Whitted v. Culliver et al

Case Number: 1:2006cv00776
Filed: November 14, 2006
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 37 to Deny MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Sonny Whitted Objections to R&R due by 5/17/2010. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/19/10. (jal) (Clerk mailed copy to Appellant and e-mailed the USCA)
March 12, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Roberts, recommending that Defendant's motion for summary judgment be granted and this action be dismissed with prejudice and that judgment be entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff Sonny Whitted on all claims. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/16,2010. (copy to plaintiff) (cmj)
February 18, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Roberts, recommending that Defendant's motion for summary judgment be granted and this action be dismissed with prejudice and that judgment be entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff Sonny Whitted on all claims. Objections to R&R due by 3/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 2/17/2010. (copy mailed to plaintiff) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitted v. Culliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?