Edwards et al v. Accredited Home Lenders, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Sharron Edwards and Jonathan Edwards
Defendant: Lender's First Choice of Alabama, Inc., Accredited Home Lenders, Inc. and United General Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv00160
Filed: March 2, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Presiding Judge: William E. Cassady
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 12:1461 Homeowners Loan Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2011 189 Opinion or Order of the Court Order for plaintiffs to file a joint report regarding status as set out. ( Status Report due by 11/22/2011.). Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 10/31/2011. (cmj)
May 4, 2009 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 165 Motion to Intervene by Floyd and Barbara Jones. The Joneses' shall file their complaint in intervention, as set out, on or before 5/12/09. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 5/4/09. (cmj)
March 4, 2009 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing as moot 131 Motion to Certify Class, with leave to re-file once the court rules on the pending motion to intervene.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 3/4/09. (cmj)
February 17, 2009 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 173 Motion for Leave to File surreply to the intervenor's reply to Accredited's response to the mmotion to intervene. Defendant shall file its surreply on or before 2/25/09 and this matter will be taken under submission on 2/26/09.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 2/13/09. (cmj)
January 30, 2009 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 168 Motion for Leave to File; granting 169 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiffs shall file their short reply briefs on or before 2/4/09. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 1/30/09. (cmj)
December 29, 2008 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 161 Motion to Amend briefing schedule. Defendant Accredited is ORDERED to respond only to the plaintiffs supplemental briefing on or before January 15, 2009. Defendants response to plaintiffs motion for class certification shall be due thirty (30) days after the Courts decision on the supplemental briefing,should a response be necessary. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/24/08. (cmj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards et al v. Accredited Home Lenders, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lender's First Choice of Alabama, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory C. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredited Home Lenders, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P. Previn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United General Title Insurance Company
Represented By: James M. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharron Edwards
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Edwards
Represented By: Earl P. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?