Lester v. Hadley et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00393
Filed: August 21, 2006
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Presiding Judge: W. B. Hand
Referring Judge: Bert W. Milling
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT entered that Plaintiff's complaint is here by DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/30/09. Copy mailed to plaintiff 3/30/09. (jlr)
February 26, 2009 98 Opinion or Order of the Court Order. The Court has received payments from plaintiff totaling $350.00. The filing fee in this action, therefore, has been paid. Accordingly, the Alabama Department of Corrections is no longer required to collect funds from plaintiffs inmate account for payment of the filing fee in this action. The Clerk isDIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Commissioner of the Alabama Department of Corrections or his designee and to the business manager of the institution where plaintiff is incarcerated, Holman Correctional Facility, Holman 3700, Atmore,Alabama 36503. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/26/09. (copy to plaintiff, ADOC and business manager) (cmj)
February 17, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by COI Igo, Sgt. Hadley, Sgt. Bradley, COI Montgomery, recommending that the summary judgment of defendants Hadley, Bradley, Montgomery and Igo be granted and that plaintiff's action against these defendants be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 3/13/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bert W. Milling, Jr on 2/17/09. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lester v. Hadley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?