The Mitchell Company v. Campus

Plaintiff: The Mitchell Company
Defendant: Joseph J. Campus, III, Edsel F. Matthews, Jr. and James Young
Counter Claimant: Joseph J. Campus, III
Counter Defendant: The Mitchell Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv00177
Filed: March 7, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: William E. Cassady
Presiding Judge: Kristi K. DuBose
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2009 350 Opinion or Order of the Court Order entered that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE subject to the right of either party to reinstate the action within 90 days should the settlement not be consummated.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 12/8/09. (cmj)
November 5, 2009 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER entered as to Plaintiff The Mitchell Co., Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Docs. 235-238), Defendant James A. Young's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docs. 239-241), Defendant Joseph J. Campus, III's Motion for Partial S ummary Judgment (Docs. 242-245) and the responses and replies thereto (Docs. 248-250, 252-254, 263-266, 271-273); and Defendant Young's objection (Doc. 287) and motion to strike (Doc. 276. It is ORDERED that Campus' motion for partial summ ary judgment as to TMC's claims against him for conversion and unjust enrichment is MOOT; Campus' motion for partial summary judgment as to TMC's claims against him for wantonness, negligent misrepresentation and negligence (including conspiracy to commit negligence) is GRANTED; Campus' motion for partial summary judgment as to his counterclaim for wrongful intrusion/invasion of privacy is DENIED; Campus' motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED in part with regard to TMC's disgorgement claim against him based upon his interests in Model Homes, LLC and Hexagon Investments, LLC; however, to the extent that TMC seeks disgorgement with regard to other interests or monies of Campus, his motion is DENIED; TMC& #039;s motion for partial summary judgment as to its claims against Campus for fraudulent concealment, fraudulent suppression, breach of fiduciary duty and civil conspiracy, is DENIED; TMC's motion for partial summary judgment as to Campus count erclaims for false light invasion of privacy, wrongful intrusion/invasion of privacy and fraudulent inducement is GRANTED;TMC's motion for partial summary judgment as to Campus counterclaims for breach of contract and slander is DENIED; and Youn g's motion for summary judgment on TMC's claims against him for fraudulent concealment, negligent/mistaken fraud (and to the extent a conspiracy is based on any negligent/mistaken fraud) is GRANTED; Youngs motion for summary judgment as to the conspiracy claims against him is DENIED; TMC's claims against Young for conversion, misappropriation of trade secrets and unjust enrichment have been dismissed and so Youngs motion for summary judgment as to these claims is MOOT. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 11/5/09. (mca)
September 24, 2009 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 275 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 269 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Joseph J. Campus, III as set out. The Motion to Impose Sanction of Dismissal is DENIED. The parties ae to tender to the attorneys for Campus the notebook referenced in the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation.. Signed by Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/23/09. (cmj)
September 8, 2009 275 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 269 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Joseph J. Campus, III that the motion is due to be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as further set out in this order. Objections to R&R due by 9/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge William E. Cassady on 9/4/09. (adk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Mitchell Company v. Campus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Mitchell Company
Represented By: William E. Shreve, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Campus, III
Represented By: Catherine M. Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edsel F. Matthews, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Joseph J. Campus, III
Represented By: Alan C. Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: The Mitchell Company
Represented By: David J. Middlebrooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?