Smith v. King et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Jackson Smith
Defendant: Kathleen Enstice, Faron Claytonb Brewer, Troy King, John R. Lockett, John M. Tyson, Jr., Jill P. Phillips, Leroy Anthony Tasone, Dr. Janovski, Ashley Rich, Phillip M. Garrett, Curtis Graves, Katrina Brewer, Edward Blount, April Marie Miller Ryan, Jennifer Levy and John White
Case Number: 1:2007cv00268
Filed: April 13, 2007
Court: Alabama Southern District Court
Office: Mobile Office
County: Mobile
Referring Judge: Sonja F. Bivins
Presiding Judge: Callie V. S. Granade
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court Order re: 29 USCA Order, this court finds that the notice of appeal was delivered to prison officials for mailing on June 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 07/09/2010. (copy to ptlf & 11th CCA) (mab)
May 4, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 28 Report and Recommendation. the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge made under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(l)(B) is ADOPTED as the opinion of this Court. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the plaintiff's Motion IFP is Denied. Signed by Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 5/4/10. (Copy mailed to Appellant, e-mailed USCA) (jal)
June 9, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as the opinion of this Court. It is ORDERED that this action be and is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice prior toservice of process pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and (ii) because the plaintiff's claims either fail to state a claim upon which relief can be granted or are frivolous. Signed by Chief Judge Callie V. S. Granade on 06/09/2009. (copy to ptlf & Comm of ADOC as directed.) (mab)
May 15, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that Plf's action be dismissed w/prejudice prior to service of process as set out. Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sonja F. Bivins on 5/15/09. (copy mailed to Plf on 5/18/09) (tot) Modified on 5/18/2009 (tot).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Enstice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faron Claytonb Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Lockett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M. Tyson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill P. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Anthony Tasone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Janovski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip M. Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Blount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Marie Miller Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Jackson Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?