Fathom Exploration, LLC v. The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels

Case Number: 1:2004cv00685
Filed: October 27, 2004
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Presiding Judge: William H. Steele
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2012 219 Opinion or Order of the Court Order granting 218 Second Motion to Approve Notice filed by Fathom Exploration, LLC. Plf is ordered to amend the "Notice of Action in Rem and Arrest" found at Exhibit A to its Motion, and to cause such Notice to be published in the London Times & the Press Register three times per week for two consecutive weeks, with the first such publication to occur by 9/10/2012. Plf is ordered to file proof of publication as further set out. A joint proposed discovery plan due by 11/30/2012. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 8/6/2012. (sdb)
March 12, 2012 211 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered as follows: 1. The Court finds that Shipwreck #1 in the admiralty arrest area is not the Clipper Ship ROBERT H. DIXEY and that, consequently, the DIXEY Claimants have no right, claim or interest to that shipwreck site;2. The Court provi sionally finds that Shipwreck #1 is the British Barque AMSTEL;3. Plaintiff is ordered to continue diligently performing the archival research and diving activities described herein pertaining to Shipwreck #1, and promptly to notify the Court and oppo sing counsel of any material findings tending to shed further light on the identity of the vessel, irrespective of whether such data points strengthen or weaken the AMSTEL hypothesis; and 4. The parties are ordered to file a joint status report, on o r before April 9, 2012, setting forth a joint proposal (or, if they cannot reach one, their competing proposals) for the procedure that should be followed to litigate and resolve theabandonment issue as to Shipwreck #1. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 3/9/2012. (mbp)
July 1, 2011 195 Opinion or Order of the Court Order lifting the stay imposed in 141 Order as to the shipwreck that Fathom identified as AMSTEL. Discovery cutoff 10/3/2011. Any party wishing to be heard on the issues of the identity of the vessel that Fathom is calling the AMSTEL must file a memorandum of law by 12/2/2011 as further set out. Any party wishing to respond to any other party's evidentiary submission and brief may file a response by 12/16/2011. With respect to all other wreck sites within the admiralty arrest area in this case, the stay remains in place. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 7/1/2011. copies to parties. (sdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fathom Exploration, LLC v. The Unidentified Shipwrecked Vessel or Vessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?