradley and Katina Heckard
Case Number: 7:2020cv01192
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John H England
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Betty Alexander (KAM)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Respondent's MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED and the petition for writ of habeas corpus be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE: Objections to R&R due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 9/25/2020. (KAM)
August 26, 2020 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Government's response construed as a motion for summary judgment). (KAM)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Respondents filed a response to the petition in the above-styled case in which they seek to have the petition summarily dismissed without an evidentiary hearing; Petitioner has twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/26/2020. (KAM)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION to Dismiss and Reply to Order to Show Cause by Federal Bureau Of Prisons. (Dimler, Gregory)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - the Respondent shall appear and show cause in writing within 30 day why the relief requested should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/21/2020. (KAM) Modified on 8/24/2020 (KAM, ).
August 21, 2020 Habeas Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number B4601107935 (MEB2)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Notice of Deficient Pleading - Petitioner must either file a verified application to proceed ifp or pay the $5.00 filing fee within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/18/2020. (KAM)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 EMERGENCY PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Betty Alexander.(MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Federal Bureau Of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Federal Bureau Of Prisons
Represented By: Gregory R Dimler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patricia Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Katina Heckard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Betty Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?