Radcliff v. Tate & Lyle Sucralose, Inc.

Case Number: 1:2006cv00345
Filed: June 2, 2006
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2009 226 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered in accordance w/the court's orders on motions for summary judgment entered on 8/14/08 & 12/4/08 (Docs. 176 & 221 & in light of settlement by the parties of the remaining claims, judgment is entered in favor of Dft Tate & Lyle Sucralose, Inc. against Plfs listed as set out, & Plfs' claims against Dft are DISMISSED W/PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 1/6/09. (tot)
December 4, 2008 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 191 Motion for Summary Judgment. The renewed motion for summary judgment is DENIED insofar as it seeks judgment on all claims for nuisance based on noise and is GRANTED insofar as it seeks judgment on all claims for nuisance based on odor and its related consequences. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 12/04/2008. (mab)
November 25, 2008 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 172 Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert, James R. Montgomery. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 11/25/2008. (mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radcliff v. Tate & Lyle Sucralose, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?