Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. Rolison Trucking Co., LLC et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00288
Filed: May 9, 2006
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2011 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion to Lift Stay; granting 60 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/30/2011. (cmj)
May 21, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to show cause why the stay should not be lifted and this case dismissed. ( Show Cause Response due by 5/29/2009. Hearing set for 6/18/2009 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 5A, 113 St. Joseph Street, Mobile, AL 36602 Judge Kristi K. DuBose.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/21/09. (cmj)
February 18, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for parties to file status report. ( Status Report due by 5/18/2009.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/17/09. (cmj)
January 13, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for parties to file status report. ( Status Report due by 2/13/2009.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/13/09. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfolk Southern Railway Company v. Rolison Trucking Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?