Williams v. Hooks

Petitioner: Jerome A. Williams
Respondent: Ralph Hooks
Case Number: 1:2007cv00123
Filed: February 16, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Jerome A. Williams Objections to R&R due by 5/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 4/16/10 filed by Jerome A. Williams Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/21/10. (copy mailed to Appellant, e-mailed USCA) (jal)
March 30, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jerome A. Williams, recommending that Petitioner's request for habeas corpus relief be denied and that he is not entitled to a certificate of appealibility, as set out. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/30/2010. (copy mailed to petitioner) (cmj)
May 5, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 9 Response to Habeas Petition filed by Ralph Hooks, Respondent is ordered to file an amended Answer addressing the merits of Petitioner's claims along with the trial record and any pertinent transcripts or other documents as set forth in the Court's Order (doc. 5) ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 6/12/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/4/09. (copy of order mailed to petitioner) (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerome A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph Hooks
Represented By: Stephen N. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?