Atlantic Recording Corporation et al v. Carter
Plaintiff: Virgin Records America, Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros. Records, Inc., Motown Record Company, L.P., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Arista Records LLC and UMG Recordings, Inc.
Defendant: Joanna Carter
Case Number: 1:2007cv00001
Filed: January 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E Cassady
Referring Judge: William H Steele
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2007. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2007 Filing 14 Mail Returned as Undeliverable at 6951 Dickens Ferry Rd, Apt. 36; Mobile, AL as to Joanna Carter re #12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment and #13 Default Judgment (tgw)
April 11, 2007 Filing 13 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Motown Record Company, L.P., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, UMG Recordings, Inc., Virgin Records America, Inc., Warner Bros. Records, Inc. against Joanna Carter, in the amount of $9,620.00. The defendant is PERMANENTLY ENJOINED and RESTRAINED from directly or indirectly infringing plaintiffs' rights as set out. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/11/07. (tgw)
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING the #11 Motion for Default Judgment as to Joanna Carter. Plaintiffs' request for entry of permanent injunction as part of the default judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William H. Steele on 4/11/07. Copy mailed to Joanna Carter at the address on the summons & to the address on the Return of Service. (tgw)
April 5, 2007 Filing 11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Joanna Carter by UMG Recordings, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros. Records, Inc., Virgin Records America, Inc., Motown Record Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Anderson, Thomas)
April 5, 2007 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Joanna Carter to Judge Steele (tgw)
March 20, 2007 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Joanna Carter. Copy mailed to defendant at the address on the Summons and the Return of Service. (tgw)
March 19, 2007 Filing 9 This action has been transferred from the docket of Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady and is now assigned to the docket of District Judge William H. Steele. To insure that your pleadings are referred to the proper Judge and Magistrate Judge with as little delay as possible, please use the letter suffix WS-C after the case number on all future pleadings. (eec)
March 19, 2007 Filing 8 APPLICATION to the Clerk for Entry of Default by UMG Recordings, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros. Records, Inc., Virgin Records America, Inc., Motown Record Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Anderson, Thomas) Text Modified on 3/20/2007 (tgw).
March 19, 2007 REFERRAL OF #8 MOTION for Entry of Default to Judge Steele. (eec)
March 13, 2007 Answer due from Joanna Carter on 3/8/2007. (eec)
March 8, 2007 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons, Complaint and Corporate Disclosure Statement served 2/16/2007 as to Joanna Carter (Anderson, Thomas)
January 10, 2007 Filing 6 Remark: Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding Copyright was mailed to the Register of Copyrights (eec)
January 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Motown Record Company, L.P., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Warner Bros. Records, Inc., Virgin Records America, Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Arista Records LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc. A review does not reveal any reason to believe that there are potential conflicts of interest that would require recusal in this action. Signed by Judge William E. Cassady on 1/8/07. (eec)
January 4, 2007 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joanna Carter. (Summons mailed to counsel for issuance) (eec)
January 4, 2007 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady for trial. (eec)
January 3, 2007 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs UMG Recordings, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros. Records, Inc., Virgin Records America, Inc., Motown Record Company, L.P.. (Anderson, Thomas)
January 3, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Joanna Carter ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 425680, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by UMG Recordings, Inc., Sony BMG Music Entertainment, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Warner Bros. Records, Inc., Virgin Records America, Inc., Motown Record Company, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A#2 Exhibit B#3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Part 2#4 Exhibit B - Part 3#5 Exhibit B - Part 4#6 Appendix Summons#7 Appendix Notice to Register of Copyrights) (Anderson, Thomas) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2007 (eec, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Recording Corporation et al v. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanna Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgin Records America, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Recording Corporation
Represented By: Thomas C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Records, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motown Record Company, L.P.
Represented By: Thomas C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony BMG Music Entertainment
Represented By: Thomas C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Records LLC
Represented By: Thomas C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas C. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?