Jackson et al v. Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Baron K. Jackson and Michelle L. Jackson
Defendant: Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc. and Fikes Truck Line, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2005cv00431
Filed: July 22, 2005
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
0 Judge: Sonja F Bivins
1 Judge: Kristi K DuBose
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2007. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2007 Opinion or Order 39 ORDER denying #38 Motion ; denying #38 Motion for Hearing; denying #38 Motion to Deposit Funds as set out in order. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/7/07. (cmj)
April 20, 2007 38 MOTION to Deposit/Interplead settlement funds; for insturctions concerning disbursement of funds and MOTION for Hearing by Baron K. Jackson, Michelle L. Jackson; ref. to Judge DuBose (cmj)
April 13, 2007 37 JUDGMENT states because the District Judge Did Not abuse her discretion in denying the Jacksons' motion for reconsideration WE AFFIRM issued as MANDATE of USCA re: #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Baron K. Jackson, Michelle L. Jackson Mandate issued 4/13/07 ; USCA Case Number 06-14417 (jal)
October 20, 2006 Opinion or Order 36 ORDER of USCA as to #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michelle L. Jackson, Baron K. Jackson, APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE THE APPEAL IS GRANTED. (jal, )
October 2, 2006 35 ENTRY OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION ISSUED AS MANDATE of USCA re: #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michelle L. Jackson,, Baron K. Jackson, Mandate issued 10/2/06 ; USCA Case Number 06-14417-FF (jal, )
August 30, 2006 Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 11(c), the Clerk of the District Court for the Southern District of Alabama certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal re: #32 Notice of Appeal, Appeal No. 06-14417-F. The entire record on appeal is available electronically (jal, )
August 29, 2006 34 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 3977 re #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michelle L. Jackson,, Baron K. Jackson, ; USCA Case Number 06-14417-F (jal, )
August 29, 2006 33 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM filed by Baron K. Jackson, Michelle L. Jackson NOT requesting transcripts re #32 Notice of Appeal, (jal, )
August 28, 2006 Appeal Remark re #32 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Number 06-14417-F, The Notice of Appeal was filed 8/15/06 at which time the Clerk mailed the Appellant the TOI, Appellant has failed to return the completed form as required, the USCA has been notified. (jal, )
August 18, 2006 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re #32 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michelle L. Jackson, Baron K. Jackson, USCA Case Number 06-14417-F (jal, )
August 15, 2006 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #30 MOTION for Reconsideration of District Judge Order re #29 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, #27 Objection,, #29 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, #25 Stipulation of Dismissal, #32 Notice of Appeal,, #31 Order on Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order Judge Appealed:,DuBose Court Reporter:,Eddie Howard Fee Paid:,Not Paid (jal, )
August 15, 2006 32 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #29 Order on Motion to Reopen Case, #31 Order on Motion for Reconsideration of District Judge Order, #24 Order to Dismiss on Settlement by Baron K. Jackson, Michelle L. Jackson, (Clerk mailed TOI, Rules to Appellants) (jal, )
July 14, 2006 Opinion or Order 31 ORDER entered denying #30 Motion of plaintiffs to reconsider the Court's order of 6/23/06 denying plaintiff's motion to reinstate this action as fully set out . Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/14/06. (mca, )
July 11, 2006 30 MOTION for Reconsideration of District Judge Order re #29 Order on Motion to Reopen Case by Baron K. Jackson, Michelle L. Jackson. Referred to Judge DuBose(cmj, )
June 23, 2006 Opinion or Order 29 ORDER denying #26 Motion to Reopen Case (copy mailed to plaintiffs). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 6/23/06. (cmj, )
June 22, 2006 REFERRAL OF #28 Response to Motion to Judge DuBose. (cmj, )
June 21, 2006 28 RESPONSE to Motion re: #26 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Baron K. Jackson, Michelle L. Jackson. (Hunter, J.)
June 7, 2006 REFERRAL OF #27 Objection to motion for reinstatement and application for entry of final judgment to Judge DuBose. (mca, )
June 7, 2006 27 Objection TO MOTION FOR REINSTATEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT filed by Fikes Truck Line, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit General Release and Confidential Settlement Agreement#2 Exhibit Copy of settlement check#3 Exhibit Joint Stipulation for Dismissal)(Law, Jonathon)
June 2, 2006 26 MOTION to Reopen Case by Baron K. Jackson, Michelle L. Jackson. Referred to Judge DuBose(cmj, )
May 24, 2006 REFERRAL OF #25 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge DuBose. (mca, )
May 24, 2006 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Fikes Truck Line, Inc.. (Law, Jonathon)
May 18, 2006 Opinion or Order 24 Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 30 days should the settlement not be consummated.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/18/06. (cmj, )
May 4, 2006 REFERRAL OF #23 Notice of Settlement to Judge DuBose. (cmj, )
May 4, 2006 23 NOTICE of Settlement by Fikes Truck Line, Inc., Fikes Truck Line, Inc. (Daniell, David)
April 14, 2006 Document endorsed NOTED by Judge Sonja F. Bivins: Status Report #22 filed by Fikes Truck Line, Inc. (Bivins, Sonja)
April 14, 2006 REFERRAL OF #22 Status Report to Judge Bivins. (cmj, )
April 14, 2006 22 STATUS REPORT JOINT SETTLEMENT STATEMENT by Fikes Truck Line, Inc.. (Daniell, David)
April 12, 2006 Opinion or Order 21 Order entered that the parties have failed to submit their settlement statement. Therefore, upon consideration, the parties are ORDERED by 4/14/06 to file their settlement statement or to show cause by that date why they are unable to do so . Signed by Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/12/06. (mca, )
January 10, 2006 Opinion or Order 20 Order entered that jury selection is hereby reset for 6/27/2006 08:45 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/10/06. (mca, )
January 6, 2006 Opinion or Order 19 Order granting #10 Stipulation of Dismissal/Motion to Dismiss filed by Michelle L. Jackson,, Baron K. Jackson, dismissing plaintiffs' claims against Con-Way with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/5/06. (cmj, )
January 6, 2006 Opinion or Order 18 Order entered cancelling final pretrial conference previously set for June 7, 2006 and RESETTING Pretrial Conference for 6/15/2006 01:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Kristi K. DuBose. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/5/06. (cmj, )
January 3, 2006 Opinion or Order 17 ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #12 Motion to Compel. Counsel for the parties have notified the Court that Defendant Fikes Truck Lines, Inc's Motion to Compel (Doc. 12) has been resolved. Accordingly, the Motion is Moot. Signed by Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 01/3/2006. (rlw)
December 30, 2005 16 This action has been transferred from the docket of District Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge Kristi K. DuBose. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix KD-B after the case number on all future pleadings. (cmj, )
December 29, 2005 15 RESPONSE to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiffs filed by Baron K. Jackson, Michelle L. Jackson. (Hunter, J.)
December 29, 2005 14 Notice of Filing Plaintiffs' Answers and Responses to Two sets of Interrogatories and Request for Production from Defendant Fikes Truck Line, Inc. filed by Baron K. Jackson, Michelle L. Jackson.(Hunter, J.)
December 19, 2005 Opinion or Order 13 Order Setting Motion Deadline for #12 MOTION to Compel filed by Fikes Truck Line, Inc. Responses due by 12/30/2005 from plaintiffs; Replies due by 1/4/2006. Motion to be taken under submission on 1/4/2006.. Signed by Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 12/19/05. (cmj, )
December 16, 2005 12 MOTION to Compel responses to interrogatories and requests for production by Fikes Truck Line, Inc.. Referred to Judge Bivins(cmj, )
November 8, 2005 Opinion or Order 11 Order Setting Motion Deadline for #10 Stipulation of Dismissal (motion to dismiss) filed by Michelle L. Jackson,, Baron K. Jackson. Responses due by 11/22/2005. Signed by Judge Charles R. Butler Jr. on 11/8/05. (cmj, )
November 8, 2005 REFERRAL OF #10 Stipulation of Dismissal to Judge Butler. (cmj, )
November 7, 2005 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc. a/k/a Con-Way Southern Express by Baron K. Jackson, Michelle L. Jackson. (Hunter, J.)
September 15, 2005 9 Notice of Filing interrogatories and requests for production of documents filed by Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc..(Holman, William)
September 12, 2005 Opinion or Order 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2006 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Senior Judge Charles R. Butler Jr. Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2005. Discovery cutoff 2/10/2006. Motions due by 3/3/2006. Jury Selection set for 6/26/2006 08:45 AM in Courtroom 5A before Senior Judge Charles R. Butler Jr.. Jury Trial set for July term. Position Regarding Settlement due by 2/10/2006.. Signed by Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/12/05. (Attachments:, #1 Standing Pretrial Order)(cmj, )
September 9, 2005 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Butler, Jr and Sonja F. Bivins for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 9/9/05. (mjn, )
August 11, 2005 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Holman, William)
August 10, 2005 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Fikes Truck Line, Inc..(Daniell, David)
July 25, 2005 Opinion or Order 4 PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING ORDER entered Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/8/2005. Signed by Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 7/25/05. (mjn, )
July 25, 2005 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins for trial. Consent Form due by 9/8/2005. (Attachments:, #1 notice of right to consent)(mjn, )
July 22, 2005 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc..(Holman, William)
July 22, 2005 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc. and Fikes Truck Line, Inc. from Circuit Court of Mobile County, Alabama, case number CV-05-2401. ( Filing fee $ 250, Receipt number 0005224.), filed by Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc..(Holman, William) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2005 (mjn, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson et al v. Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baron K. Jackson
Represented By: J. Gullatte Hunter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L. Jackson
Represented By: J. Gullatte Hunter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Con-Way Transportation Services, Inc.
Represented By: J. Walton Jackson
Represented By: William Steele Holman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fikes Truck Line, Inc.
Represented By: David F. Daniell
Represented By: Jonathon R. Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?