Jones v. Culliver

Case Number: 1:2005cv00712
Filed: February 7, 2006
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER (doc. 33) ADOPTING Report and Recommendation modifying that portion of the Recommendation on pages six-nine is Stricken and replaced as sets out, and Motions for COA and IFP are denied. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/20/09. (copy to Appellant, e-mailed to USCA). (jal)
January 14, 2009 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that this petition is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/14/09. (copy to petitioner) (cmj)
November 25, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus & 6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Anthony Jones stating the petitions should be dismissed as barred by the statute of limitations. Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 11/25/08. Copies to parties.(mpp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Culliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?